Bath v. American Express Company et al
Plaintiff: Brian Bath
Defendant: TD Bank, Capital One, Bank of America, Paypal, Inc., Synchrony Bank, Onemain Financial Group LLC, RealPage dba Leasing Desk, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, J.P. Morgan Chase National Corporate Services, American Express Company, First Premier Bank, LexisNexis Risk Solutions Inc. and RealPage
Case Number: 1:2019cv00606
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Filing 110 MEMORANDUM regarding #109 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #4 Complaint, filed by Brian Bath. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/29/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
April 29, 2019 Filing 109 MOTION For Leave to Amend #4 Original Complaint, by Plaintiff Brian Bath. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #2 Proposed Document, #3 Exhibits to proposed document, #4 Envelope)(nmarb, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 108 MEMORANDUM regarding #107 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by First Premier Bank. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/24/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
April 23, 2019 Filing 107 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendant First Premier Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Granting Defendant First Premier Bank's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)(Crocker, Kevin)
April 22, 2019 Filing 106 REPLY to Response to #81 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant RealPage. (Lohr, Jessica)
April 22, 2019 Filing 105 BRIEF in Support of #65 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant American Express Company. (Backer, Kali)
April 22, 2019 Filing 104 BRIEF in Support of #68 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for insufficiency of process filed by Defendant TD Bank. (Melendez, Brian)
April 22, 2019 Filing 103 RESPONSE to #81 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Brian Bath. (cthom, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 102 REPLY to Response to #63 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant LexisNexis Risk Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Llewellyn, Scott)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting #97 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically;granting #99 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. Counsel for Defendants RealPage and American Express may appear telephonically at the 4.24.2019 Status Conference by calling 303.335.2600 at the designated time. All counsel appearing telephonically must coordinate one call between themselves before contacting the court on one line. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4.19.2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
April 19, 2019 Filing 100 MEMORANDUM regarding #99 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at April 24, 2019 Status Conference filed by RealPage. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/19/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
April 19, 2019 Filing 99 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at April 24, 2019 Status Conference by Defendant RealPage. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Motion to Appear, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Lohr, Jessica)
April 19, 2019 Filing 98 MEMORANDUM regarding #97 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Scheduling Conference filed by American Express Company. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/19/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
April 19, 2019 Filing 97 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Scheduling Conference by Defendant American Express Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Taormina, Alisa)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting #93 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. Counsel for TD Bank is granted leave to appear telephonically at the 4/24 Status Conference and must coordinate with other telephonically appearing counsel to call 303.335.2600 at the designed time on one telephone line. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4.19.2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
April 18, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jessica Rose Ellis Lohr on behalf of RealPage Attorney Jessica Rose Ellis Lohr added to party RealPage (pty:dft) (Lohr, Jessica)
April 17, 2019 Filing 94 MEMORANDUM regarding #93 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically filed by TD Bank. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/17/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
April 17, 2019 Filing 93 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically by Defendant TD Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Melendez, Brian)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting #90 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. Counsel for Defendant First Premier Bank may appear telephonically at the 4.24.2019 Status Conference by calling 303.335.2600 at the designated time. All counsel appearing telephonically must coordinate one call between themselves before contacting the court on one line. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4.15.2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 91 MEMORANDUM regarding #90 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at 10:30 A.M., April 24, 2019 Status Conference filed by First Premier Bank. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/15/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
April 14, 2019 Filing 90 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at 10:30 A.M., April 24, 2019 Status Conference by Defendant First Premier Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Granting Defendant First Premier Bank's Unopposed Motion to Appear Telephonically at 10:30 A.M., April 24, 2019 Status Conference)(Crocker, Kevin)
April 9, 2019 Filing 87 RESPONSE to #81 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Brian Bath. (cthom, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 84 MEMORANDUM regarding #83 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Brian Bath. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/9/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
April 8, 2019 Filing 89 RESPONSE to #65 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Plaintiff Brian Bath. (cthom, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 88 RESPONSE to #68 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for insufficiency of process filed by Plaintiff Brian Bath. (cthom, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 86 RESPONSE to #63 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Plaintiff Brian Bath. (cthom, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 85 RESPONSE to #56 Amended MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Brian Bath. (cthom, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 83 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Brian Bath. (cthom, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 82 MEMORANDUM regarding #81 MOTION to Dismiss filed by RealPage. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/2/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
April 1, 2019 Filing 81 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant RealPage. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Raether, Ronald)
April 1, 2019 Filing 80 RESPONSE to #59 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Attorney Ronald I. Raether, Jr added to party RealPage (pty:dft) filed by Defendant RealPage. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Raether, Ronald)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER: This matter is before the Court sua sponte. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment #78 is hereby STRICKEN for failure to provide a separate statement of undisputed material facts as required by Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards (Section IV.B.2 and Exhibit 1), and for failure to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 10.1(e). SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/1/2019. (Text Only Entry ) (rmsec )
April 1, 2019 Filing 78 STRICKEN MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Brian Bath. (cthom, ) Modified on 4/1/2019 (rmsec, ).
