APEG Energy II. LP et al v. Veltri et al

Plaintiff: APEG Energy II. GP and APEG Energy II, LP
Defendant: U.S. Energy Corporation, David A. Veltri and David Veltri
Case Number: 1:2019cv00801
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 70 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff APEG Energy II, LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Cave, Bradley)
July 2, 2019 Filing 69 First STATUS REPORT by Custodian C. Randel Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #2 Exhibit A to Custodian's First Interim Report, #3 Exhibit B to Custodian's First Interim Report)(Fuller, Caroline)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 6/26/2019. (slibi, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 67 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Scheduling Conference held on 6/26/2019. Discovery due by 2/7/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/28/2020. Proposed Protective Orders due 7/15/2019. Joint Status Report due by 1/9/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/28/2020 01:30 PM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. FTR: Courtroom C205. (slibi, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 66 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff APEG Energy II, LP. (Cave, Bradley)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Granting Custodian's #64 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Deadline to Conclude Shareholder' Meeting. ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/5/2019.(angar, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 64 MOTION for Extension of Time to Conclude Shareholders' Meeting by Custodian C. Randel Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Fuller, Caroline)
June 4, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Caroline C. Fuller on behalf of C. Randel LewisAttorney Caroline C. Fuller added to party C. Randel Lewis(pty:cust) (Fuller, Caroline)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER discharging temporary custodian and appointing custodian, by Judge William J. Martinez on 05/30/2019. (wjmlc1)
May 29, 2019 Filing 61 BRIEF re #59 Order Plaintiff's Brief in Support of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's As-Construed Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Appointing Custodian by Plaintiff APEG Energy II, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Cave, Bradley)
May 29, 2019 Filing 60 BRIEF re #59 Order by Defendant David Veltri. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Seo, Byeongsook)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 INTERIM ORDER regarding further briefing and temporary custodian's continuing authority, by Judge William J. Martinez on 05/24/2019. (wjmlc1)
May 24, 2019 Filing 58 COURTROOM MINUTES for Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction held before Judge William J. Martinez on 5/24/2019. Taking under advisement #5 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Injunctive Relief. Court Reporter: Mary George. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Exhibit List, #2 Plaintiff's Exhibit List) (afran)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER AND STIPULATION Regarding Custody of Original Exhibits. Entered by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/24/2019. (afran)
May 23, 2019 Filing 56 Exhibit List by Defendant David Veltri. (Seo, Byeongsook)
May 23, 2019 Filing 55 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #53 Notice (Other) filed by attorney Bradley T. Cave. Attorney has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (angar, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 54 Witness List by Defendant David Veltri. (Seo, Byeongsook)
May 23, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE re 45 Order on Motion for Leave,,,, Notice of Compliance with Court's May 17, 2019 Order by Plaintiff APEG Energy II, LP (Cave, Bradley)
May 23, 2019 Filing 52 Exhibit List by Plaintiffs APEG Energy II, LP, APEG Energy II. GP. (Cave, Bradley)
May 23, 2019 Filing 51 Witness List by Plaintiff APEG Energy II, LP. (Cave, Bradley)
May 22, 2019 Filing 50 BRIEF re #38 Order on Motion for TRO, #42 Order on Motion for TRO by Defendant David Veltri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Seo, Byeongsook)
May 20, 2019 Filing 48 Supplemental Brief to Appoint Custodian by Plaintiff APEG Energy II, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Ted Warner CV, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Haseotes v. Bentas, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Bylaws, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Kleinberg v. Aharon)(Chudacoff, Matthew) Modified on 5/23/2019 to correct title pursuant to Chambers (angar, ).
