Jolley Potter Ranches Energy Co, LLC v. TEP Rocky Mountain LLC
Plaintiff: Jolley Potter Ranches Energy Co LLC and Jolley Potter Ranches Energy Co, LLC
Defendant: TEP Rocky Mountain LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00495
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/10/2019 09:30 AM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. A Scheduling Conference is set in GRAND JUNCTION, Colorado at the Wayne Aspinall Federal Building - United States Courthouse, 400 Rood Avenue, Grand Junction, CO 81501 before U.S. Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. The parties shall comply with the Instructions to Scheduling Order for U.S. Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher which can be found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Parties concerned regarding travel time and expense to Grand Junction for appearances before the Magistrate Judge are referred to this Magistrate Judge's policy in that regard which can be found at the above website. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on April 19, 2019. Text Only Entry (gpgsec, )
April 17, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jolley Potter Ranches Energy Co, LLC. TEP Rocky Mountain LLC waiver sent on 4/3/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (Keever, Nathan)
March 29, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against TEP Rocky Mountain LLC, filed by Jolley Potter Ranches Energy Co, LLC.(Keever, Nathan)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This matter has its factual nexus in Garfield and Rio Blanco Counties. Under the Court's Revised Jury Plan for Random Jury Selection, this case is therefore properly designated for Jury Division 3. Because the jury will be drawn from that Division, it is appropriate that the case be managed, for pretrial purposes, by Magistrate Judge Gallagher in Grand Junction, Colorado. Accordingly, pursuant to D.C.Colo.L.Civ.R 40.1(a), and as approved by the Chief Judge of the Court, the undersigned directs that the Clerk of the Court reassign this action to Magistrate Judge Gallagher as the referral judge. All further pleadings in this case shall reflect the case number of 19-cv-00495-WYD-GPG. by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/25/2019. (evana, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Jolley Potter Ranches Energy Co, LLC (Keever, Nathan)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk to TEP Rocky Mountain, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (nmarb, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to TEP Rocky Mountain LLC by Plaintiff Jolley Potter Ranches Energy Co, LLC. (Keever, Nathan)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for non-dispositive matters. That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows: (1) Convene a scheduling conference under Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2. (2) Conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause. (3) Hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. (4) Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge, or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. It is further ORDERED that parties and counsel shall be familiar and comply with the above judge's requirements found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. By Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/21/19. Text Only Entry (rkeec)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (rroge, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TEP Rocky Mountain LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6540414)Attorney Nathan A. Keever added to party Jolley Potter Ranches Energy Co LLC(pty:pla), filed by Jolley Potter Ranches Energy Co LLC.(Keever, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jolley Potter Ranches Energy Co, LLC v. TEP Rocky Mountain LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jolley Potter Ranches Energy Co LLC
Represented By: Nathan A. Keever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jolley Potter Ranches Energy Co, LLC
Represented By: Nathan A. Keever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEP Rocky Mountain LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?