ETS Logistics Inc. v. UQM Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: ETS Logistics Inc.
Defendant: John E. Sztykiel, Joe Mitchell, Stephen J. Roy, Joseph P. Sellinger, Donald W. Vanlandingham and UQM Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00602
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Securities, Commodities, Exchange
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff ETS Logistics Inc. (Enright, Donald)
March 11, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ETS Logistics Inc.. Joe Mitchell waiver sent on 3/8/2019, answer due 5/7/2019; Stephen J. Roy waiver sent on 3/8/2019, answer due 5/7/2019; Joseph P. Sellinger waiver sent on 3/8/2019, answer due 5/7/2019; John E. Sztykiel waiver sent on 3/8/2019, answer due 5/7/2019; UQM Technologies, Inc. waiver sent on 3/8/2019, answer due 5/7/2019; Donald W. Vanlandingham waiver sent on 3/8/2019, answer due 5/7/2019. (Enright, Donald)
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Wagner, Thomas)
March 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Thomas Hardy Wagner on behalf of All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Franchi Complaint)(Wagner, Thomas)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Thomas Hardy Wagner on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Thomas Hardy Wagner added to party Joe Mitchell(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Hardy Wagner added to party Stephen J. Roy(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Hardy Wagner added to party Joseph P. Sellinger(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Hardy Wagner added to party John E. Sztykiel(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Hardy Wagner added to party UQM Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Hardy Wagner added to party Donald W. Vanlandingham(pty:dft) (Wagner, Thomas)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jeffrey Kenneth Reeser on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Jeffrey Kenneth Reeser added to party Joe Mitchell(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Kenneth Reeser added to party Stephen J. Roy(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Kenneth Reeser added to party Joseph P. Sellinger(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Kenneth Reeser added to party John E. Sztykiel(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Kenneth Reeser added to party UQM Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Kenneth Reeser added to party Donald W. Vanlandingham(pty:dft) (Reeser, Jeffrey)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Isuri Marianne Lawson on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Isuri Marianne Lawson added to party Joe Mitchell(pty:dft), Attorney Isuri Marianne Lawson added to party Stephen J. Roy(pty:dft), Attorney Isuri Marianne Lawson added to party Joseph P. Sellinger(pty:dft), Attorney Isuri Marianne Lawson added to party John E. Sztykiel(pty:dft), Attorney Isuri Marianne Lawson added to party UQM Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Isuri Marianne Lawson added to party Donald W. Vanlandingham(pty:dft) (Lawson, Isuri)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Bryan Michael Westhoff on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Bryan Michael Westhoff added to party Joe Mitchell(pty:dft), Attorney Bryan Michael Westhoff added to party Stephen J. Roy(pty:dft), Attorney Bryan Michael Westhoff added to party Joseph P. Sellinger(pty:dft), Attorney Bryan Michael Westhoff added to party John E. Sztykiel(pty:dft), Attorney Bryan Michael Westhoff added to party UQM Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Bryan Michael Westhoff added to party Donald W. Vanlandingham(pty:dft) (Westhoff, Bryan)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Non-Consent Form, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 3/04/2019. Consent/Non-Consent Form due on or before 5/2/2019. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 5/16/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (slibi, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rroge, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joe Mitchell, Stephen J. Roy, Joseph P. Sellinger, John E. Sztykiel, UQM Technologies, Inc., Donald W. Vanlandingham (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6559829)Attorney Donald James Enright added to party ETS Logistics Inc.(pty:pla), filed by ETS Logistics Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Notice of Related Cases)(Enright, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ETS Logistics Inc. v. UQM Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Sztykiel
Represented By: Bryan Michael Westhoff
Represented By: Thomas Hardy Wagner
Represented By: Isuri Marianne Lawson
Represented By: Jeffrey Kenneth Reeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Mitchell
Represented By: Bryan Michael Westhoff
Represented By: Thomas Hardy Wagner
Represented By: Isuri Marianne Lawson
Represented By: Jeffrey Kenneth Reeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen J. Roy
Represented By: Bryan Michael Westhoff
Represented By: Thomas Hardy Wagner
Represented By: Isuri Marianne Lawson
Represented By: Jeffrey Kenneth Reeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph P. Sellinger
Represented By: Bryan Michael Westhoff
Represented By: Thomas Hardy Wagner
Represented By: Isuri Marianne Lawson
Represented By: Jeffrey Kenneth Reeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald W. Vanlandingham
Represented By: Bryan Michael Westhoff
Represented By: Thomas Hardy Wagner
Represented By: Isuri Marianne Lawson
Represented By: Jeffrey Kenneth Reeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UQM Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Michael Westhoff
Represented By: Thomas Hardy Wagner
Represented By: Isuri Marianne Lawson
Represented By: Jeffrey Kenneth Reeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ETS Logistics Inc.
Represented By: Donald James Enright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?