May 20, 2019 Filing 47 BRIEF re #38 Order on Motion for TRO by Defendant David Veltri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Seo, Byeongsook)
May 20, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF CASH IN COURT REGISTRY by Plaintiff APEG Energy II, LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Chudacoff, Matthew)
May 17, 2019 Filing 49 PAYMENT RECEIVED from APEG Energy II, LP in the amount of $ 5,000.00; Receipt Number COX090312 (angar, )
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion for Leave of Court to Take Deposition of Javier Pico for Use at May 24 Hearing Or, in the Alternative, to Reschedule Preliminary Injunction Hearing #44 . In light of the compressed timeframe between now and the hearing scheduled for May 24, the Court finds that it should rule without awaiting Defendant's response. Plaintiff's motion is GRANTED under the following conditions: Plaintiff, at its own expense, must produce Mr. Pico in Denver no later than Tuesday, May 21, 2019, for a deposition of no more than four hours, and Plaintiff must deliver the deposition transcript and video recording to the undersigned's chambers no later than 12:00 PM (noon) on Thursday, May 23, 2019. All other relief Plaintiff seeks is DENIED for lack of good cause shown. Plaintiff knew as of May 9 that the hearing was scheduled for May 24 and could have brought this conflict to the Court's attention at a time when other arrangements would have been more feasible. Accordingly, Plaintiff is not entitled to relief beyond what the Court hereby permits. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 05/17/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmlc1)
May 17, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to to Take Deposition of Javier Pico for Use at May 24 Hearing or, in the Alternative, to Reschedule Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Plaintiff APEG Energy II, LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Cave, Bradley)
May 16, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE re #42 Order on Motion for TRO Notice of Compliance with Court's May 16, 2019 Order by Defendant David Veltri (Seo, Byeongsook)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #39 Plaintiff's Emergency Renewed Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, construed as an emergency motion for interim preliminary injunctive relief, by Judge William J. Martinez on 05/16/2019. (wjmlc1)
May 15, 2019 Filing 41 RESPONSE to #39 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Emergency Renewed Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Defendant David Veltri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14)(Seo, Byeongsook)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Emergency Renewed Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #39 . Defendant shall respond by 10:00 AM (MDT) tomorrow (May 15, 2019). No reply from Plaintiff will be accepted absent leave or prior order of Court. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 05/14/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmlc1)
May 14, 2019 Filing 39 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Emergency Renewed Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff APEG Energy II, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cave, Bradley)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER setting May 24, 2019 evidentiary hearing for #5 APEG's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, construed as a motion for preliminary injunction, by Judge William J. Martinez on 05/09/2019. (wjmlc1)
May 8, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE to #36 Brief in Support of Motion, by Defendant David Veltri. (Kilroy, James)
May 1, 2019 Filing 36 BRIEF in Support of #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Supplemental Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Construed Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff APEG Energy II, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Cave, Bradley)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER reserving ruling on #5 APEG's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, construed as a motion for preliminary injunction; supplemental briefing from APEG due May 1, 2019, by Judge William J. Martinez on 04/23/2019.(wjmlc1)
April 23, 2019 Filing 34 ANSWER to #32 Amended Complaint, by David Veltri.(Kilroy, James)
April 11, 2019 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiffs APEG Energy II, LP, APEG Energy II. GP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Cave, Bradley)
April 9, 2019 Filing 32 AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. Energy Corporation, David Veltri, filed by APEG Energy II, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Cave, Bradley)
April 9, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff APEG Energy II, LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Redline of Amended Complaint)(Cave, Bradley)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #5 , which the Court has construed as a motion for a preliminary injunction. Also before the Court is Defendants' response #29 . Plaintiffs are DIRECTED to file a reply on or before April 16, 2019. The Court will then determine if an evidentiary hearing is necessary. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 04/09/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmlc1)
April 5, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Attorney James D. Kilroy added to party David Veltri(pty:dft) filed by Defendant David Veltri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Veltri's Response in Opposition to Construed Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Kilroy, James)
April 5, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stephanie Kanan on behalf of David VeltriAttorney Stephanie Kanan added to party David Veltri(pty:dft) (Kanan, Stephanie)
April 5, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Byeongsook Seo on behalf of David VeltriAttorney Byeongsook Seo added to party David Veltri(pty:dft) (Seo, Byeongsook)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference for 6/26/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 4/01/2019. (slibi, )
March 29, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: 22 Order by Plaintiffs APEG Energy II, LP, APEG Energy II. GP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Cave, Bradley) Modified on 4/1/2019 to correct title (angar, ).
