Mohamed v. Green et al

Petitioner: Daud Ali Mohamed
Respondent: Steve Green and Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Case Number: 1:2019cv00534
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 12 Applicant's REPLY to #11 Attorney General's Pre-Answer Response, by Petitioner Daud Ali Mohamed. (angar, )
March 29, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Order to File Pre-Answer Response by Respondents Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The, Steve GreenAttorney Lisa Kay Michaels added to party Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The(pty:res), Attorney Lisa Kay Michaels added to party Steve Green(pty:res). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Appendix)(Michaels, Lisa)
March 21, 2019 Filing 10 Acknowledgement of Service re: #7 Order on 3/21/2019 by Respondent The Attorney General of the State of Colorado. (agarc, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 9 Acceptance of Service upon Steven Green on 3/20/2019 (angar, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #6 Amended Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #7 Order to File Pre-Answer Response for Service of Process (rroge, )
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to File Pre-Answer Response, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 3/20/2019. (agarc, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254, filed by Daud Ali Mohamed.(angar, )
March 15, 2019 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number COX089404 (angar, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER re: 28 U.S.C. 2254 Filing Fee by Petitioner Daud Ali Mohamed. (angar, )
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiencies. Ordered that Applicant cure the deficiencies designated above within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Any papers that Applicant files in response to this order must include the civil action number on this order. If Applicant fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/25/2019. (agarc, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2254, filed by Daud Ali Mohamed. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(rvill, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohamed v. Green et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steve Green
Represented By: Lisa Kay Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Represented By: Lisa Kay Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daud Ali Mohamed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?