Yert v. Hudgins
Petitioner: Daniel Yert
Respondent: Richard Hudgins
Case Number: 1:2019cv00528
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #5 Order of Dismissal on 3/18/2019. (angar, )
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of Dismissal. Leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied without prejudice to the filing of a motion seeking leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/18/2019. (angar, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number COX089205 (angar, )
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiencies. If Applicant fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty days from the date of this order the action may be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/26/2019. (angar, ) forms mailed as ordered
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241, filed by Daniel Yert. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Applicant's Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241)(rvill, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yert v. Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel Yert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Richard Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?