Thomas v. USA

Plaintiff: Ora Thomas and Ora (I) Thomas
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00877
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2672pi
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SECOND DISCOVERY ORDER Re: Releases for Third-Party Medical Providers, by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 7/1/2019. (jgonz, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 29 BRIEF Plaintiff's Summary of Argument Regarding Discovery Dispute by Plaintiffs Ora Thomas, Ora (I) Thomas. (Leventhal, Sean)
June 26, 2019 Filing 28 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1 - Exhibits to #27 : by Defendant USA.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Aitchison, Chandra) Modified on 6/27/2019 to add text (angar, ).
June 26, 2019 Filing 27 BRIEF by Defendant USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Aitchison, Chandra) Modified on 6/27/2019 to correct event (jgonz, ).
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 6/20/2019. (jgonz, )
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Protective Order by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 6/20/2019. Text Only Entry(jgonz, )
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM regarding #23 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by USA. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/20/2019. Text Only Entry (ebuch)
June 19, 2019 Filing 23 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Aitchison, Chandra)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Vacating Discovery Hearing and Discovery Briefs. The parties shall call Magistrate Judge Crews' Chambers (303.335.2124) for a informal discovery conference regarding the issue of medical billing disclosures on 6/20/2019 at 1:30 PM. This informal discovery conference renders the Discovery Hearing and Briefing MOOT. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the deadlines associated with the Discovery Hearing set for 7/2/2019 and corresponding Discovery Briefs are VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall continue to abide by the court's 6/11/2019 Minute Order (ECF. #21) as it relates to the signing of a release for medical records by 6/21/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 6/12/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY BRIEFING: The parties contacted chambers pursuant to SKC Prac. Standards E(3) regarding a discovery dispute. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall file simultaneous "Discovery Briefs" concerning the dispute over the billing records. In no event shall the Briefs exceed 7 pages double-spaced. Exhibits shall not exceed a total of 15 pages. The "Discovery Briefs" shall not be filed as a "Motion". IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a Discovery Hearing is set for 7/2/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. In light of this dispute, the Court finds it necessary to revise its prior Discovery Order #20 . Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall have until 6/21/2019 to sign a release for medical records. Because release of billing records are in dispute, Plaintiffs are not required to provide a release at this time. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 6/11/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DISCOVERY ORDER RE: RELEASES FOR THIRD-PARTY MEDICAL PROVIDERS: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall execute appropriate releases to allow Defendant to obtain Mr. Thomas' medical records from applicable third-party medical providers for a reasonable and proportional time-period. Plaintiff shall sign and return the releases to Defendant by no later than 10 days from the date of this order.It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall confer over the Protective Order (previously ordered to be submitted by no later than June 19, 2019), and propose one that will address confidentiality or privacy issues (including social security number, date of birth, etc.) and govern the procedure for the Parties' handling of these records, as well as filing of these records under seal, as necessary. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 6/7/2019. (skclc2)
June 5, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by USA.(Aitchison, Chandra)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 6/5/19. (amont, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 17 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews: Scheduling Conference held on 6/5/2019. Discovery due by 2/7/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/9/2020. Joint Status Report due by 8/19/2019. Telephone Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/12/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Counsel participating in the conference shall jointly call the Court (303.335.2124) at the scheduled time. FTR: Courtroom C-204. (amont, )
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/4/2019. (ebuch)
June 3, 2019 Filing 15 CASE REASSIGNED. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00877-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
May 31, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Stipulation to Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer Complaint by Defendant USA (Aitchison, Chandra)
May 29, 2019 Filing 13 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Ora Thomas, Ora (I) Thomas. (Leventhal, Sean)
May 29, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Notice to Third Party Pursuant to CRS 13-64-402 upon HR Assistant Robin Yatsko on 05/22/2019, filed by Plaintiffs Ora Thomas, Ora (I) Thomas (Leventhal, Sean)
May 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE to Third Party Pursuant to C.R.S. 13-64-402 by Plaintiffs Ora Thomas, Ora (I) Thomas (Leventhal, Sean)
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE to Third Party Pursuant to C.R.S. 13-64-402 by Plaintiffs Ora Thomas, Ora (I) Thomas (Leventhal, Sean)
April 10, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) USA served on 4/2/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (Laird, Matthew)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference is set for 6/5/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 5/29/2019. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF. #3-1) is due 5/29/2019. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 4/9/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2, )
April 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Chandra Kurien Aitchison on behalf of USAAttorney Chandra Kurien Aitchison added to party USA(pty:dft) (Aitchison, Chandra)
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mark S. Pestal on behalf of USAAttorney Mark S. Pestal added to party USA(pty:dft) (Pestal, Mark)
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Shawn Sar on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Jonathan Shawn Sar added to party Ora Thomas(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan Shawn Sar added to party Ora (I) Thomas(pty:pla) (Sar, Jonathan)
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sean Bradley Leventhal on behalf of Ora Thomas (Leventhal, Sean)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rroge, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6597130)Attorney Matthew R. Laird added to party Ora Thomas(pty:pla), filed by Ora Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Laird, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ora Thomas
Represented By: Matthew R. Laird
Represented By: Sean Bradley Leventhal
Represented By: Jonathan Shawn Sar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ora (I) Thomas
Represented By: Matthew R. Laird
Represented By: Sean Bradley Leventhal
Represented By: Jonathan Shawn Sar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Mark S. Pestal
Represented By: Chandra Kurien Aitchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?