L.B. Doe 1 et al v. United States Olympic Committee et al
Plaintiff: Jane A.C. Doe 27, Jane I.B. Doe 11, Jane D.C. Doe 25, Jane A.B. Doe 35, Jane K.W. Doe 33, Jane A.B. Doe 37, Jane S.W. Doe 8, Jane A.C. Doe 43, Jane D.C. Doe 50, Jane A.G. Doe 45, Jane A.H. Doe 28, Jane A.P. Doe 38, Jane J.K. Doe 21, Jane A.K. Doe 23, Jane A.B. Doe 14, Jane A.B. Doe 48, Jane K.C. Doe 26, Jane L.C. Doe 41, Jane K.B. Doe 17, Jane A.D. Doe 2, Jane B.M. Doe 15, Jane T.J. Doe 5, Jane L.N. Doe 31, Jane L.W. Doe 42, Jane L.B. Doe 1, Jane J.S. Doe 36, Jane K.R. Doe 20, Jane R.B. Doe 24, Jane E.A. Doe 46, Jane K.O. Doe 12, Jane M.O. Doe 40, Jane L.H. Doe 4, Jane T.G. Doe 18, Jane M.D. Doe 3, Jane S.B. Doe 13, Jane E.H. Doe 16, Jane G.S. Doe 29, Jane L.K. Doe 30, Jane S.N. Doe 6, Jane D.Z. Doe 9, Jane S.R. Doe 32, Jane C.P. Doe 22, Jane N.C. Doe 34, Jane M.B. Doe 51, Jane M.K. Doe 19, Jane R.D. Doe 49, Jane A.H. Doe 10, Jane R.V. Doe 47, Jane K.C. Doe 39, Jane R.H. Doe 44, Jane T.O. Doe 7, John A.C. Doe 43, Mary N.F. Doe 23, Mary R.D. Doe 49, Mary D.C. Doe 50, John M.B. Doe 51 and Mary T.K. Doe 21
Defendant: Angela M. Ruggiero, William C. Marlot, James M. Benson, Nina M. Kemppel, Anita L. DeFrantz, Susanne D. Lyons, Scott Blackmun, Robert Bowlsby, James L. Easton, Larry Buendorf, Steven M. Mesler, Robert L. Wood, United States Olympic Committee, Lawrence F. Probst, John S. Hendricks, Mary R. McCagg, Alan Ashley, Kevin M. White, Pisei Whitney Ping, Ursula M. Burns, Daniel L. Doctoroff, Robert J. Bach and Dave W. Ogrean
Case Number: 1:2019cv00737
Filed: March 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 36:220501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/22/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
May 21, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-737-PAB (angar, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 18 CASE REASSIGNED. All parties do not consent pursuant to #17 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00737-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (agarc, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 17 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs Jane A.B. Doe 14, Jane A.B. Doe 35, Jane A.B. Doe 37, Jane A.B. Doe 48, Jane A.C. Doe 27, Jane A.D. Doe 2, Jane A.G. Doe 45, Jane A.H. Doe 10, Jane A.H. Doe 28, Jane A.P. Doe 38, Jane B.M. Doe 15, Jane C.P. Doe 22, Jane D.C. Doe 25, Jane D.Z. Doe 9, Mary T.K. Doe 21, Mary N.F. Doe 23, John A.C. Doe 43, Mary R.D. Doe 49, Mary D.C. Doe 50, John M.B. Doe 51, Jane E.A. Doe 46, Jane E.H. Doe 16, Jane G.S. Doe 29, Jane I.B. Doe 11, Jane J.S. Doe 36, Jane K.B. Doe 17, Jane K.C. Doe 26, Jane K.C. Doe 39, Jane K.O. Doe 12, Jane K.R. Doe 20, Jane K.W. Doe 33, Jane L.B. Doe 1, Jane L.C. Doe 41, Jane L.H. Doe 4, Jane L.K. Doe 30, Jane L.N. Doe 31, Jane L.W. Doe 42, Jane M.D. Doe 3, Jane M.K. Doe 19, Jane M.O. Doe 40, Jane N.C. Doe 34, Jane R.B. Doe 24, Jane R.H. Doe 44, Jane R.V. Doe 47, Jane S.B. Doe 13, Jane S.N. Doe 6, Jane S.R. Doe 32, Jane S.W. Doe 8, Jane T.G. Doe 18, Jane T.J. Doe 5, Jane T.O. Doe 7 All parties do not consent.. (Andrus, Vance)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER: The Scheduling Conference set for 6/10/2019 is VACATED. No later than 5/17/2019, the parties shall complete and file the Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction indicating either unanimous consent of the parties or that consent has been declined. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/10/19. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 )
