Doig v. Standard Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jason Doig
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00365
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 10 DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR. SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (tsher, ) Modified on 2/15/2019 pursuant to filing error (tsher, ).
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 2/14/2019.Consent Form due by 4/17/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 5/1/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00365-NRN. (athom, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Complaint filed by attorneyMarc Whitehead. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (dbera, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (dbera, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Plaintiff Jason Doig. (Whitehead, Marc)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Standard Insurance Company by Plaintiff Jason Doig. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Whitehead, Marc)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Standard Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6528316)Attorney Marc S. Whitehead added to party Jason Doig(pty:pla), filed by Jason Doig. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Whitehead, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doig v. Standard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Doig
Represented By: Marc S. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?