Doucette v. Goodrich

Petitioner: Bruce Allen Doucette
Respondent: Barry Goodrich
Case Number: 1:2019cv00566
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241st
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Directing Applicant to File Second Amended Application. The Applications to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Short Form) (ECF Nos. #9 , #13 ) are DENIED as moot because the filing fee has been paid (see ECF No. #1 ). The requests for appointment of counsel and for an evidentiary hearing (ECF Nos. 15, 16) are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as premature. Applicant must comply with this Order Directing Applicant to File Second Amended Application, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/12/2019. (angar, ) forms mailed as ordered
April 11, 2019 Filing 16 Letter re: MOTION for Hearing, by Petitioner Bruce Allen Doucette. (angar, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Appoint Assistance of Counsel for Evidentiary Hearing if Habeas is not Forthwith Awarded, by Petitioner Bruce Allen Doucette. (angar, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Court Order ECF #3 regarding Order to Re-file Case as a Section 2255, by Petitioner Bruce Allen Doucette. (angar, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 13 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Short Form), by Petitioner Bruce Allen Doucette. (angar, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2241,, filed by Bruce Allen Doucette. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(angar, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Mandatory Judicial Notice of Error of Petitioner's Doc #, by Petitioner Bruce Allen Doucette (angar, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Addressed to Bruce Allen Doucette. (angar, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 9 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Short Form), by Petitioner Bruce Allen Doucette. (angar, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #3 Court Order regarding Order to refile Case as a Section 2255, by Petitioner Bruce Allen Doucette. (angar, )
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER. The Motion for Extension of Time to Cure Deficiencies (ECF No. #6 ) is GRANTED as follows. Applicant must comply with the Order to Cure Deficiencies (ECF No. 3) within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Minute Order. Applicants failure to do so will result in the dismissal of this action without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 3/26/2019. (angar, ) copy mailed as ordered to the address listed at #1 -1
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Cure Deficiencies, by Petitioner Bruce Allen Doucette. (angar, )
March 12, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #3 Order to Cure Deficiencies Addressed to Bruce Allen Doucette. (agarc, )
March 12, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus, and 2 Case Assigned to Judge Addressed to Bruce Allen Doucette. (agarc, )
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER o Cure Deficiencies. If Applicant fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/28/2019. (angar, ) Copy sent to Ms. Embry
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241 (Filing fee $ 5, Receipt Number COX089129), filed by Bruce Allen Doucette. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doucette v. Goodrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Barry Goodrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bruce Allen Doucette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?