Buck v. GEICO General Insurance Company and GEICO Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Brian A Buck
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company and Geico Indemnity Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00899
Filed: March 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/7/2019. (bwilk, )
May 7, 2019 Filing 18 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Scheduling Conference held on 5/7/2019 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Discovery due 12/23/2019. Dispositive Motions due 1/27/2020. The Clerk of the Court shall modify the caption to Brian A. Buck v. GEICO General Insurance Company and GEICO Indemnity Company. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall file their proposed pretrial order through CM/ECF, and include a courtesy copy of the proposed order in Word format sent by email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, seven days prior to the conference. FTR: Courtroom A-502. (bwilk, )
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE Nina Y. Wang, by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/30/2019. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-899-NYW (angar, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Government Employees Insurance Company All parties consent.. (Simpson, Michael)
April 30, 2019 Filing 15 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Government Employees Insurance Company. (Simpson, Michael)
April 15, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Government Employees Insurance Company.(Simpson, Michael)
April 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brian Keith Hugen on behalf of Brian A BuckAttorney Brian Keith Hugen added to party Brian A Buck(pty:pla) (Hugen, Brian)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendant's Answer due 4/15/2019. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4.1.2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/29/2019. A Scheduling Conference is set for 5/7/2019 03:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order, including a copy of the proposed order in Word format sent via email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, seven days prior to the Scheduling Conference. (bwilk, )
March 29, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM regarding #7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Government Employees Insurance Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/29/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2018 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/ 29/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Magistrate Judge Wang, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/29/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant Government Employees Insurance Company. (Simpson, Michael)
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND JURY DEMAND against Government Employees Insurance Company, filed by Brian A Buck.(rvill, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rvill, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent GEICO General Insurance Co. for Government Employees Insurance Company. (Simpson, Michael)
March 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Government Employees Insurance Company from Denver District, Case Number 19CV30826. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6601729), filed by Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint)(Simpson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buck v. GEICO General Insurance Company and GEICO Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Scott Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Scott Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company
Represented By: Michael Scott Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian A Buck
Represented By: Brian Keith Hugen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?