Blunt v. US Department of Education et al
Plaintiff: Tonya Blunt
Defendant: U.S. Dept. of Education, Commissioner, Social Security Administration, US Department of Education and US Department of the Treasury
Interested Party: USAO-SS-Noticing and SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2019cv00625
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Filing 11 Motion for Leave to Amend/ OBJECTION to #10 Report and Recommendations filed by Plaintiff Tonya Blunt. (angar, )
April 19, 2019 Filing 10 RECOMMENDATION to Dismiss in Part and to Draw Case, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/19/2019. (angar, )
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER of Reference to United States Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/18/2019. (angar, ) All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-625-LTB-GPG
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1, the Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. The undersigned will remain as the assigned magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/18/2019. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-625-LTB (angar, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by J. Benedict Garcia on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security AdministrationAttorney J. Benedict Garcia added to party Commissioner, Social Security Administration(pty:dft) (Garcia, J.)
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 Additional Documents, by Plaintiff Tonya Blunt. (angar, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against US Department of Education, and US Department of the Treasury, filed by Tonya Blunt.(agarc, )
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #2 Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 3/5/2019. (angar, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Tonya Blunt. (cmadr, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Judicial Review of Social Security Decision against Commissioner, Social Security Administration, U.S. Dept. of Education, filed by Tonya Blunt.(cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blunt v. US Department of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Blunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USAO-SS-Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Dept. of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Represented By: J. Benedict Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of the Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?