Leigh Marie, LLC v. Board of County Commissioners of Gunnison County, The
Plaintiff: Leigh Marie, LLC
Defendant: The Board of County Commissioners of Gunnison County, Colorado, Board of County Commissioners of Gunnison County, The and Waunita Hot Springs Ranch, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00809
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331vc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/1/19 GRANTING #16 Motion to Stay Discovery and to Vacate Scheduling Conference Pending Resolution of Defendant's Motions to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support. This case is STAYED pending resolution of the County Defendant's Second Motion to Dismiss [#15], except as necessary for Defendant Waunita to answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint [#12]. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for July 18, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. and all associated deadlines are VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Waunita Hot Springs Ranch, Inc. shall file the Consent/Non-Consent Form on or before August 19, 2019, indicating whether it consents to the undersigned for disposition of this action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (nmarb, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Mark Baumgarten on behalf of Board of County Commissioners of Gunnison County, TheAttorney David Mark Baumgarten added to party Board of County Commissioners of Gunnison County, The(pty:dft) (Baumgarten, David)
June 20, 2019 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Leigh Marie, LLC. Waunita Hot Springs Ranch, Inc. waiver sent on 6/4/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Klug, Noah)
June 19, 2019 Filing 23 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Leigh Marie, LLC All parties consent.. (Klug, Noah)
June 18, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and For Failure to State a Claim, #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Board of County Commissioners of Gunnison County, The. (Hoyt, Matthew)
June 4, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and For Failure to State a Claim filed by Plaintiff Leigh Marie, LLC. (Klug, Noah)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot #13 Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum Briefin Support; granting #19 Unopposed Motion forLeave to File Consolidated Response to Countys Motions to Dismiss to the extent that Plaintiff shall file one Response to the Second Motion to Dismiss #15 on or before 6/4/2019, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/30/2019.(jgonz, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and For Failure to State a Claim, #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by Plaintiff Leigh Marie, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Klug, Noah)
May 28, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to #16 MOTION to Stay re #11 Order, Discovery and to Vacate Scheduling Conference Pending Resolution of Defendant's Motions to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Board of County Commissioners of Gunnison County, The. (Hoyt, Matthew)
May 24, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #16 MOTION to Stay re #11 Order, Discovery and to Vacate Scheduling Conference Pending Resolution of Defendant's Motions to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Leigh Marie, LLC. (Klug, Noah)
May 21, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Stay re #11 Order, Discovery and to Vacate Scheduling Conference Pending Resolution of Defendant's Motions to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support by Defendant Board of County Commissioners of Gunnison County, The. (Hoyt, Matthew)
May 14, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and For Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Board of County Commissioners of Gunnison County, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Motion Exhibit 2)(Hoyt, Matthew)
May 9, 2019 Filing 14 Consent Form due by 6/22/2019 pursuant to the filing of #13 . Text Only Entry (lgale, )
May 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Board of County Commissioners of Gunnison County, The. (Hoyt, Matthew)
May 6, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Leigh Marie, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (2013 Stipulation), #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (survey), #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (2014 Stipulation), #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 (Stop Order), #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 (Gunnison County Land Use Resolution), #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 (ltr dated 9.7.18), #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 (ltr dated 10.23.18), #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 (ltr dated 10.31.18), #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9 (waiver application with exhibits), #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10 (ltr dated 2.12.19), #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11 (cvr ltr and draft motion for contempt), #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12 (Contempt Order), #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13 (Road and Bridge Standards)i)(Klug, Noah)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/16/19. Scheduling Conference set for 7/18/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (lgale, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 10 Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial Division notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (agarc, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Leigh Marie, LLC. Board of County Commissioners of Gunnison County, The waiver sent on 3/21/2019, answer due 5/20/2019. (Klug, Noah)
March 19, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cthom, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM Exercising my prerogative as a Senior Judge, I request that this action be reassigned, by Judge John L. Kane. The case has been randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all further proceedings. (cthom, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge John L. Kane and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #2 MOTION for Order to Certify Record, and #1 Complaint filed by attorney Noah Harrison Klug. The documents are incorrectly formatted, all pleadings and documents shall be double spaced. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 10.1 (Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to The Board of County Commissioners of Gunnison County, Colorado by Plaintiff Leigh Marie, LLC. (Klug, Noah)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Order to Certify Record by Plaintiff Leigh Marie, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order to Certify Record)(Klug, Noah)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Board of County Commissioners of Gunnison County, Colorado (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6587560)Attorney Noah Harrison Klug added to party Leigh Marie, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Leigh Marie, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (2013 Stipulation), #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (survey), #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (2014 Stipulation), #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 (Stop Order), #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 (Gunnison County Land Use Resolution), #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 (ltr dated 9.7.18), #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 (ltr dated 10.23.18), #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 (ltr dated 10.31.18), #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9 (waiver application with exhibits), #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10 (ltr dated 2.12.19), #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11 (cvr ltr and draft motion for contempt), #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12 (Contempt Order), #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13 (Road and Bridge Standards))(Klug, Noah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leigh Marie, LLC v. Board of County Commissioners of Gunnison County, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leigh Marie, LLC
Represented By: Noah Harrison Klug
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of County Commissioners of Gunnison County, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners of Gunnison County, The
Represented By: David Mark Baumgarten
Represented By: Matthew Rhodes Hoyt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waunita Hot Springs Ranch, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?