DC Automotive, Inc. et al v. Kia Motors America, Inc.
Plaintiff: SLT Group VI, Inc. and DC Automotive, Inc.
Defendant: Kia Motors America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00318
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
2 Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM regarding #26 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at April 15, 2019 Scheduling Conference filed by Kia Motors America, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/5/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
April 5, 2019 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at April 15, 2019 Scheduling Conference by Defendant Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Sullivan, John)
April 4, 2019 Filing 25 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs DC Automotive, Inc., SLT Group VI, Inc.. (Castro, Adrian)
April 3, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to #21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Sullivan, John)
March 20, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE to #21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs DC Automotive, Inc., SLT Group VI, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Joyce, Craig)
February 27, 2019 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Greg Grulikowski in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment regarding MOTION for Summary Judgment #21 by Defendant Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Sullivan, John)
February 27, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Sullivan, John)
February 20, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John J. Sullivan on behalf of Kia Motors America, Inc.Attorney John J. Sullivan added to party Kia Motors America, Inc.(pty:dft) (Sullivan, John)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER PRESERVING STATUS QUO granting #17 Stipulated Motion for Entry of Order Preserving Status Quo by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 02/20/2019. Defendant shall not open or approve for opening a new Kia dealership at 1260 S. Colorado Blvd., Denver, Colorado during the pendency of this action without first providing Plaintiffs at least 60 days notice in order to afford Plaintiffs time to seek preliminary injunctive relief, if Plaintiffs so choose. (mdave, )
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM regarding #17 Stipulated MOTION for Order to Preserve Status Quo filed by SLT Group VI, Inc., DC Automotive, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/13/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
February 13, 2019 Filing 17 Stipulated MOTION for Order to Preserve Status Quo by Plaintiffs DC Automotive, Inc., SLT Group VI, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order re Stipulated Motion for Entry of Order Preserving Status Quo)(Castro, Adrian)
February 12, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Kia Motors America, Inc.. Kia Motors America, Inc. answer due 2/27/2019. (Livingston, Jessica)
February 12, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Adrian Peter Castro on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Adrian Peter Castro added to party DC Automotive, Inc. (pty:pla), Attorney Adrian Peter Castro added to party SLT Group VI, Inc.(pty:pla) (Castro, Adrian)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/11/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 4/15/2019 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Craig D. Joyce on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Craig D. Joyce added to party DC Automotive, Inc. (pty:pla), Attorney Craig D. Joyce added to party SLT Group VI, Inc.(pty:pla) (Joyce, Craig)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/8/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
February 7, 2019 Filing 11 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #10 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00318-PAB. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec)
February 7, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec)
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (dbera, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (dbera, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons, Complaint, Exhibits, Attachments upon The Corporation Company on 01/16/2019 (dbera, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief and Damages against Kia Motors America, Inc., SLT Group VI, Inc., filed by DC Automotive, Inc..(dbera, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal, Register of Actions and Party Information by Defendant Kia Motors America, Inc. (Livingston, Jessica)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Kia Motors Corporation, Corporate Parent Hyundai Motor Company for Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Livingston, Jessica)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: EXHIBIT A to #6 Complaint by Defendant Kia Motors America, Inc... (Livingston, Jessica)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kia Motors America, Inc. from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2019CV30165. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6521373), filed by Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Service of Process Transmittal Form, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - District Court Civil Summons, #4 Exhibit D - District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Livingston, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DC Automotive, Inc. et al v. Kia Motors America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SLT Group VI, Inc.
Represented By: Craig D. Joyce
Represented By: Adrian Peter Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DC Automotive, Inc.
Represented By: Craig D. Joyce
Represented By: Adrian Peter Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia Motors America, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Black Livingston
Represented By: John J. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?