Wolford v. Alpha Recovery Corp
Plaintiff: Valerie Wolford
Defendant: Alpha Recovery Corp
Case Number: 1:2019cv00873
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case Text Only Entry (lgale, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case without prejudice by Plaintiff Valerie Wolford (Lemberg, Sergei)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/16/19. Scheduling Conference set for 7/19/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (lgale, )
April 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Valerie Wolford. Alpha Recovery Corp served on 4/2/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Lemberg, Sergei)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rroge, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Alpha Recovery Corp. by Plaintiff Valerie Wolford. (Lemberg, Sergei)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alpha Recovery Corp (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6596928)Attorney Sergei Lemberg added to party Valerie Wolford(pty:pla), filed by Valerie Wolford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lemberg, Sergei)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolford v. Alpha Recovery Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpha Recovery Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Wolford
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?