Levin v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Barry E Levin
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00615
Filed: March 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/25/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
April 23, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00615-PAB. (athom, )
April 23, 2019 Filing 9 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #8 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00615-REB. (Text Only Entry) (tsher, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America All parties do not consent.. (Englert, Jack)
April 18, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint of Plaintiff Barry E. Levin by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. Life Insurance Company of North America answer due 5/9/2019. (Englert, Jack)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Non-Consent Form, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 3/05/2019. Consent/Non-Consent Form due on or before 4/30/2019. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 5/14/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (slibi, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
March 2, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
March 2, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America, filed by Barry E Levin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Krieger, Michael)
March 2, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Life Insurance Company of North America re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Barry E Levin. (Krieger, Michael)
March 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6561133)Attorney Michael Scott Krieger added to party Barry E Levin(pty:pla), filed by Barry E Levin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Krieger, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levin v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Jack M. Englert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry E Levin
Represented By: Michael Scott Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?