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER of Dismissal as to Defendant Capital One, N.A. with Prejudice. ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/1/2019. (cthom, )
March 29, 2019 Filing 76 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by Defendant Capital One. (Schindler, Alan)
March 21, 2019 Filing 75 MEMORANDUM regarding #74 MOTION for Leave to Restrict filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, #72 MOTION to Enforce Settlement filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/21/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
March 21, 2019 Filing 74 MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Elliott, Rebekah)
March 21, 2019 Filing 73 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2: by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, National Association.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C and I)(Elliott, Rebekah)
March 21, 2019 Filing 72 MOTION to Enforce Settlement by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-K)(Elliott, Rebekah)
March 20, 2019 Filing 71 Mail Returned as Undeliverable: 21 Minute Order addressed to Brian Bath. (dkals, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 70 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: ecf 4-19 Addressed to Brian Bath. (cthom, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 69 MEMORANDUM regarding #68 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for insufficiency of process filed by TD Bank. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/18/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
March 15, 2019 Filing 68 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for insufficiency of process by Defendant TD Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Melendez, Brian)
March 14, 2019 Filing 67 MEMORANDUM regarding #63 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by LexisNexis Risk Solutions Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/14/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
March 14, 2019 Filing 66 MEMORANDUM regarding #65 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by American Express Company. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/14/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
March 13, 2019 Filing 65 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant American Express Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Taormina, Alisa)
March 13, 2019 Filing 64 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent LexisNexis Risk Assets, Inc. for LexisNexis Risk Solutions Inc.. (Llewellyn, Scott)
March 13, 2019 Filing 63 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant LexisNexis Risk Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Llewellyn, Scott)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/11/2019. A Status Conference is set for 4/24/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (bwilk, )
March 11, 2019 Filing 61 CLERK'S NOTE REGARDING DEFAULT Default will not be entered as to First Premier Bank, TD Bank, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association re #59 MOTION for Entry of Default as a responsive pleading has been filed, by Clerk. Text Only Entry (cthom, )
March 11, 2019 Filing 60 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to RealPage re #59 MOTION for Entry of Default, by Clerk. Text Only Entry. (cthom, )
March 11, 2019 Filing 59 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Wells Fargo, RealPage, TD Bank, and First Premier Bank by Plaintiff Brian Bath. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(cthom, )
March 11, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Onemain Financial Group LLC by Plaintiff Brian Bath (cthom, )
March 11, 2019 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM regarding #56 Amended MOTION to Dismiss filed by Paypal, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/11/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
March 11, 2019 Filing 56 Amended MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Paypal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pltf's response to conferral email)(Steiner, Jamie)
March 11, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Amanda Catherine Jokerst on behalf of TD BankAttorney Amanda Catherine Jokerst added to party TD Bank(pty:dft) (Jokerst, Amanda)
March 11, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John Roland Chase on behalf of TD BankAttorney John Roland Chase added to party TD Bank(pty:dft) (Chase, John)
March 11, 2019 Filing 53 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #33 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorneyBrian Ross Melendez. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (dkals, )
March 8, 2019 Filing 52 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent American Express Travel Related Service Company, Inc. for American Express Company. (Backer, Kali)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: The Motion to Dismiss #47 , filed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), is before the Court sua sponte for failure to comply with Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards. Specifically, although the Local Rules do not require conferral, the Judge's Civil Practice Standards require a party to confer before filing a motion to dismiss. See Civil Practice Standard IV.M(2)(a). The Motion to Dismiss #47 is therefore DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. If, after meaningful conferral, refiling is appropriate, Defendant American Express Company is granted leave to refile on or before March 13, 2019. Any refiled motion must contain a certificate of conferral.SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/8/2019. (Text Only Entry ) (rmsec )
