Nieves et al v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Francisco Nieves and Donna L. Valdez
Defendant: Andrew Lambrecht, Tracy Renaud, William Barr and L. Francis Cissna
Case Number: 1:2019cv00888
Filed: March 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Referring Judge: Marcia S Krieger
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by William Barr, L. Francis Cissna, Andrew Lambrecht, Tracy Renaud.(ul-Haq, Ubaid)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER CONCERNING STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Under D.C.COLO.LCivR 6.1(a), the Stipulation of Extension of Time To Respond To Complaint [#7 ] is approved and granted in part. The deadline for the defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 6/142019. To the extent the parties seek an extension of time beyond 21 days, their stipulation, read as a motion for extension of time, is denied. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 05/24/2019. (athom, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(e) and General Order 2019-2, this case has been reassigned to Judge Marcia S. Krieger effective this date. All future pleadings should be designated 19-cv-00888-MSK. Text Only Entry (angar, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendants William Barr, L. Francis Cissna, Andrew Lambrecht, Tracy Renaud. (ul-Haq, Ubaid)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for all Defendants by Ubaid ul-Haq on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Ubaid ul-Haq added to party William Barr(pty:dft), Attorney Ubaid ul-Haq added to party L. Francis Cissna(pty:dft), Attorney Ubaid ul-Haq added to party Andrew Lambrecht(pty:dft), Attorney Ubaid ul-Haq added to party Tracy Renaud(pty:dft) (ul-Haq, Ubaid)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 CASE REASSIGNED: Upon the passing of Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(e), this case has been reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00888-REB. (Text Only Entry) (dkals, )
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING INSTRUCTIONS OF JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/27/2019. (evana, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (cmadr, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief Immigration Action against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6598999)Attorney Mark Edward Scabavea added to party Francisco Herrera Nieves(pty:pla), filed by Francisco Herrera Nieves.(Scabavea, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nieves et al v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Nieves
Represented By: Mark Edward Scabavea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna L. Valdez
Represented By: Mark Edward Scabavea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Lambrecht
Represented By: Ubaid ul-Haq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Renaud
Represented By: Ubaid ul-Haq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: Ubaid ul-Haq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna
Represented By: Ubaid ul-Haq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?