USA v. $31,118.60 seized from Wells Fargo Bank Account 6982775279 et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $31,118.60 seized from Wells Fargo Bank Account 6982775279, $200,825.06 seized from U.S. Bank Account 103682728615, All funds in American Funds 401k Account, George Sackey Plan ID BRK12722, 3164 Lynwood Avenue, Highlands Ranch, Colorado 80126, $310,768.61 seized from U.S. Bank Account 103682728672 and All Funds in George Sackey's American Funds Account
Interested Party: Adriana Sackey
Case Number: 1:2019cv00563
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Publication by Plaintiff USA (Attachments: #1 Publication)(Hurd, Laura)
April 11, 2019 Filing 13 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #11 Notice of Entry of Appearance, #12 Claim filed by attorney Heather Mitchell. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures. The address on the docket sheet does not match the address on the document filed) (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (evana, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 12 Third Party CLAIM by Interested Party Adriana Sackey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Claim Form, #2 Exhibit Copies of Checks)(Mitchell, Heather)
April 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Heather McCord Mitchell on behalf of Adriana SackeyAttorney Heather McCord Mitchell added to party Adriana Sackey(pty:ip) (Mitchell, Heather)
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 Amended WARRANT for Arrest of Property IN REM issued (evana, )
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR WARRANT for Arrest of Property IN REM, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/11/2019. (evana, )
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Amended Complaint for Forfeiture by Plaintiff USA (Hurd, Laura)
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against $200,825.06 seized from U.S. Bank Account 103682728615, $31,118.60 seized from Wells Fargo Bank Account 6982775279, $310,768.61 seized from U.S. Bank Account 103682728672, 3164 Lynwood Avenue, Highlands Ranch, Colorado 80126, All funds in American Funds 401k Account, George Sackey Plan ID BRK12722, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #2 Proposed Document)(Hurd, Laura)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Amended Complaint by Plaintiff USA (Attachments: #1 Redline Complaint)(Hurd, Laura)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rroge, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Complaint for Forfeiture by Plaintiff USA (Hurd, Laura)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 3164 Lynwood Avenue by Plaintiff USA (Hurd, Laura)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $200,825.06 seized from U.S. Bank Account 103682728615, $31,118.60 seized from Wells Fargo Bank Account 6982775279, $310,768.61 seized from U.S. Bank Account 103682728672, 3164 Lynwood Avenue, Highlands Ranch, Colorado 80126, All funds in American Funds 401k Account, George Sackey Plan ID BRK12722 Attorney Laura Beth Hurd added to party USA(pty:pla), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #2 Warrant for Arrest of Property, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hurd, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $31,118.60 seized from Wells Fargo Bank Account 6982775279 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $31,118.60 seized from Wells Fargo Bank Account 6982775279
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $200,825.06 seized from U.S. Bank Account 103682728615
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All funds in American Funds 401k Account, George Sackey Plan ID BRK12722
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3164 Lynwood Avenue, Highlands Ranch, Colorado 80126
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $310,768.61 seized from U.S. Bank Account 103682728672
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Funds in George Sackey's American Funds Account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Laura Beth Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Adriana Sackey
Represented By: Heather McCord Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?