B Street Property, LLC v. 7-Eleven, Inc.
Plaintiff: B Street Property, LLC
Defendant: 7-Eleven, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00342
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER: A Scheduling Conference is set for 5/16/2019 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 4/5/19. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. In light of the decline of consent to a magistrate judge by one or more of the parties in this case and its reassignment to this Court, the Scheduling Conference set April 9, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya is VACATED. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1. The parties are directed to jointly contact Chambers by telephone at (303) 844-4694 or by email at Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to obtain a scheduling conference date within 14 days of the date of this order. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 4/2/19. (rbjsec. )
April 2, 2019 Filing 20 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #19 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00342-RBJ. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec)
April 2, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec)
March 29, 2019 Filing 18 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant 7-Eleven, Inc.. (Allen, Emory)
March 29, 2019 Filing 17 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #16 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00342-WYD. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
March 29, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant 7-Eleven, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Allen, Emory)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear by Telephone. The parties shall initiate a conference call and contact chambers, 719-575-0328, at the time of the Scheduling Conference. The parties shall use a LAND LINE; NO CELLULAR, CORDLESS OR SPEAKER PHONES ARE PERMITTED. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/29/19. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 )
March 28, 2019 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone by Defendant 7-Eleven, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) (Allen, Emory)
March 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joshua Thomas Keltner on behalf of B Street Property, LLCAttorney Joshua Thomas Keltner added to party B Street Property, LLC(pty:pla) (Keltner, Joshua)
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alan David Sweetbaum on behalf of B Street Property, LLCAttorney Alan David Sweetbaum added to party B Street Property, LLC(pty:pla) (Sweetbaum, Alan)
February 20, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Seven & i Holdings Co., Ltd., Corporate Parent SEJ Asset Management & Investment Company, Other Affiliate Seven-Eleven Japan Co., Ltd. for 7-Eleven, Inc.. (Allen, Emory)
February 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Filing Current Docket Sheet (Register of Actions) by Defendant 7-Eleven, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Register of Actions)(Allen, Emory)
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Emory Grissom Allen on behalf of 7-Eleven, Inc. (Allen, Emory)
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christopher Richard Ward on behalf of 7-Eleven, Inc.Attorney Christopher Richard Ward added to party 7-Eleven, Inc.(pty:dft) (Ward, Christopher)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/9/2019 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 4/2/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 02/11/2019. (ksena)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (dbera, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (dbera, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against 7-Eleven, Inc., filed by B Street Property, LLC.(dbera, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by 7-ELEVEN INC.(Allen, Emory)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 7-ELEVEN INC from District Court, El Paso County, Colorado, Case Number 2018CV32966. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6525473), filed by 7-ELEVEN INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - B Street's Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Waiver & Accept Service, #3 Exhibit 3 - Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Allen, Emory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B Street Property, LLC v. 7-Eleven, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B Street Property, LLC
Represented By: Alan David Sweetbaum
Represented By: Joshua Thomas Keltner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7-Eleven, Inc.
Represented By: Emory Grissom Allen
Represented By: Christopher Richard Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?