USA v. 10345 Valor Court, Colorado Springs, Colorado

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: 10345 Valor Court, Colorado Springs, Colorado
Claimant: LeeAnn Martinez
Case Number: 1:2019cv00367
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by LeeAnn Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (athom, )
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 04/09/2019 re: #13 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit filed by LeeAnn Martinez. IT IS ORDERED that the Financial Affidavit [#13 ], filed ex parte on 4/8/2019, is stricken. Under the terms of the prior #11 Order, Ms. Martinez still has until 4/26/2019, to submit an affidavit in proper form. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form)) (athom, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 13 STRICKEN - CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Claimant LeeAnn Martinez. (athom, ) Modified on 4/9/2019 to strike pursuant to #14 Minute Order (athom, ).
April 4, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/4/19 regarding #8 MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel filed by LeeAnn Martinez. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. The government's Amended Motion To Require Claimant Leann Martinez To File Financial Affidavit [#10 ] is granted. The government's Motion To Require Claimant Leann Martinez To File Financial Affidavit [#9 ] is denied as moot. On or before 4/26/2019, plaintiff shall file an affidavit in the form provided by the district court's "Application To Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form)" (AO 239). The government shall file its response to Ms. Martinez's Request for Representation by an Attorney for the Legal Services Corporation [#8 ] on or before 5/10/2019. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 04/03/2019. (athom, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 10 Amended MOTION to Compel Claimant LeeAnn Martinez to File Financial Affidavit by Plaintiff USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Young, Elizabeth)
March 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Compel Claimant Leeann Martinez to File Financial Affidavit by Plaintiff USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Young, Elizabeth)
March 22, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Representation by an Attorney for the Legal Services Corporation by Claimant LeeAnn Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (athom, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 7 CLAIM by Claimant LeeAnn Martinez. (athom, ) Modified on 3/22/2019 to add a Level 1 Restriction (athom, ).
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Complaint for Forfeiture by Plaintiff USA (Young, Elizabeth)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/12/19. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (dbera, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 10345 Valor Court by Plaintiff USA (Young, Elizabeth)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against 10345 Valor Court, Colorado Springs, CO 80925 Attorney Elizabeth Jane Young added to party USA(pty:pla), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Young, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. 10345 Valor Court, Colorado Springs, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 10345 Valor Court, Colorado Springs, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Elizabeth Jane Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: LeeAnn Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?