Nakamura v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Karol Nakamura
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00348
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/18/2019. (bwilk, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 24 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Scheduling Conference held on 3/18/2019 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Affirmative Experts due 6/21/2019. Rebuttal Experts due 8/22/2019. Discovery due 9/18/2019. Dispositive Motions due 10/9/2019. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 12/4/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall electronically file their proposed pretrial order through CM/ECF, and include a courtesy copy of the proposed order in a Word format sent by email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, seven days prior to the conference. FTR: Courtroom A-502. (bwilk, )
March 12, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Richard M. Kaudy by Richard Michael Kaudy on behalf of Karol NakamuraAttorney Richard Michael Kaudy added to party Karol Nakamura(pty:pla) (Kaudy, Richard)
March 11, 2019 Filing 22 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Hertzke, Billy-George)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER : Scheduling Conference set for 3/18/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang per Order #10 dated February 15, 2019. Proposed scheduling order due 3/11/2019. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3.8.2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Magistrate Judge Wang is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/8/2019. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
March 7, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Judge Christine M. Arguello for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-348-CMA (angar, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 18 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: Daniel J. Levin.The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (angar, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 17 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #15 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorneyDavid C. Japha.The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (angar, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel J Levin by Don D. Jacobson on behalf of Karol Nakamura (Jacobson, Don)
March 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Don D. Jacobson on behalf of Karol Nakamura (Jacobson, Don)
March 5, 2019 Filing 14 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #13 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00348-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Schultz, Jessica)
February 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joshua David Kohler on behalf of American Family Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney Joshua David Kohler added to party American Family Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Kohler, Joshua)
February 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jessica Rae Schultz on behalf of American Family Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney Jessica Rae Schultz added to party American Family Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Schultz, Jessica)
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by American Family Mutual Insurance Company.(Hertzke, Billy-George)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 3/18/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Consent Form due by 3/4/2019, by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 2/15/2019. (jgonz, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Don D. Jacobson on behalf of Karol NakamuraAttorney Don D. Jacobson added to party Karol Nakamura(pty:pla) (Jacobson, Don)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (dbera, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (dbera, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT ORDER GRANTING Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Plaintiff's Complaint. By Elizabeth Ann Weishaupl, District Court Judge, Arapahoe County on 02/01/2019.(dbera, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint upon Randy Wilson on 01/14/2019 (dbera, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against American Family Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Karol Nakamura.(dbera, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2019CV30055. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6526985), filed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Certification that "Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal" was Filed with State Court, #11 State Court Pleading Index)(Hertzke, Billy-George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nakamura v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karol Nakamura
Represented By: David C. Japha
Represented By: Richard Michael Kaudy
Represented By: Daniel Joel Levin
Represented By: Don D. Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Billy-George Hertzke
Represented By: Jessica Rae Schultz
Represented By: Joshua David Kohler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?