Georgopulos v. PPM Capital, Inc.

Plaintiff: Paul M. Georgopulos
Defendant: PPM Capital, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00347
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
0 Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
1 Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Veronica Lynn Vecchio on behalf of PPM Capital, Inc. (Vecchio, Veronica)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Scheduling Conference set for 4/15/2019 09:00 AM is VACATED and RESET for 4/29/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. The parties may appear telephonically for the Scheduling Conference and shall initiate a conference call amongst all individuals appearing by telephone before calling the Court at 303.335.2365 at the scheduled time. The parties shall file a joint proposed scheduling order on or before 4/22/2019. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/8/2019. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM regarding #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Prepare for Scheduling Conference filed by PPM Capital, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/8/19. Text Only Entry (rkeec)
April 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Prepare for Scheduling Conference by Defendant PPM Capital, Inc.. (Vecchio, Veronica)
April 4, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Paul M. Georgopulos. PPM Capital, Inc. waiver sent on 4/3/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (Sulaiman, Omar)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave. The parties may appear telephonically for the Scheduling Conference and shall initiate a conference call amongst all individuals appearing by telephone before calling the Court at 303.335.2365 at the scheduled time. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/1/2019. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM regarding #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically filed by Paul M. Georgopulos. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/1/19. Text Only Entry (rkeec)
April 1, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically by Plaintiff Paul M. Georgopulos. (Sulaiman, Omar)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/15/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 2/13/2019. (jgonz, )
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for non-dispositive matters. That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows: (1) Convene a scheduling conference under Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2. (2) Conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause. (3) Hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. (4) Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge, or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. It is further ORDERED that parties and counsel shall be familiar and comply with the above judge's requirements found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. By Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/13/19. Text Only Entry (rkeec)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (dbera, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alexander James Taylor on behalf of Paul M. GeorgopulosAttorney Alexander James Taylor added to party Paul M. Georgopulos(pty:pla) (Taylor, Alexander)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Marwan Rocco Daher on behalf of Paul M. GeorgopulosAttorney Marwan Rocco Daher added to party Paul M. Georgopulos(pty:pla) (Daher, Marwan)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Omar Tayseer Sulaiman on behalf of Paul M. Georgopulos (Sulaiman, Omar)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PPM Capital, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6526801)Attorney Omar Tayseer Sulaiman added to party Paul M. Georgopulos(pty:pla), filed by Paul M. Georgopulos. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sulaiman, Omar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Georgopulos v. PPM Capital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PPM Capital, Inc.
Represented By: Veronica Lynn Vecchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul M. Georgopulos
Represented By: Marwan Rocco Daher
Represented By: Omar Tayseer Sulaiman
Represented By: Alexander James Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?