May 9, 2019 Filing 15 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Christopher Y. L. Yeung attempted to enter his appearance in this case by affixing his " s/ " signature to the Document No. 13. Mr. Yeung does not appear on the Court's attorney roll as a member of the bar of this court. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a)(5), his purported appearance will not be recognized. (Text Only Entry) (mfred)
May 7, 2019 Filing 14 Exhibits in Support of #13 Stipulation,,,, and Notice of Order Entered by the U.S. Bankruptcy Court of Southern District of Indiana by Plaintiffs Jane A.B. Doe 14, Jane A.B. Doe 35, Jane A.B. Doe 37, Jane A.B. Doe 48, Jane A.C. Doe 27, Jane A.D. Doe 2, Jane A.G. Doe 45, Jane A.H. Doe 10, Jane A.H. Doe 28, Jane A.P. Doe 38, Jane B.M. Doe 15, Jane C.P. Doe 22, Jane D.C. Doe 25, Jane D.Z. Doe 9, Mary T.K. Doe 21, Mary N.F. Doe 23, John A.C. Doe 43, Mary R.D. Doe 49, Mary D.C. Doe 50, John M.B. Doe 51, Jane E.A. Doe 46, Jane E.H. Doe 16, Jane G.S. Doe 29, Jane I.B. Doe 11, Jane J.S. Doe 36, Jane K.B. Doe 17, Jane K.C. Doe 26, Jane K.C. Doe 39, Jane K.O. Doe 12, Jane K.R. Doe 20, Jane K.W. Doe 33, Jane L.B. Doe 1, Jane L.C. Doe 41, Jane L.H. Doe 4, Jane L.K. Doe 30, Jane L.N. Doe 31, Jane L.W. Doe 42, Jane M.D. Doe 3, Jane M.K. Doe 19, Jane M.O. Doe 40, Jane N.C. Doe 34, Jane R.B. Doe 24, Jane R.H. Doe 44, Jane R.V. Doe 47, Jane S.B. Doe 13, Jane S.N. Doe 6, Jane S.R. Doe 32, Jane S.W. Doe 8, Jane T.G. Doe 18, Jane T.J. Doe 5, Jane T.O. Doe 7. (Andrus, Vance)
May 3, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION and Notice of Order Entered by the U.S. Bankruptcy Court of Southern District of Indiana by Plaintiffs Jane A.B. Doe 14, Jane A.B. Doe 35, Jane A.B. Doe 37, Jane A.B. Doe 48, Jane A.C. Doe 27, Jane A.D. Doe 2, Jane A.G. Doe 45, Jane A.H. Doe 10, Jane A.H. Doe 28, Jane A.P. Doe 38, Jane B.M. Doe 15, Jane C.P. Doe 22, Jane D.C. Doe 25, Jane D.Z. Doe 9, Mary T.K. Doe 21, Mary N.F. Doe 23, John A.C. Doe 43, Mary R.D. Doe 49, Mary D.C. Doe 50, John M.B. Doe 51, Jane E.A. Doe 46, Jane E.H. Doe 16, Jane G.S. Doe 29, Jane I.B. Doe 11, Jane J.S. Doe 36, Jane K.B. Doe 17, Jane K.C. Doe 26, Jane K.C. Doe 39, Jane K.O. Doe 12, Jane K.R. Doe 20, Jane K.W. Doe 33, Jane L.B. Doe 1, Jane L.C. Doe 41, Jane L.H. Doe 4, Jane L.K. Doe 30, Jane L.N. Doe 31, Jane L.W. Doe 42, Jane M.D. Doe 3, Jane M.K. Doe 19, Jane M.O. Doe 40, Jane N.C. Doe 34, Jane R.B. Doe 24, Jane R.H. Doe 44, Jane R.V. Doe 47, Jane S.B. Doe 13, Jane S.N. Doe 6, Jane S.R. Doe 32, Jane S.W. Doe 8, Jane T.G. Doe 18, Jane T.J. Doe 5, Jane T.O. Doe 7. (Andrus, Vance)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED ORDER SETTING Scheduling Conference for 6/10/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 6/3/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 04/02/2019. (ksena)
March 29, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jane D.Z. Doe 9, Jane A.H. Doe 10, Jane M.O. Doe 40, Jane A.B. Doe 48, Jane M.D. Doe 3, Mary R.D. Doe 49, Mary T.K. Doe 21, Jane S.R. Doe 32, Jane L.H. Doe 4, John M.B. Doe 51, Jane N.C. Doe 34, Jane A.P. Doe 38, Jane S.W. Doe 8, Jane K.O. Doe 12, Jane D.C. Doe 25, Jane S.N. Doe 6, Jane L.W. Doe 42, Jane A.C. Doe 27, Jane E.H. Doe 16, Jane L.C. Doe 41, Jane T.G. Doe 18, Jane A.B. Doe 35, Jane G.S. Doe 29, Jane A.B. Doe 37, Jane K.W. Doe 33, John A.C. Doe 43, Jane C.P. Doe 22, Mary D.C. Doe 50, Jane K.C. Doe 39, Jane L.N. Doe 31, Jane R.H. Doe 44, Jane R.V. Doe 47, Jane A.G. Doe 45, Jane T.O. Doe 7, Jane A.D. Doe 2, Jane T.J. Doe 5, Jane K.B. Doe 17, Jane E.A. Doe 46, Jane J.S. Doe 36, Jane K.C. Doe 26, Jane L.B. Doe 1, Jane L.K. Doe 30, Jane M.K. Doe 19, Mary N.F. Doe 23, Jane S.B. Doe 13, Jane A.H. Doe 28, Jane R.B. Doe 24, Jane B.M. Doe 15, Jane I.B. Doe 11, Jane A.B. Doe 14, Jane K.R. Doe 20. