Elite Oil Field Enterprises, Inc. v. Reed et al

Plaintiff: Elite Oil Field Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: Garrett Reed, Element Services, LLC, Garrett (I) Reed, Bond R. Baiamonte, Jhenna Dawn Reed, Reilly Reed, Robert Kubistek and Reedesign Concepts, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00539
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendants Reilly Reed, Jhenna Reed, Robert Kubistek, Element Services, LLC, and Reedesign Concepts, LLC shall answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint on or before 5/13/2019. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/22/2019. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, )
April 19, 2019 Filing 29 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendants Element Services, LLC, Robert Kubistek, Jhenna Dawn Reed, Reilly Reed, Reedesign Concepts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time)(Gragg, Brenton)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER Pursuant to #8 Order, the parties were directed to file the Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form (the "Consent/Non-Consent Form") by 4/11/2019 and to submit a joint proposed scheduling order by 4/18/2019. To date, neither the Consent/Non-Consent Form nor the proposed scheduling order has been filed and certain Defendants have not yet entered their appearances. Accordingly, the Scheduling Conference set for 4/25/2019 09:30 AM, and associated deadlines, are VACATED. A Scheduling Conference is RESET for 6/5/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. The parties shall file the Consent/Non-Consent Form on or before 5/22/2019 and shall submit a joint proposed scheduling order on or before 5/29/2019. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/19/2019. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Defendant Garrett Reed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Garrett Reed)(Gragg, Brenton)
March 28, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons) (jgonz, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Jhenna Dawn Reed re #16 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Elite Oil Field Enterprises, Inc.. (Green, Jersey)
March 27, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Robert Kubistek re #16 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Elite Oil Field Enterprises, Inc.. (Green, Jersey)
March 27, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Reedesign Concepts, LLC re #16 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Elite Oil Field Enterprises, Inc.. (Green, Jersey)
March 27, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Reilly Reed re #16 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Elite Oil Field Enterprises, Inc.. (Green, Jersey)
March 27, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Bond R. Baiamonte re #16 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Elite Oil Field Enterprises, Inc.. (Green, Jersey)
March 27, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Element Services, LLC re #16 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Elite Oil Field Enterprises, Inc.. (Green, Jersey)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying #11 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice as moot, pursuant to the filing of #16 Amended Complaint. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 3/26/2019. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Elite Oil Field Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 413, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 474, #27 Exhibit Exhibit 522)(Green, Jersey)
March 25, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re #16 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Elite Oil Field Enterprises, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint)(Green, Jersey)
March 25, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT Amended Complaint and Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Elite Oil Field Enterprises, Inc..(Green, Jersey)
March 8, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Supplemental Cover Sheet for Notice of Removal by Defendant Garrett Reed (Gragg, Brenton)
March 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Register of Actions in State Court by Defendant Garrett Reed (Gragg, Brenton)
March 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jordan D. Factor on behalf of Garrett Reed, Garrett (I) ReedAttorney Jordan D. Factor added to party Garrett Reed(pty:dft), Attorney Jordan D. Factor added to party Garrett (I) Reed(pty:dft) (Factor, Jordan)
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by James S. Helfrich on behalf of Garrett Reed, Garrett (I) ReedAttorney James S. Helfrich added to party Garrett Reed(pty:dft), Attorney James S. Helfrich added to party Garrett (I) Reed(pty:dft) (Helfrich, James)
March 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Garrett Reed, Garrett (I) Reed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gragg, Brenton)
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Stipulation of Extension of Time by Defendant Garrett Reed (Gragg, Brenton)
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Entry of Appearance by Jersey M. Green on behalf of Elite Oil Field Enterprises, Inc.Attorney Jersey M. Green added to party Elite Oil Field Enterprises, Inc.(pty:pla) (Green, Jersey)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 2/25/2019. Consent Form due by 4/11/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 4/25/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (tsher, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cmadr, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (cmadr, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon Garrett Reed on 1/24/2019 (cmadr, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Garrett Reed, Garrett (I) Reed, filed by Elite Oil Field Enterprises, Inc..(cmadr, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Garrett Reed. (Gragg, Brenton)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Garrett Reed from Weld County District Court, Case Number 2019cv30044. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6548709), filed by Garrett Reed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court Summons, #3 Exhibit Return of Service, #4 Exhibit Articles of Incorporation, #5 Exhibit Civil Case Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit Notice of Removal, #7 Exhibit State Court Case Management Order)(Gragg, Brenton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elite Oil Field Enterprises, Inc. v. Reed et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elite Oil Field Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Jersey M. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrett Reed
Represented By: Brenton Lee Gragg
Represented By: James S. Helfrich
Represented By: Jordan D. Factor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Element Services, LLC
Represented By: Brenton Lee Gragg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrett (I) Reed
Represented By: Brenton Lee Gragg
Represented By: James S. Helfrich
Represented By: Jordan D. Factor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bond R. Baiamonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jhenna Dawn Reed
Represented By: Brenton Lee Gragg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reilly Reed
Represented By: Brenton Lee Gragg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Kubistek
Represented By: Brenton Lee Gragg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reedesign Concepts, LLC
Represented By: Brenton Lee Gragg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?