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2018 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/ 29/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Magistrate Judge Neureiter, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/29/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #5 . The motion does not convince the Court that relief should issue "before the adverse party can be heard in opposition." Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(1)(A). Rather, the presence of related litigation in the United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas convinces the Court that there is another side to Plaintiffs' story that the Court should hear before deciding the propriety of preliminary relief. Accordingly, the precise relief Plaintiffs seek--a temporary restraining order--is DENIED. However, the Court sua sponte construes Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order as a motion also for a preliminary injunction. So construed, the Court ORDERS that Defendants respond to the construed motion on or before April 5, 2019. After receiving Defendants' response, the Court will determine the need for a reply brief and/or an evidentiary hearing. Further, because counsel have not yet appeared for Defendants in this action, Plaintiffs are ORDERED to transmit a copy of this order to Defendants by any means (including multiple means, if appropriate) reasonably calculated to reach them promptly, and Plaintiffs must then promptly file a certificate of service explaining how they transmitted this order and whether they have reason to believe that it was received by Defendants. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 03/28/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmlc1)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Before the Court is its Order to Show Cause dated March 21, 2019 16 and Plaintiffs' response #20 . On the record before it, the Court is not convinced that the Texas court would not have subject matter or personal jurisdiction, nor that this suit and the Texas lawsuit are as distinct as Plaintiffs claim. However, at least the argument against personal jurisdiction over Mr. Veltri in Texas is colorable enough to create a risk that this lawsuit, if transferred to Texas, would bog down in preliminary jurisdictional questions. The Court therefore DISCHARGES its Order to Show Cause, but with the warning that the Court may renew it if case developments demonstrate that Plaintiffs' jurisdictional concerns are unfounded. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 03/27/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmlc1)
March 25, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE to 16 Order,,, to Show Cause Regarding Change of Venue by Plaintiffs APEG Energy II, LP, APEG Energy II. GP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Pope, Jeffrey)
March 21, 2019 Filing 19 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: Show Cause Response due by 3/25/2019 pursuant to 16 Order. Text Only Entry (angar, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew Lee Chudacoff on behalf of APEG Energy II, LP, APEG Energy II. GPAttorney Matthew Lee Chudacoff added to party APEG Energy II, LP(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Lee Chudacoff added to party APEG Energy II. GP(pty:pla) (Chudacoff, Matthew)
March 21, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jeffrey Scott Pope on behalf of APEG Energy II, LP, APEG Energy II. GPAttorney Jeffrey Scott Pope added to party APEG Energy II, LP(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey Scott Pope added to party APEG Energy II. GP(pty:pla) (Pope, Jeffrey)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DISCHARGED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE returnable March 25, 2019. This matter is before the Court sua sponte. Plaintiffs' filings demonstrate that one side of this dispute is already being litigated in the United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas. That court has already issued orders on matters that Defendants here are sure to raise in defense. Plaintiffs are therefore ordered to show cause, by March 25, 2019, why this case should not be transferred to the Southern District of Texas per 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). In particular, Plaintiffs must explain why the relief they seek here could not have been sought by way of counterclaim in the Texas lawsuit, with Defendant Veltri joined as a counterclaim defendant per Fed. R. Civ. P. 13(h) or otherwise. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 03/21/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmlc1) Modified on 3/21/2019 to correct date (angar, ). Modified on 3/29/2019 to show as discharged pursuant to 21 Order (angar, ).
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Before the Court is its Order to Show Cause dated March 19, 2019 11 , and Plaintiffs' response #14 . The response satisfies the Court that diversity jurisdiction exists, and the Court therefore DISCHARGES the Order to Show Cause. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 03/21/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmlc1) Modified on 3/21/2019 to correct dates (angar, ).