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service - Alan Ashley, #2 Waiver of Service - Angela M. Ruggiero, #3 Waiver of Service - Anita L. DeFrantz, #4 Waiver of Service - Daniel L. Doctoroff, #5 Waiver of Service - Dave W. Ogrean, #6 Waiver of Service - James L. Easton, #7 Waiver of Service - James M. Benson, #8 Waiver of Service - John S. Hendricks, #9 Waiver of Service - Kevin M. White, #10 Waiver of Service - Larry Buendorf, #11 Waiver of Service - Lawrence F. Probst, #12 Waiver of Service - Mary R. McCagg, #13 Waiver of Service - Nina M. Kemppel, #14 Waiver of Service - Pisei Whitney Ping, #15 Waiver of Service - Robert Bowlsby, #16 Waiver of Service - Robert J. Bach, #17 Waiver of Service - Robert L. Wood, #18 Waiver of Service - Scott Blackmun, #19 Waiver of Service - Steven M. Mesler, #20 Waiver of Service - Susanne D. Lyons, #21 Waiver of Service - Ursula M. Burns, #22 Waiver of Service - William C. Marlot)(Andrus, Vance)
March 27, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk as to United States Olympic Committee, (Attachments: #1 Summons Lawrence F. Probst, #2 Summons Robert J. Bach, #3 Summons James M. Benson, #4 Summons Robert Bowlsby, #5 Summons Ursula M. Burns, #6 Summons Anita L. DeFrantz, #7 Summons Daniel L. Doctoroff, #8 Summons James L. Easton, #9 Summons John S. Hendricks, #10 Summons Nina M. Kemppel, #11 Summons Susanne D. Lyons, #12 Summons William C. Marlot, #13 Summons Mary R. McCagg, #14 Summons Steven M. Mesler, #15 Summons Dave W. Orgean, #16 Summons Pisei Whitney Ping, #17 Summons Angela M. Ruggeiro, #18 Summons Kevin White, #19 Summons Robert L. Wood, #20 Summons Scott Blackmun, #21 Summons Alan Ashley, #22 Summons Larry Buendorf, #23 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jgonz, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS REQUEST as to United States Olympic Committee, Lawrence F. Probst, Robert J. Bach, James M. Benson, Robert Bowlsby, Ursula M. Burns, Anita L. DeFrantz, Daniel L. Doctoroff, James L. Easton, John S. Hendricks, Nina M. Kemppel, Susanne D. Lyons, William C. Marlot, Mary R. McCagg, Steven M. Mesler, Dave W. Orgrean, Pisei Whitney Ping, Angela M. Ruggiero, Kevin M. White, Robert L. Wood, Scott Blackmun, Alan Ashley, Larry Buendorf re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Jane A.B. Doe 14, Jane A.B. Doe 35, Jane A.B. Doe 37, Jane A.B. Doe 48, Jane A.C. Doe 27, Jane A.C. Doe 43, Jane A.D. Doe 2, Jane A.G. Doe 45, Jane A.H. Doe 10, Jane A.H. Doe 28, Jane A.K. Doe 23, Jane A.P. Doe 38, Jane B.M. Doe 15, Jane C.P. Doe 22, Jane D.C. Doe 25, Jane D.C. Doe 50, Jane D.Z. Doe 9, Jane E.A. Doe 46, Jane E.H. Doe 16, Jane G.S. Doe 29, Jane I.B. Doe 11, Jane J.K. Doe 21, Jane J.S. Doe 36, Jane K.B. Doe 17, Jane K.C. Doe 26, Jane K.C. Doe 39, Jane K.O. Doe 12, Jane K.R. Doe 20, Jane K.W. Doe 33, Jane L.B. Doe 1, Jane L.C. Doe 41, Jane L.H. Doe 4, Jane L.K. Doe 30, Jane L.N. Doe 31, Jane L.W. Doe 42, Jane M.B. Doe 51, Jane M.D. Doe 3, Jane M.K. Doe 19, Jane M.O. Doe 40, Jane N.C. Doe 34, Jane R.B. Doe 24, Jane R.D. Doe 49, Jane R.H. Doe 44, Jane R.V. Doe 47, Jane S.B. Doe 13, Jane S.N. Doe 6, Jane S.R. Doe 32, Jane S.W. Doe 8, Jane T.G. Doe 18, Jane T.J. Doe 5, Jane T.O. Doe 7. (Attachments: #1 Summons Lawrence F. Probst, #2 Summons Robert J. Bach, #3 Summons James M. Benson, #4 Summons Robert Bowlsby, #5 Summons Ursula M. Burns, #6 Summons Anita L. DeFrantz, #7 Summons Daniel L. Doctoroff, #8 Summons James L. Easton, #9 Summons John S. Hendricks, #10 Summons Nina M. Kemppel, #11 Summons Susanne D. Lyons, #12 Summons William C. Marlot, #13 Summons Mary R. McCagg, #14 Summons Steven M. Mesler, #15 Summons Dave W. Orgean, #16 Summons Pisei Whitney Ping, #17 Summons Angela M. Ruggeiro, #18 Summons Kevin White, #19 Summons Robert L. Wood, #20 Summons Scott Blackmun, #21 Summons Alan Ashley, #22 Summons Larry Buendorf)(Andrus, Vance)
