Mooney v. USA

Petitioner: Joseph Michael Mooney
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00490
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 7 Addendum to #6 Supplement, #1 MOTION for Order to by Petitioner Joseph Michael Mooney. (sphil, )
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT to #1 MOTION for Relief from a Void Judgment by Petitioner Joseph Michael Mooney. (sphil, )
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 3/6/2019, re: #4 Motion for Order requesting forms is GRANTED. ORDERED that, Applicant must comply with the Order Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiencies (ECF No. 3) within thirty (30) days from the date of this Minute Order. His failure to do so will result in the dismissal of this action without further notice. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail to Applicant, with a copy of this Minute Order, one copy of the Order Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiencies (ECF No. 3), and one blank copy each of the current Court-approved form Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 and Prisoners Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action, along with the applicable instructions. (Forms mailed as ordered). (sphil, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Order requesting forms by Petitioner Joseph Michael Mooney. (evana, )
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiencies. If Applicant fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/20/20109. ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at ECF No. 1, in light of the Court's instruction herein to file an operative pleading. (Motion #1 Motion for Relief is terminated as per ordered) (sphil, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 F.R.Civ.P. Rule 60(b)(4) Motion for Relief from a Void Judgment by Petitioner Joseph Michael Mooney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(rvill, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mooney v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Michael Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?