Westerkamp v. Hatchet Ranch Events
Plaintiff: Cheryl Finn Westerkamp
Defendant: Hatchet Ranch Events
Case Number: 1:2019cv00794
Filed: March 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Filing 9 Report re Copyright: Report on the determination of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (athom, )
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING CASE by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/15/19. Plaintiff's Notice of Settlement and Dismissal of Civil Action Without Prejudice (FRCP 41 (a)(1)(A)(I)) #7 filed April 15, 2019, is approved; the claims of the plaintiff against defendant in this action are dismissed; the scheduling conference set before the Honorable Kathleen M. Tafoya, United States magistrate judge for the United States District of Colorado, on May 13, 2019, is vacated; and this case is closed. (rebsec)
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Cheryl Finn Westerkamp (Liebowitz, Richard)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 5/13/2019 at 11:45 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 03/21/2019. (ksena)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/18/19. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
March 17, 2019 Filing 4 Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (rroge, )
March 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rroge, )
March 17, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
March 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hatchet Ranch Events (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6585161)Attorney Richard Liebowitz added to party Cheryl Finn Westerkamp(pty:pla), filed by Cheryl Finn Westerkamp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westerkamp v. Hatchet Ranch Events
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Finn Westerkamp
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hatchet Ranch Events
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?