Churchill Medical Systems, Inc. v. Rubacha et al

Plaintiff: Churchill Medical Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Ashley Capital LLC, Geary Ryder, Phil Prescott, Stella Sularski, Robert Auskalnis, Sally Leonard, Leslie Hall, Sal Lantieri, Mario Blanco, Thomas Assante, Tina Blanco, Ross Kurz and Paul D Rubacha
Case Number: 1:2019cv00226
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Mayer, Michael)
March 15, 2019 Filing 21 Partial MOTION to Dismiss (Counts II, III, IV, and V) by Defendants Ashley Capital LLC, Thomas Assante, Robert Auskalnis, Mario Blanco, Tina Blanco, Leslie Hall, Ross Kurz, Sal Lantieri, Sally Leonard, Phil Prescott, Paul D Rubacha, Geary Ryder, Stella Sularski. (Mayer, Michael)
February 20, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint (JOINT) by Defendants Phil Prescott, Stella Sularski, Ross Kurz, Sally Leonard, Mario Blanco, Geary Ryder, Paul D Rubacha, Leslie Hall, Sal Lantieri, Robert Auskalnis, Thomas Assante, Tina Blanco, Ashley Capital LLC. Phil Prescott answer due 3/15/2019; Stella Sularski answer due 3/15/2019; Ross Kurz answer due 3/15/2019; Sally Leonard answer due 3/15/2019; Mario Blanco answer due 3/15/2019; Geary Ryder answer due 3/15/2019; Paul D Rubacha answer due 3/15/2019; Leslie Hall answer due 3/15/2019; Sal Lantieri answer due 3/15/2019; Robert Auskalnis answer due 3/15/2019; Thomas Assante answer due 3/15/2019; Tina Blanco answer due 3/15/2019; Ashley Capital LLC answer due 3/15/2019. (Simpson, Kevin)
February 20, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Paul Mayer on behalf of Ashley Capital LLC, Thomas Assante, Robert Auskalnis, Mario Blanco, Tina Blanco, Leslie Hall, Ross Kurz, Sal Lantieri, Sally Leonard, Phil Prescott, Paul D Rubacha, Geary Ryder, Stella SularskiAttorney Michael Paul Mayer added to party Ashley Capital LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Paul Mayer added to party Thomas Assante(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Paul Mayer added to party Robert Auskalnis(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Paul Mayer added to party Mario Blanco(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Paul Mayer added to party Tina Blanco(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Paul Mayer added to party Leslie Hall(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Paul Mayer added to party Ross Kurz(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Paul Mayer added to party Sal Lantieri(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Paul Mayer added to party Sally Leonard(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Paul Mayer added to party Phil Prescott(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Paul Mayer added to party Paul D Rubacha(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Paul Mayer added to party Geary Ryder(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Paul Mayer added to party Stella Sularski(pty:dft) (Mayer, Michael)
February 20, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kevin Paul Simpson on behalf of Ashley Capital LLC, Thomas Assante, Robert Auskalnis, Mario Blanco, Tina Blanco, Leslie Hall, Ross Kurz, Sal Lantieri, Sally Leonard, Phil Prescott, Paul D Rubacha, Geary Ryder, Stella SularskiAttorney Kevin Paul Simpson added to party Ashley Capital LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Paul Simpson added to party Thomas Assante(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Paul Simpson added to party Robert Auskalnis(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Paul Simpson added to party Mario Blanco(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Paul Simpson added to party Tina Blanco(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Paul Simpson added to party Leslie Hall(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Paul Simpson added to party Ross Kurz(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Paul Simpson added to party Sal Lantieri(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Paul Simpson added to party Sally Leonard(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Paul Simpson added to party Phil Prescott(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Paul Simpson added to party Paul D Rubacha(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Paul Simpson added to party Geary Ryder(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Paul Simpson added to party Stella Sularski(pty:dft) (Simpson, Kevin)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/24/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 4/10/2019, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 2/20/2019. (jgonz, )
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER Based upon #15 Plaintiff's Response to February 6, 2019 Order to Show Cause, the Court is satisfied, at this stage of the proceedings, that it appears to have subject matter jurisdiction over this action and #13 Order to Show Cause thus is DISCHARGED. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 2/20/2019. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #13 by Plaintiff Churchill Medical Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1: Annual Report, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2: LLC File Detail)(Kuhn, Michael)
February 15, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick N. Downes on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Patrick N. Downes added to party Churchill Medical Systems, Inc. (pty:pla) (Downes, Patrick)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DISCHARGED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: returnable by Plaintiff why this case should not be remanded due to the Courts lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 2/21/2019. by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 2/6/2019. (jgonz, ) Modified on 2/20/2019 (jgonz, ).
