Butler v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, The
Plaintiff: Shirley Butler
Defendant: The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company and Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, The
Case Number: 1:2019cv00880
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause of Action: 29:1101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Pursuant to the Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice #10 , this matter shall be dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own fees and costs, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/18/2019. (ebuch)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Shirley Butler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Casares, Dale)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF TRANSFER Pursuant to D.C.COLO. LCivR 40.1(a), and with approval of the Chief Judge and the consent of Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock, the Clerk shall transfer this case to Judge Babcock. ORDERED by Judge John L. Kane on 6/6/2019. (cthom, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 Upon the passing of Judge Richard P. Matsch and pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a), this case has been reassigned to Judge John L. Kane effective this date. All future pleading should be designated as 19-cv-00880-JLK. (Text Only Entry) (ktera)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Shirley Butler. (Casares, Dale)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER MODIFYING RULE 16 PROCEDURE - ERISA On or before May 23, 2019, counsel for the parties shall file a joint statement, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/23/2019. (ktera)
April 22, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Jack M. Englert, Jr added to party Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, The(pty:dft) by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, The.(Englert, Jack)
April 3, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shirley Butler. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, The served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Casares, Dale)
March 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Richard P. Matsch and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6598010)Attorney Dale G. Casares added to party Shirley Butler(pty:pla), filed by Shirley Butler. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Casares, Dale)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Butler
Represented By: Dale G. Casares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Jack M. Englert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?