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 Administrative Notice by Clerk re #7 Summons Request. Summonses will not be issued. Plaintiffs shall re-file a summons request by fully completing the caption for each summons request (Do not use et al). Plaintiffs can create their own summons request to fit all parties on the caption as long as the language matches AO 440 template (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to United States Olympic Committee, Lawrence F. Probst, Robert J. Bach, James M. Benson, Robert Bowlsby, Ursula M. Burns, Anita L. DeFrantz, Daniel L. Doctoroff, James L. Easton, John S. Hendricks, Nina M. Kemppel, Susanne D. Lyons, William C. Marlot, Mary R. McCagg, Steven M. Mesler, Dave W. Orgrean, Pisei Whitney Ping, Angela M. Ruggiero, Kevin M. White, Robert L. Wood, Scott Blackmun, Alan Ashley, Larry Buendorf re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Jane A.B. Doe 14, Jane A.B. Doe 35, Jane A.B. Doe 37, Jane A.B. Doe 48, Jane A.C. Doe 27, Jane A.C. Doe 43, Jane A.D. Doe 2, Jane A.G. Doe 45, Jane A.H. Doe 10, Jane A.H. Doe 28, Jane A.K. Doe 23, Jane A.P. Doe 38, Jane B.M. Doe 15, Jane C.P. Doe 22, Jane D.C. Doe 25, Jane D.C. Doe 50, Jane D.Z. Doe 9, Jane E.A. Doe 46, Jane E.H. Doe 16, Jane G.S. Doe 29, Jane I.B. Doe 11, Jane J.K. Doe 21, Jane J.S. Doe 36, Jane K.B. Doe 17, Jane K.C. Doe 26, Jane K.C. Doe 39, Jane K.O. Doe 12, Jane K.R. Doe 20, Jane K.W. Doe 33, Jane L.B. Doe 1, Jane L.C. Doe 41, Jane L.H. Doe 4, Jane L.K. Doe 30, Jane L.N. Doe 31, Jane L.W. Doe 42, Jane M.B. Doe 51, Jane M.D. Doe 3, Jane M.K. Doe 19, Jane M.O. Doe 40, Jane N.C. Doe 34, Jane R.B. Doe 24, Jane R.D. Doe 49, Jane R.H. Doe 44, Jane R.V. Doe 47, Jane S.B. Doe 13, Jane S.N. Doe 6, Jane S.R. Doe 32, Jane S.W. Doe 8, Jane T.G. Doe 18, Jane T.J. Doe 5, Jane T.O. Doe 7. (Attachments: #1 Summons Lawrence F. Probst, #2 Summons Robert J. Bach, #3 Summons James M. Benson, #4 Summons Robert Bowlsby, #5 Summons Ursula M. Burns, #6 Summons Anita L. DeFrantz, #7 Summons Daniel L. Doctoroff, #8 Summons James L. Easton, #9 Summons John S. Hendricks, #10 Summons Nina M. Kemppel, #11 Summons Susanne D. Lyons, #12 Summons William C. Marlot, #13 Summons Mary R. McCagg, #14 Summons Steven M. Mesler, #15 Summons Dave W. Orgrean, #16 Summons Pisei Whitney Ping, #17 Summons Angela M. Ruggiero, #18 Summons Kevin M. White, #19 Summons Robert L. Wood, #20 Summons Scot Blackmun, #21 Summons Alan Ashley, #22 Summons Larry Buendorf)(Andrus, Vance)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 5/13/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 5/6/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 03/13/2019. (ksena)
March 12, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued. (rvill, )
March 12, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
March 12, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEF in Support of #2 MOTION for Order to Proceed Under Pseudonym and File Restricted Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Jane A.B. Doe 14, Jane A.B. Doe 35, Jane A.B. Doe 37, Jane A.B. Doe 48, Jane A.C. Doe 27, Jane A.C. Doe 43, Jane A.D. Doe 2, Jane A.G. Doe 45, Jane A.H. Doe 10, Jane A.H. Doe 28, Jane A.K. Doe 23, Jane A.P. Doe 38, Jane B.M. Doe 15, Jane C.P. Doe 22, Jane D.C. Doe 25, Jane D.C. Doe 50, Jane D.Z. Doe 9, Jane E.A. Doe 46, Jane E.H. Doe 16, Jane G.S. Doe 29, Jane I.B. Doe 11, Jane J.K. Doe 21, Jane J.S. Doe 36, Jane K.B. Doe 17, Jane K.C. Doe 26, Jane K.C. Doe 39, Jane K.O. Doe 12, Jane K.R. Doe 20, Jane K.W. Doe 33, Jane L.B. Doe 1, Jane L.C. Doe 41, Jane L.H. Doe 4, Jane L.K. Doe 30, Jane L.N. Doe 31, Jane L.W. Doe 42, Jane M.B. Doe 51, Jane M.D. Doe 3, Jane M.K. Doe 19, Jane M.O. Doe 40, Jane N.C. Doe 34, Jane R.B. Doe 24, Jane R.D. Doe 49, Jane R.H. Doe 44, Jane R.V. Doe 47, Jane S.B. Doe 13, Jane S.N. Doe 6, Jane S.R. Doe 32, Jane S.W. Doe 8, Jane T.G. Doe 18, Jane T.J. Doe 5, Jane T.O. Doe 7. (Andrus, Vance)