February 5, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Churchill Medical Systems, Inc.. Ross Kurz served on 2/3/2019, answer due 2/25/2019. (Kuhn, Michael)
February 4, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Vygon Corporation for Churchill Medical Systems, Inc.. (Kuhn, Michael)
February 4, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Churchill Medical Systems, Inc.. Robert Auskalnis served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (Kuhn, Michael)
February 4, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Churchill Medical Systems, Inc.. Ashley Capital LLC served on 2/1/2018, answer due 2/22/2018. (Kuhn, Michael)
January 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Paul Forrest Lewis on behalf of Churchill Medical Systems, Inc. Attorney Paul Forrest Lewis added to party Churchill Medical Systems, Inc. (pty:pla) (Lewis, Paul)
January 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew Edward Swan on behalf of Churchill Medical Systems, Inc. Attorney Andrew Edward Swan added to party Churchill Medical Systems, Inc. (pty:pla) (Swan, Andrew)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Michael Dickson Kuhn on behalf of Churchill Medical Systems, Inc. (Kuhn, Michael)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00226-STV. (athom, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Ashley Capital LLC, Thomas Assante, Robert Auskalnis, Mario Blanco, Tina Blanco, Leslie Hall, Ross Kurz, Sal Lantieri, Sally Leonard, Phil Prescott, Paul D Rubacha, Geary Ryder, Stella Sularski (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6503592)Attorney Michael Dickson Kuhn added to party Churchill Medical Systems, Inc. (pty:pla), filed by Churchill Medical Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supply Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Invoice, #3 Exhibit C - Termination Letter, #4 Exhibit D - Demand Letter, #5 Exhibit E - Arbitration Letter, #6 Exhibit F - Arbitration Award, #7 Exhibit G - Order Confirming Award, #8 Summons Ashley Capital, #9 Summons Thomas Assante, #10 Summons Robert Auskalnis, #11 Summons Mario Blanco, #12 Summons Leslie Hall, #13 Summons Ross Kurz, #14 Summons Sal Lantieri, #15 Summons Sally Leonard, #16 Summons Phil Prescott, #17 Summons Paul D. Rubacha, #18 Summons Geary Ryder, #19 Summons Stella Sularski, #20 Summons Tina Blanco, #21 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kuhn, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Churchill Medical Systems, Inc. v. Rubacha et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Capital LLC
Represented By: Kevin Paul Simpson
Represented By: Michael Paul Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geary Ryder
Represented By: Kevin Paul Simpson
Represented By: Michael Paul Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Prescott
Represented By: Kevin Paul Simpson
Represented By: Michael Paul Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stella Sularski
Represented By: Kevin Paul Simpson
Represented By: Michael Paul Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Auskalnis
Represented By: Kevin Paul Simpson
Represented By: Michael Paul Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally Leonard
Represented By: Kevin Paul Simpson
Represented By: Michael Paul Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Hall
Represented By: Kevin Paul Simpson
Represented By: Michael Paul Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sal Lantieri
Represented By: Kevin Paul Simpson
Represented By: Michael Paul Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Blanco
Represented By: Kevin Paul Simpson
Represented By: Michael Paul Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Assante
Represented By: Kevin Paul Simpson
Represented By: Michael Paul Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Blanco
Represented By: Kevin Paul Simpson
Represented By: Michael Paul Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Kurz
Represented By: Kevin Paul Simpson
Represented By: Michael Paul Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul D Rubacha
Represented By: Kevin Paul Simpson
Represented By: Michael Paul Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Churchill Medical Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Dickson Kuhn
Represented By: Patrick N. Downes
Represented By: Andrew Edward Swan
Represented By: Paul Forrest Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?