Trevor v. HealthOne et al
Plaintiff: L Jones Trevor and Trevor L. Jones
Defendant: Jeffrey Pickard, HealthOne d/b/a The Colorado Health Foundation, Glenn Levy, Brian G Dwinnell, HealthOne and HealthOne a Colorado nonprofit corporation doing business as Colorado Health Foundation, The
Case Number: 1:2019cv00629
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: FMLA
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER: A Scheduling Conference is set for 5/28/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. Attorney Michael Petitti may appear telephonically by contacting chambers at (303) 844-4694. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 4/15/19. (rbjsec. )
April 10, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael J. Petitti, Jr on behalf of Trevor L. JonesAttorney Michael J. Petitti, Jr added to party Trevor L. Jones(pty:pla) (Petitti, Michael)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. The conference shall be held in Courtroom A-902, Alfred A. Arraj U.S. Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. The parties are directed to jointly contact Chambers by telephone at (303) 844-4694 or by email at Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to obtain a scheduling conference date. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/28/19. (rbjsec. )
March 28, 2019 Filing 21 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #19 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00629-RBJ. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/28/19 re: #19 Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by Trevor L. Jones. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case shall be assigned to a District Judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(8) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a). (nmarb, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 19 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Trevor L. Jones All parties do not consent.. (Kovacevic, Miro)
March 11, 2019 Filing 18 Defendants' ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by Brian G Dwinnell, HealthOne, Glenn Levy, Jeffrey Pickard.(Bleuze, Nathalie)
March 8, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Miro Kovacevic on behalf of Trevor L. JonesAttorney Miro Kovacevic added to party Trevor L. Jones(pty:pla) (Kovacevic, Miro)
March 5, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nathalie Anne Bleuze on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Nathalie Anne Bleuze added to party Brian G Dwinnell(pty:dft), Attorney Nathalie Anne Bleuze added to party HealthOne(pty:dft), Attorney Nathalie Anne Bleuze added to party Glenn Levy(pty:dft), Attorney Nathalie Anne Bleuze added to party Jeffrey Pickard(pty:dft) (Bleuze, Nathalie)
March 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sterling J. LeBoeuf on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Sterling J. LeBoeuf added to party Brian G Dwinnell(pty:dft), Attorney Sterling J. LeBoeuf added to party HealthOne(pty:dft), Attorney Sterling J. LeBoeuf added to party Glenn Levy(pty:dft), Attorney Sterling J. LeBoeuf added to party Jeffrey Pickard(pty:dft) (LeBoeuf, Sterling)
March 5, 2019 Filing 14 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rkeec)
March 5, 2019 Filing 13 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #12 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00629-KLM. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec)
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec)
March 4, 2019 Filing 11 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Brian G Dwinnell, HealthOne, Glenn Levy, Jeffrey Pickard, filed by Trevor L. Jones.(rroge, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 STATE COURT ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (w/attach) by Denver District Court Judge Ross B Buchanan on 02/21/2019. (rroge, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 9 Defendants' ANSWER to #8 First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by Brian G Dwinnell, HealthOne, Glenn Levy, Jeffrey Pickard.(rroge, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Brian G Dwinnell, HealthOne, Glenn Levy, Jeffrey Pickard, filed by Trevor L. Jones.(rroge, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to #4 Complaint and Jury Demand by Brian G Dwinnell, HealthOne, Glenn Levy, Jeffrey Pickard.(rroge, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rroge, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Brian G Dwinnell, HealthOne, Glenn Levy, Jeffrey Pickard, filed by Trevor L. Jones.(rroge, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rroge, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Painter, Brett)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Brian G Dwinnell, Jeffrey Pickard, HealthOne d/b/a The Colorado Health Foundation, Glenn Levy from District Court, City and County of Denver, Case Number 2018CV32237. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6562953), filed by Brian G Dwinnell, Jeffrey Pickard, HealthOne d/b/a The Colorado Health Foundation, Glenn Levy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Painter, Brett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trevor v. HealthOne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Pickard
Represented By: Brett C. Painter
Represented By: Nathalie Anne Bleuze
Represented By: Sterling J. LeBoeuf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HealthOne d/b/a The Colorado Health Foundation
Represented By: Brett C. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Levy
Represented By: Brett C. Painter
Represented By: Nathalie Anne Bleuze
Represented By: Sterling J. LeBoeuf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian G Dwinnell
Represented By: Brett C. Painter
Represented By: Nathalie Anne Bleuze
Represented By: Sterling J. LeBoeuf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HealthOne
Represented By: Brett C. Painter
Represented By: Nathalie Anne Bleuze
Represented By: Sterling J. LeBoeuf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HealthOne a Colorado nonprofit corporation doing business as Colorado Health Foundation, The
Represented By: Brett C. Painter
Represented By: Nathalie Anne Bleuze
Represented By: Sterling J. LeBoeuf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L Jones Trevor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor L. Jones
Represented By: Miro Kovacevic
Represented By: Michael J. Petitti, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?