Paulson v. No Named Defendant
Plaintiff: Randy D. Paulson
Defendant: No Named Defendant
Claimant: Fredrick C. Paulson
Case Number: 1:2019cv00199
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:30511
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 21 EXHIBIT to Ecf 20 Minute Order: Notice of Action Brought for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability. (cthom, )
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Plaintiff-in-Limitation's Motion to Extend the Monition Period #18 . For good cause shown, the Motion is GRANTED. The April 10, 2019 deadline to file claims and answers is this action and all related dates are VACATED. The new deadline for claimants to file claims and answers in this action is June 10, 2019. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/7/2019. (Text Only Entry ) (rmsec )
March 6, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to Motion to Extend Monition Period by Plaintiff Randy D. Paulson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) [Proposed] Order to Extend Monition Period)(Krieger, Lynn)
February 28, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Claimant Fredrick C. Paulson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Bell, Shannon)
February 28, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jason R. Harris on behalf of Fredrick C. PaulsonAttorney Jason R. Harris added to party Fredrick C. Paulson(pty:clm) (Harris, Jason)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Monition Issued by Clerk. ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/20/2019. (cthom, )
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Approving Ad Interim Stipulation of Value, Requiring Notice of Monition, and Issuing Injunction. ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Monition) (cthom, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00199-RM. (athom, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 12 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #11 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00199-REB. (Text Only Entry) (tsher, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 14 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Telephonic Status Conference held on 2/7/2019. ORDERED: Parties shall submit a non-consent form on or before February 14, 2019. FTR: Courtroom C205. (slibi, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Randy D. Paulson All parties do not consent.. (Krieger, Lynn)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 1/30/2019. Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/7/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing by Plaintiff Randy D. Paulson (Krieger, Lynn)
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rvill, )
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT re #1 Complaint, CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Randy D. Paulson. (Krieger, Lynn)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #2 Stipulation, and #1 Complaint filed by attorney Lynn L. Krieger. Attorney has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Pretrial Order [PROPOSED] Order Directing Issuance of Monition and Special Restraining Order by Plaintiff Randy Dean Paulson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) [Proposed] Monition, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only) [Proposed] Special Restraining Order)(Krieger, Lynn)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, [PROPOSED] NOTICE OF ACTION BROUGHT FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY by Plaintiff Randy Dean Paulson (Krieger, Lynn)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, AD INTERIM STIPULATION OF VALUE OF THE VESSEL by Plaintiff Randy Dean Paulson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Randy D. Paulson in support of AD Interim Stipulation)(Krieger, Lynn)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of RANDY D. PAULSON for For Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability against Randy Dean Paulson (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6497503)Attorney Lynn L. Krieger added to party Randy Dean Paulson(pty:pla), filed by Randy Dean Paulson.(Krieger, Lynn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paulson v. No Named Defendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy D. Paulson
Represented By: Lynn L. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: No Named Defendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Fredrick C. Paulson
Represented By: Jason R. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?