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: The Motion to Dismiss #34 , filed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), is before the Court sua sponte for failure to comply with Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards. Specifically, although the Local Rules do not require conferral, the Judge's Civil Practice Standards require a party to confer before filing a motion to dismiss. See Civil Practice Standard IV.M(2)(a). The Motion to Dismiss #34 is therefore DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. If, after meaningful conferral, refiling is appropriate, Defendant PayPal, Inc. is granted leave to refile on or before March 13, 2019. Any refiled motion must contain a certificate of conferral. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/8/2019. (Text Only Entry ) (rmsec )
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: The Motion to Dismiss #31 , filed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), is before the Court sua sponte for failure to comply with Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards. Specifically, although the Local Rules do not require conferral, the Judge's Civil Practice Standards require a party to confer before filing a motion to dismiss. See Civil Practice Standard IV.M(2)(a). The Motion to Dismiss #31 is therefore DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. If, after meaningful conferral, refiling is appropriate, Defendant LexisNexis Risk Solutions Inc. is granted leave to refile on or before March 13, 2019. Any refiled motion must contain a certificate of conferral. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/8/2019. (Text Only Entry ) (rmsec )
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER : Dismissal Paper as between Plaintiff and Wells Fargo Bank is due on or before 4/8/2019 per Notice of Settlement #42 . By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3.8.2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
March 8, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant American Express Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Backer, Kali)
March 8, 2019 Filing 46 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Elliott, Rebekah)
March 8, 2019 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM regarding #31 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by LexisNexis Risk Solutions Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/8/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
March 8, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE Consent to Removal by Defendant American Express Company (Backer, Kali)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER striking #32 Motion to Dismiss. It is duplicitous to #31 . SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/8/2019. (Text Only Entry ) (rmsec )
March 8, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Elliott, Rebekah)
March 8, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Dismissal of Bank of America with Prejudice by Plaintiff Brian Bath (dkals, )
March 8, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE Consent to Removal by Defendant TD Bank (Melendez, Brian)
March 8, 2019 Filing 39 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate TD Bank US Holding Company, Other Affiliate TD Group US Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Toronto-Dominion Bank, The for TD Bank. (Melendez, Brian)
March 8, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kali R. Backer on behalf of American Express CompanyAttorney Kali R. Backer added to party American Express Company(pty:dft) (Backer, Kali)
March 8, 2019 Filing 37 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #32 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by attorneyScott F. Llewellyn.Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. (Text Only Entry) (dkals, )
March 8, 2019 Filing 36 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #31 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by attorneyScott F. Llewellyn.The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (dkals, )
March 8, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sarah E. Barr on behalf of LexisNexis Risk Solutions Inc. (Barr, Sarah)
March 8, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Paypal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Motion to Dismiss)(Steiner, Jamie)
March 8, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brian Ross Melendez on behalf of TD BankAttorney Brian Ross Melendez added to party TD Bank(pty:dft) (Melendez, Brian)
March 8, 2019 Filing 32 STRICKEN MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant LexisNexis Risk Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Motion to Dismiss)(Llewellyn, Scott) Modified on 3/8/2019 (rmsec, ).
March 8, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant LexisNexis Risk Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Motion to Dismiss)(Barr, Sarah) Modified on 3/8/2019 (rmsec, ).
