Viana v. Stencil

Petitioner: Mario Robert Viana
Respondent: M.S. Stencil
Case Number: 1:2019cv00520
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 9 Preliminary RESPONSE to #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus Attorney J. Benedict Garcia added to party M.S. Stencil(pty:res)Attorney J. Benedict Garcia added to party M.S. Stencil(pty:res) by M.S. Stencil. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Garcia, J.)
March 29, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Receipt upon the United States Attorney General re: #7 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court. (sphil, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus, and #6 Order to File Preliminary Response for Service of Process. (Attachments: #1 USPS Certified Mail Receipt) (rvill, )
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to File Preliminary Response. Within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order Respondent shall file a Preliminary Response that complies with this Order. ORDERED that the Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #4 is DENIED as moot, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 3/15/2019. (sphil, )
March 14, 2019 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number cox089387. (sphil, )
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action, by Petitioner Mario Robert Viana. (sphil, )
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiencies. If Applicant fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to mail to Applicant, with a copy of this Order, one blank copy of the form Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/22/2019. (forms mailed as ordered). (sphil, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241, filed by Mario Robert Viana.(rvill, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Viana v. Stencil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mario Robert Viana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: M.S. Stencil
Represented By: J. Benedict Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?