March 20, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to 11 Order,,,,,,,,, by Plaintiffs APEG Energy II, LP, APEG Energy II. GP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Patrick Duke, #2 Exhibit Ex. A - Spreadsheet of APEG Energy II, LP Limited Partners, #3 Exhibit Ex. B - Sworn Affidavit of David Veltri, #4 Exhibit Ex. C - Petition 3-1-19, #5 Exhibit Ex. D - Form 8-k)(Cave, Bradley)
March 20, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by APEG Energy II. GP, APEG Energy II, LP. U.S. Energy Corporation served on 3/19/2019, answer due 4/9/2019. (Cave, Bradley)
March 20, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by APEG Energy II. GP, APEG Energy II, LP. David Veltri served on 3/19/2019, answer due 4/9/2019. (Cave, Bradley)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DISCHARGED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE returnable March 25, 2019. The Court has a duty to sua sponte consider its subject matter jurisdiction. Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(h)(3). Plaintiffs' Complaint alleges that the Court has jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332 based on the diversity of the parties. The Court notes certain ambiguities, however, in Plaintiffs' allegations regarding citizenship. Plaintiffs allege that APEG Energy II, LP, "has forty limited partners, none of which reside in Colorado." This phrasing ("which" instead of "whom") is ambiguous as to whether these limited partners are individuals or other business entities. If they include other business entities, more allegations regarding citizenship are necessary. See, e.g., Carden v. Arkoma Assocs., 494 U.S. 185, 195 (1990) (citizenship of limited partners must be taken into account to determine diversity of citizenship of the parties; limited partnership is not in its own right a citizen of the state that created it for purposes of diversity); Siloam Springs Hotel, L.L.C. v. Century Sur. Co., 781 F.3d 1233, 1237-1238 (10th Cir. 2015) (an LLC takes the citizenship of all its members; "only those state-created entities that are corporations, in the traditional understanding of that word, will be treated as a person for purposes of diversity jurisdiction"). Moreover, "Nominal Defendant" U.S. Energy Corporation is deemed both a citizen of Colorado and Wyoming, yet Plaintiffs make no allegations about whether any of them is a Wyoming citizen, nor provide any authority that the citizenship of what a plaintiff deems to be the "nominal defendant" may be disregarded. As Plaintiffs are invoking jurisdiction of the federal court, they bear the burden of establishing that jurisdiction is proper. Merida Delgado v. Gonzales, 428 F.3d 916, 919 (10th Cir. 2005). As filed, Plaintiffs' Complaint is deficient in this regard. Accordingly, Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE, by March 25, 2019, as to why the Court should not on its own motion dismiss this action based on Plaintiffs' failure to allege facts sufficient to show that the Court has diversity jurisdiction over this matter. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 03/19/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmlc1) Modified on 3/21/2019 to discharge pursuant to 15 Order (angar, ).
March 19, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00801-WJM. (athom, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (agarc, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Proposed Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs APEG Energy II, LP, APEG Energy II. GP (Cave, Bradley)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEF in Support of #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiffs APEG Energy II, LP, APEG Energy II. GP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V)(Cave, Bradley)
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs APEG Energy II, LP, APEG Energy II. GP. (Cave, Bradley)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to U.S. Energy Corporation re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs APEG Energy II, LP, APEG Energy II. GP. (Cave, Bradley)
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to David Veltri re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs APEG Energy II, LP, APEG Energy II. GP. (Cave, Bradley)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiffs APEG Energy II, LP, APEG Energy II. GP (Cave, Bradley)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. Energy Corporation, David A. Veltri (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6586557)Attorney Bradley T. Cave added to party APEG Energy II, LP(pty:pla), Attorney Bradley T. Cave added to party APEG Energy II. GP(pty:pla), filed by APEG Energy II. GP, APEG Energy II, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Cave, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: APEG Energy II. LP et al v. Veltri et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Veltri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Veltri
Represented By: Byeongsook Seo
Represented By: Stephanie Kanan
Represented By: James D. Kilroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APEG Energy II. GP
Represented By: Bradley T. Cave
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Pope
Represented By: Matthew Lee Chudacoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APEG Energy II, LP
Represented By: Bradley T. Cave
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Pope
Represented By: Matthew Lee Chudacoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?