Harris v. Environmental Materials, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Dedrick Harris
Defendant: Environmentail Materials, LLC, Meeka Houston, Arapahoe County Child Support Division, David Layton, Environmental Materials, LLC and Arapahoe/Douglas Works
Case Number: 1:2019cv00825
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #6 Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Employment Discrimination Complaint. Plaintiff's previously- filed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) (ECF No. #3 ) is denied as moot, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/3/2019.(angar, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED Employment Discrimination COMPLAINT against Arapahoe County Child Support Division, Environmental Materials, LLC, Meeka Houston, David Layton, filed by Dedrick Harris.(angar, )
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SECOND ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/24/2019. (cthom, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Dedrick Harris. (evana, ) (Modified on 4/25/2019 attached a better formatted PDF)(evana, ).
April 22, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Arapahoe County Child Support Division, Environmentail Materials, LLC, Meeka Houston, Arapahoe/Douglas Works, filed by Dedrick Harris.(evana, )
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. If Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty days from the date of this order the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 3/21/2019. (angar, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Dedrick Harris. (rroge, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Arapahoe County Child Support Division, Environmentail Materials, LLC, Meeka Houston, David Layton, filed by Dedrick Harris.(rroge, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Environmental Materials, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Environmentail Materials, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meeka Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arapahoe County Child Support Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Layton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Environmental Materials, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arapahoe/Douglas Works
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dedrick Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?