March 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Order to Proceed Under Pseudonym and File Restricted Complaint by Plaintiffs Jane A.B. Doe 14, Jane A.B. Doe 35, Jane A.B. Doe 37, Jane A.B. Doe 48, Jane A.C. Doe 27, Jane A.C. Doe 43, Jane A.D. Doe 2, Jane A.G. Doe 45, Jane A.H. Doe 10, Jane A.H. Doe 28, Jane A.K. Doe 23, Jane A.P. Doe 38, Jane B.M. Doe 15, Jane C.P. Doe 22, Jane D.C. Doe 25, Jane D.C. Doe 50, Jane D.Z. Doe 9, Jane E.A. Doe 46, Jane E.H. Doe 16, Jane G.S. Doe 29, Jane I.B. Doe 11, Jane J.K. Doe 21, Jane J.S. Doe 36, Jane K.B. Doe 17, Jane K.C. Doe 26, Jane K.C. Doe 39, Jane K.O. Doe 12, Jane K.R. Doe 20, Jane K.W. Doe 33, Jane L.B. Doe 1, Jane L.C. Doe 41, Jane L.H. Doe 4, Jane L.K. Doe 30, Jane L.N. Doe 31, Jane L.W. Doe 42, Jane M.B. Doe 51, Jane M.D. Doe 3, Jane M.K. Doe 19, Jane M.O. Doe 40, Jane N.C. Doe 34, Jane R.B. Doe 24, Jane R.D. Doe 49, Jane R.H. Doe 44, Jane R.V. Doe 47, Jane S.B. Doe 13, Jane S.N. Doe 6, Jane S.R. Doe 32, Jane S.W. Doe 8, Jane T.G. Doe 18, Jane T.J. Doe 5, Jane T.O. Doe 7. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Andrus, Vance)
March 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Jane Doe 1-51 against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6577824)Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane A.B. Doe 14(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane A.B. Doe 35(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane A.B. Doe 37(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane A.B. Doe 48(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane A.C. Doe 27(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane A.C. Doe 43(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane A.D. Doe 2(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane A.G. Doe 45(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane A.H. Doe 10(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane A.H. Doe 28(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane A.K. Doe 23(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane A.P. Doe 38(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane B.M. Doe 15(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane C.P. Doe 22(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane D.C. Doe 25(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane D.C. Doe 50(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane D.Z. Doe 9(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane E.A. Doe 46(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane E.H. Doe 16(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane G.S. Doe 29(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane I.B. Doe 11(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane J.K. Doe 21(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane J.S. Doe 36(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane K.B. Doe 17(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane K.C. Doe 26(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane K.C. Doe 39(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane K.O. Doe 12(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane K.R. Doe 20(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane K.W. Doe 33(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane L.B. Doe 1(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane L.C. Doe 41(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane L.H. Doe 4(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane L.K. Doe 30(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane