Daza v. Enterprise Leasing Company of Denver, LLC

Plaintiff: Barbara L Daza
Defendant: EAN Holdings, LLC, Roberta Louise Zamora and Enterprise Leasing Company of Denver, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00830
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/11/19. All motions raising issues under Fed. R. Evid. 702, 703, or 704, as codified and construed shall be filed by March 30, 2020. A combined Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference is set 8/20/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Five Day Jury Trial is set 9/14/2020 through 9/18/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. (rebsec)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 7/11/19. (amont, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 18 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews: Scheduling Conference held on 7/11/2019. Discovery due by 4/24/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/22/2020. Joint Status Report due by 9/24/2019. FTR: Courtroom C-204. (amont, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 17 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Barbara L Daza. (Page, Ashley)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #14 Motion for Leave to Appear. Ms. Page has successfully entered her appearance and has been added to the electronic notification system. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 6/28/2019. Text Only Entry(skclc1)
June 27, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/27/19 regarding #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Barbara L Daza. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews Text Only Entry (rebsec)
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear by Plaintiff Barbara L Daza. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Page, Ashley)
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Amy Lilien Twohey on behalf of Enterprise Leasing Company of Denver, LLCAttorney Amy Lilien Twohey added to party Enterprise Leasing Company of Denver, LLC(pty:dft) (Twohey, Amy)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 7/5/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 6/17/19. Text Only Entry (amont, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant's ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint Attorney Mark Joseph Jachimiak added to party Enterprise Leasing Company of Denver, LLC(pty:dft) by Enterprise Leasing Company of Denver, LLC.(Jachimiak, Mark)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Enterprise Leasing Company of Denver, LLC , filed by Barbara L Daza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Waiver of Service)(Chanez, Hugo) Modified on 6/13/2019 to correct applicable party (athom, ).
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading by Plaintiff Barbara L Daza (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Chanez, Hugo)
April 2, 2019 Filing 8 Entry of Appearance by Plaintiff Barbara L Daza. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Chanez, Hugo) Modified on 4/4/2019 to correct event text (athom, ).
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (athom, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Roberta Louis Zamora by Plaintiff Barbara L Daza. (Lichtenstein, David)
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to EAN Holdings by Plaintiff Barbara L Daza. (Lichtenstein, David)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/20/19. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EAN Holdings, a Delaware LLC, Roberta Louise Zamora (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6591447)Attorney David Lichtenstein added to party Barbara L Daza(pty:pla), filed by Barbara L Daza. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lichtenstein, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daza v. Enterprise Leasing Company of Denver, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara L Daza
Represented By: David Lichtenstein
Represented By: Ashley L. Page
Represented By: Hugo Lobato Chanez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAN Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberta Louise Zamora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Leasing Company of Denver, LLC
Represented By: Mark Joseph Jachimiak
Represented By: Amy Lilien Twohey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?