Stelzer v. Lead Stories LLC

Plaintiff: Brigitte Stelzer
Defendant: Lead Stories LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00473
Filed: February 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED ORDER SETTING Scheduling Conference for 5/13/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 5/6/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 04/05/2019. (ksena)
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant Lead Stories, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses Attorney Justin Tyler Bailey added to party Lead Stories LLC(pty:dft) by Lead Stories LLC.(Bailey, Justin)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/10/2019 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 4/3/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 02/20/2019. (ksena)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE. Case returned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya for all further proceedings. Judge Robert E. Blackburn is no longer assigned to case. (dkals, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (rvill, )
February 17, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
February 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lead Stories LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6537712)Attorney Richard Liebowitz added to party Brigitte Stelzer(pty:pla), filed by Brigitte Stelzer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stelzer v. Lead Stories LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brigitte Stelzer
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lead Stories LLC
Represented By: Justin Tyler Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?