L.N. Doe 31(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane L.W. Doe 42(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane M.B. Doe 51(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane M.D. Doe 3(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane M.K. Doe 19(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane M.O. Doe 40(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane N.C. Doe 34(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane R.B. Doe 24(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane R.D. Doe 49(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane R.H. Doe 44(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane R.V. Doe 47(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane S.B. Doe 13(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane S.N. Doe 6(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane S.R. Doe 32(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane S.W. Doe 8(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane T.G. Doe 18(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane T.J. Doe 5(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane T.O. Doe 7(pty:pla), filed by Jane D.Z. Doe 9, Jane A.H. Doe 10, Jane M.O. Doe 40, Jane A.B. Doe 48, Jane M.D. Doe 3, Jane R.D. Doe 49, Jane J.K. Doe 21, Jane S.R. Doe 32, Jane M.B. Doe 51, Jane L.H. Doe 4, Jane N.C. Doe 34, Jane A.P. Doe 38, Jane S.W. Doe 8, Jane K.O. Doe 12, Jane D.C. Doe 25, Jane S.N. Doe 6, Jane L.W. Doe 42, Jane A.C. Doe 27, Jane E.H. Doe 16, Jane L.C. Doe 41, Jane T.G. Doe 18, Jane A.B. Doe 35, Jane G.S. Doe 29, Jane A.B. Doe 37, Jane K.W. Doe 33, Jane D.C. Doe 50, Jane C.P. Doe 22, Jane A.C. Doe 43, Jane K.C. Doe 39, Jane L.N. Doe 31, Jane R.H. Doe 44, Jane R.V. Doe 47, Jane A.G. Doe 45, Jane T.O. Doe 7, Jane A.D. Doe 2, Jane T.J. Doe 5, Jane K.B. Doe 17, Jane E.A. Doe 46, Jane J.S. Doe 36, Jane K.C. Doe 26, Jane L.B. Doe 1, Jane L.K. Doe 30, Jane M.K. Doe 19, Jane A.K. Doe 23, Jane S.B. Doe 13, Jane A.H. Doe 28, Jane R.B. Doe 24, Jane B.M. Doe 15, Jane I.B. Doe 11, Jane A.B. Doe 14, Jane K.R. Doe 20. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Andrus, Vance)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L.B. Doe 1 et al v. United States Olympic Committee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A.C. Doe 27
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane I.B. Doe 11
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane D.C. Doe 25
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A.B. Doe 35
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane K.W. Doe 33
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A.B. Doe 37
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane S.W. Doe 8
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A.C. Doe 43
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane D.C. Doe 50
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A.G. Doe 45
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A.H. Doe 28
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A.P. Doe 38
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane J.K. Doe 21
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A.K. Doe 23
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A.B. Doe 14
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A.B. Doe 48
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane K.C. Doe 26
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane L.C. Doe 41
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane K.B. Doe 17
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A.D. Doe 2
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane B.M. Doe 15
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane T.J. Doe 5
