Lucero v. Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Ron Lucero
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company and Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00856
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER: By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 05/14/2019. (ksena) Modified on 5/15/2019 (ksena, ).
May 14, 2019 Filing 23 COURTROOM MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: Scheduling Conference held on 5/14/2019, ( Discovery due by 1/16/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 2/17/2020.). FTR: courtroom 101. (ksena)
May 13, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint by Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Kafer, Kelly)
May 8, 2019 Filing 21 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Ron Lucero. (LeHouillier, Patric)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #17 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/8/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER granting #18 Motion for Counsel to Attend Scheduling Conference Telephonically. Defense Counsel shall initiate a conference call and contact chambers, 719-575-0328, at the scheduled time. Defense counsel shall use a LAND LINE; NO CELLULAR, CORDLESS OR SPEAKER PHONES ARE PERMITTED. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/8/2019. Text Only Entry(kmtlc2)
May 7, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear at Scheduling Conference Telephonically by Defendant Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Kafer, Kelly)
May 7, 2019 Filing 17 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant USAA General Indemnity Company All parties consent.. (Kafer, Kelly)
April 29, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against USAA General Indemnity Company, filed by Ron Lucero. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(LeHouillier, Patric)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER granting #14 Motion to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff shall file the Amended Complaint no later than 5/1/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/29/2019. Text Only Entry(kmtlc2)
April 26, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Complaint by Plaintiff Ron Lucero. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document Second Amended Complaint)(LeHouillier, Patric)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER denying #12 Motion to Amend Complaint for failure to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 15.1. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/24/2019. Text Only Entry(kmtlc2)
April 23, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Complaint by Plaintiff Ron Lucero. (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A to Second Amended Complaint)(LeHouillier, Patric)
April 1, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by USAA General Indemnity Company.(Kafer, Kelly)
March 26, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent United Services Automobile Association for USAA General Indemnity Company. (Riter, Tory)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 5/14/2019 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 5/7/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 03/25/2019. (ksena)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patric J. LeHouillier on behalf of Ron LuceroAttorney Patric J. LeHouillier added to party Ron Lucero(pty:pla) (LeHouillier, Patric)
March 21, 2019 Filing 8 STATE COURT ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by El Paso County District Court Judge Tim J Schutz on 03/12/2019. (rroge, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon USAA General Indemnity Company on 02/21/2019 (rroge, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rroge, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against USAA General Indemnity Company, filed by Ron Lucero.(rroge, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against USAA General Indemnity Company, filed by Ron Lucero.(rroge, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by USAA General Indemnity Company from District Court, County of El Paso, State of Colorado, Case Number 2019CV030301. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6595113), filed by USAA General Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A- Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit C - ROS, #6 Exhibit D - Summons, #7 Exhibit E - DMV Record, #8 Exhibit F - Voter Registration Record, #9 Exhibit G - Secretary of State, #10 Exhibit H - Complaint, #11 Exhibit I - DPO, #12 Exhibit J - Unopposed Motion for Answer Extension, #13 Exhibit K - Proposed Order re Motion, #14 Exhibit L - Order re Motion, #15 Exhibit M - Notice of Notice of Removal, #16 Exhibit N - State Register of Actions)(Kafer, Kelly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucero v. Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company
Represented By: Kelly L. Kafer
Represented By: Tory Drew Riter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Kelly L. Kafer
Represented By: Tory Drew Riter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Lucero
Represented By: Patric J. LeHouillier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?