Blanco et al v. HCA - HealthONE LLC et al

Plaintiff: Marisela Blanco, Steven Blanco, Sr., Marisela (I) Blanco and Steven (I) Blanco, Sr.
Defendant: Thiyaharajan R. Meyappan, Presbyterian/St. Luke's Medical Center, Rocky Mountain Hospital for Children at PSL, HealthONE, T. Raju Meyappan, HCA - HealthONE LLC and Jonathan L. Brandon
Case Number: 1:2019cv00884
Filed: March 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Eric T. Lund on behalf of HCA - HealthONE LLC, HealthONE, Presbyterian/St. Luke's Medical Center, Rocky Mountain Hospital for Children at PSLAttorney Eric T. Lund added to party HCA - HealthONE LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Eric T. Lund added to party HealthONE(pty:dft), Attorney Eric T. Lund added to party Presbyterian/St. Luke's Medical Center(pty:dft), Attorney Eric T. Lund added to party Rocky Mountain Hospital for Children at PSL(pty:dft) (Lund, Eric)
April 16, 2019 Filing 10 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 4/16/2019. Text Only Entry (jgonz, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiffs Marisela Blanco, Marisela (I) Blanco, Steven (I) Blanco, Sr, Steven Blanco, Sr. (Jorde, Brian)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER This matter is before the Court upon its review of #7 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand (the "Amended Complaint"), which the Court understands to constitute Plaintiff's response to #6 Order to Show Cause. The Order to Show Cause explained that the allegations in the Complaint were insufficient to establish this Court's diversity jurisdiction. Although the Amended Complaint has corrected most of the deficiencies identified in the Order to Show Cause, the Amended Complaint fails to identify the citizenship of Defendant HCA-HealthONE, LLC and thus the Court is unable to confirm its subject matter jurisdiction. As explained in the Order to Show Cause, "[t]he citizenship of any unincorporated entity defendant, such as a limited liability company or partnership, is determined by looking to the citizenship of all of its members." The Amended Complaint fails to identify the members of Defendant HCA-HealthONE, LLC or the citizenship of those members. Accordingly, the Amended Complaint is insufficient to establish this Court's subject matter jurisdiction and the Order to Show Cause remains in effect. On or before April 10, 2019, Plaintiff shall show cause, if any there be, in writing, why this case should not be dismissed due to the Courts lack of subject matter jurisdiction. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 3/28/2019. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT & Jury Demand against Jonathan L. Brandon, HCA - HealthONE LLC, HealthONE, Thiyaharajan R. Meyappan, Presbyterian/St. Luke's Medical Center, Rocky Mountain Hospital for Children at PSL, filed by Marisela (I) Blanco, Marisela Blanco, Steven (I) Blanco, Sr, Steven Blanco, Sr..(Jorde, Brian)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: returnable by Plaintiff why this case should not be dismissed due to the Courts lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 4/10/2019. by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 3/26/2019. (jgonz, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM Exercising my prerogative as a Senior Judge, I request that this action be reassigned, by Judge John L. Kane. This case has been randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for all further proceedings. (cthom, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (cmadr, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge John L. Kane and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Complaint filed by attorney Brian Emmanuel Jorde. Attorney has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
March 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jonathan L. Brandon, Doe Administrators of the Medical Entity Defendants #1-#10, Doe Corporations or Companies #1-#5, Doe Nurses #1-#10, Doe Physicians #1-#10, HCA - HealthONE LLC, HealthONE, Thiyaharajan R. Meyappan, Presbyterian St. Luke's Medical Center, Rocky Mountain Hospital for Children at PSL (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6598264)Attorney Brian Emmanuel Jorde added to party Marisela Blanco(pty:pla), Attorney Brian Emmanuel Jorde added to party Steven Blanco, Sr(pty:pla), Attorney Brian Emmanuel Jorde added to party Marisela Blanco, Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Steven Blanco, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Brian Emmanuel Jorde added to party Steven Blanco, Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Steven Blanco, Jr., Sr(pty:pla), filed by Marisela Blanco, Marisela Blanco, Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Steven Blanco, Jr., Steven Blanco, Sr, Steven Blanco, Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Steven Blanco, Jr., Sr.(Jorde, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blanco et al v. HCA - HealthONE LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thiyaharajan R. Meyappan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Presbyterian/St. Luke's Medical Center
Represented By: Eric T. Lund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocky Mountain Hospital for Children at PSL
Represented By: Eric T. Lund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HealthONE
Represented By: Eric T. Lund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Raju Meyappan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCA - HealthONE LLC
Represented By: Eric T. Lund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan L. Brandon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marisela Blanco
Represented By: Brian Emmanuel Jorde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Blanco, Sr.
Represented By: Brian Emmanuel Jorde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marisela (I) Blanco
Represented By: Brian Emmanuel Jorde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven (I) Blanco, Sr.
Represented By: Brian Emmanuel Jorde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?