March 8, 2019 Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Crocker, Kevin)
March 8, 2019 Filing 29 Original ANSWER to #4 Complaint, by First Premier Bank.(Crocker, Kevin)
March 8, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,, Consent to Removal by Defendant First Premier Bank (Crocker, Kevin)
March 8, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Defendant First Premier Bank by Kevin Thomas Crocker on behalf of First Premier BankAttorney Kevin Thomas Crocker added to party First Premier Bank(pty:dft) (Crocker, Kevin)
March 7, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE CONSENT TO REMOVAL by Defendant LexisNexis Risk Solutions Inc. (Llewellyn, Scott)
March 7, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Scott F. Llewellyn on behalf of LexisNexis Risk Solutions Inc.Attorney Scott F. Llewellyn added to party LexisNexis Risk Solutions Inc.(pty:dft) (Llewellyn, Scott)
March 5, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alisa Marie Taormina on behalf of American Express CompanyAttorney Alisa Marie Taormina added to party American Express Company(pty:dft) (Taormina, Alisa)
March 5, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brian Charles Frontino on behalf of American Express CompanyAttorney Brian Charles Frontino added to party American Express Company(pty:dft) (Frontino, Brian)
March 4, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rebekah Lee Wallace Elliott on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, National AssociationAttorney Rebekah Lee Wallace Elliott added to party Wells Fargo Bank, National Association(pty:dft) (Elliott, Rebekah)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/4/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/4/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
March 1, 2019 Filing 19 STATE COURT ORDER: Notice of Settlement filed February 27, 2019 by Denver County District Court Judge Michael Anthony Martinez on 2/28/2019. (rroge, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 18 STATE COURT ORDER Granting Motion for Extension of Time for PayPal, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Denver County District Court Judge Michael Anthony Martinez on 2/27/2019. (rroge, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 17 STATE COURT ORDER Granting Motion for Extension of Time for LexisNexis Risk Solutions Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Denver County District Court Judge Michael Martinez on 02/26/2019. (rroge, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon PayPal, Inc. on 2/6/2019 (rroge, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. on 2/6/2019 (rroge, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon TD Bank on 2/7/2019 (rroge, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Synchrony Bank on 2/7/2019 (rroge, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Real Page on 2/7/2019 (rroge, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc. on 2/6/2019 (rroge, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon First Premier Bank on 2/7/2019 (rroge, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Capital One on 2/6/2019 (rroge, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Bank of America on 2/7/2019 (rroge, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon American Express Company on 2/6/2019 (rroge, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rroge, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT for Theft, Fraud and Conversion against American Express Company, Bank of America, Capital One, First Premier Bank, J.P. Morgan Chase National Corporate Services, LexisNexis Risk Solutions Inc., Onemain Financial Group LLC, Paypal, Inc., RealPage, Synchrony Bank, TD Bank, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, filed by Brian Bath.(rroge, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rroge, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent PayPal Holdings, Inc. for Paypal, Inc.. (Steiner, Jamie)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Paypal, Inc. from Denver District Court, Case Number 2019CV61. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6560356), filed by Paypal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Denver District Court Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Attachments to Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Delay Reduction Order, #5 Exhibit B - ATTACHMENT_TO_MOTION_TO_FILE_WITHOUT_PAYMENT_OF_FILING_FEE, #6 Exhibit B- PROPOSED__FINDING_AND_ORDER_CONCERNING_PAYMENT_OF_FILING_FEES, #7 Exhibit B - District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #8 Exhibit B- Finding_and_Order_Concerning_Payment_of_Fees, #9 Exhibit B- MOTION_TO_FILE_WITHOUT_PAYMENT_OF_FILING_FEE__WAIVE_OTHER_COSTS_OWED_TO_THE_STATE_AND_SUPPORTING_FINANCIAL_AFFIDAVIT, #10 Exhibit B- Summons, #11 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service American Express, #12 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service Bank of America, #13 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service Capital One, #14 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service First Premier Bank, #15 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service LexisNexis Risk Solutions, #16 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service Real Page, #17 Exhibit B- Affidavit of Service Synchrony Bank, #18 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service TD Bank, #19 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service Wells Fargo Bank, #20 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service on PayPal Inc., #21 Exhibit B - Notice of Settlement, #22 Exhibit B - Motion for Extension of Time LexisNexis Risk Solutions, #23 Exhibit B - Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time, #24 Exhibit B - Motion for Extension of Time, #25 Exhibit B - Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time, #26 Exhibit B - Motion for Extension of Time - PayPal, #27 Exhibit B - Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time, #28 Exhibit B - Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time, #29 Exhibit B - Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time - PayPal, #30 Exhibit B - Notice of Settlement, #31 Exhibit B - Order Granting Motion for Extension - PayPal, #32 Exhibit B - Order Notice of Settlement file February 27, 2019, #33 Exhibit C - Secretary of State Info, #34 Civil Cover Sheet)(Steiner, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bath v. American Express Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Bank
Represented By: John Roland Chase
Represented By: Brian Ross Melendez
Represented By: Amanda Catherine Jokerst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One
Represented By: Alan Daniel Schindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paypal, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie H. Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onemain Financial Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RealPage dba Leasing Desk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Rebekah Lee Wallace Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase National Corporate Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Company
Represented By: Alisa Marie Taormina
Represented By: Brian Charles Frontino
Represented By: Kali R. Backer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Premier Bank
Represented By: Kevin Thomas Crocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LexisNexis Risk Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Scott F. Llewellyn
Represented By: Sarah E. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RealPage
Represented By: Jessica Rose Ellis Lohr
Represented By: Ronald I. Raether, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Bath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?