Security Water District et al v. USA
Plaintiff: Pikes Peak Community Foundation and Security Water District
Defendant: United States of America and USA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00649
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:2674
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER granting #10 Motion to Stay Proceedings and Vacate Scheduling Conference. The case is stayed pending a ruling by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation as to whether this case will be transferred to the to the District of South Carolina pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 8. The parties shall file a status report within ten days of ruing by the Panel if the case will not be transferred. The Scheduling Conference set for May 13, 2019, is vacated. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/2/19. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
May 2, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM regarding #10 MOTION to Stay and Vacate Scheduling Conference filed by USA. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/2/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2018 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/ 2/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Magistrate Judge Tafoya, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/2/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 14 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #13 Non-Consent Form. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00649-WJM. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #7 Magistrate Judge Election Concerning Non-Consent by Plaintiffs Pikes Peak Community Foundation, Security Water District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Election Concerning Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction)(Clark, Scott)
April 23, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Good Faith Conference re: #10 MOTION to Stay and Vacate Scheduling Conference by Defendant USA. (Shirazi, Sam)
April 23, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service by Plaintiffs Pikes Peak Community Foundation, Security Water District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Clark, Scott)
April 11, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Stay and Vacate Scheduling Conference by Defendant USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 CTO 8)(Shirazi, Sam) (Modified on 4/11/2019 added Unopposed to the title)(evana, ).
April 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sam Shirazi on behalf of USAAttorney Sam Shirazi added to party USA(pty:dft) (Shirazi, Sam)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 5/13/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 5/6/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 03/12/2019. (ksena)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, )
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00649-KMT. (athom, )
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF PIKES PEAK COMMUNITY FOUNDATION'S FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES by Plaintiffs Pikes Peak Community Foundation, Security Water District (Clark, Scott)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE (SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION) by Plaintiffs Pikes Peak Community Foundation, Security Water District (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Clark, Scott)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6565889)Attorney Scott A. Clark added to party Pikes Peak Community Foundation(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A. Clark added to party Security Water District(pty:pla), filed by Security Water District, Pikes Peak Community Foundation.(Clark, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Security Water District et al v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pikes Peak Community Foundation
Represented By: Scott A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Security Water District
Represented By: Scott A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Sam Shirazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?