Parker v. Williams

Petitioner: Keith Parker
Respondent: Dean Williams
Case Number: 1:2019cv00552
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241st
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 11 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #10 ORDER OF DISMISSAL on 4/18/2019. (sphil, )
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241 #1 is denied and the action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to exhaust state court remedies. No certificate of appealability will issue. IFP on appeal is denied, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/18/2019. (sphil, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 9 Preliminary RESPONSE to #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus Attorney James Xavier Quinn added to party Dean Williams(pty:res)Attorney James Xavier Quinn added to party Dean Williams(pty:res) by Dean Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Colorado Cases Search Results, #2 Exhibit B - 2008cv39 & Order)(Quinn, James)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 ACCEPTANCE of Service of Order to file Preliminary Response, and Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus upon Dean Williams, Executive Director on 2/28/2019. (sphil, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #6 Order to File Preliminary Response for Service of Process. (rvill, )
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to File Preliminary Response. Within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order Respondent shall file a Preliminary Response that complies with this Order, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/26/2019. (sphil, )
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/25/2019, re: #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis is GRANTED; #3 Request for Appointment of Counsel is DENIED as premature. (sphil, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Appointment of Counsel by Petitioner Keith Parker. (cmadr, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action by Petitioner Keith Parker. (cmadr, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241, filed by Keith Parker.(cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dean Williams
Represented By: James Xavier Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Keith Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?