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane L.N. Doe 31
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane L.W. Doe 42
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane L.B. Doe 1
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane J.S. Doe 36
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane K.R. Doe 20
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane R.B. Doe 24
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane E.A. Doe 46
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane K.O. Doe 12
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane M.O. Doe 40
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane L.H. Doe 4
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane T.G. Doe 18
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane M.D. Doe 3
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane S.B. Doe 13
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane E.H. Doe 16
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane G.S. Doe 29
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane L.K. Doe 30
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane S.N. Doe 6
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane D.Z. Doe 9
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane S.R. Doe 32
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane C.P. Doe 22
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane N.C. Doe 34
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane M.B. Doe 51
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane M.K. Doe 19
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane R.D. Doe 49
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A.H. Doe 10
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane R.V. Doe 47
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane K.C. Doe 39
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane R.H. Doe 44
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane T.O. Doe 7
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John A.C. Doe 43
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary N.F. Doe 23
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary R.D. Doe 49
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary D.C. Doe 50
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M.B. Doe 51
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary T.K. Doe 21
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela M. Ruggiero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William C. Marlot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nina M. Kemppel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anita L. DeFrantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susanne D. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Blackmun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bowlsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L. Easton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Buendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven M. Mesler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Olympic Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence F. Probst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John S. Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary R. McCagg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin M. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pisei Whitney Ping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ursula M. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel L. Doctoroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Bach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave W. Ogrean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?