Doe 1 et al v. United States Olympic Committee
Plaintiff: Jane ALC Doe 29, Jane KRA Doe 32, Jane KM Doe 15, Jane RAD Doe 24, Jane AG Doe 34, Jane KB Doe 37, Jane RAG Doe 27, Jane TMB Doe 47, Jane MH Doe 38, Jane RAE Doe 25, Jane KK Doe 20, Jane AW Doe 33, Jane KJ Doe 11, Jane LD Doe 19, Jane AC Doe 6, a minor, by Next Friend John Doe AA, Jane TB Doe 36, Jane JA Doe 7, Jane MML Doe 49, Jane ILH Doe 45, a minor by her next friend Jane LH Doe, Jane ANT Doe 44, a minor by her next friend Jane NT Doe, Jane RAC Doe 23, Jane JJF Doe 22, Jane SAF Doe 42, Jane NLF-4 Doe 41, Jane RS Doe 39, Jane PH Doe 8, a minor, by Next Friend Jane Doe PJ, Jane MN Doe 17, Jane MLJ Doe 50, Jane BC Doe 5, Jane BRS Doe 43, a minor by her next friend Jane BR Doe, Jane ME Doe 10, Jane LVB Doe 3, Jane RAF Doe 26, Jane CT Doe 21, Jane MPW Doe 13, Jane CP Doe 35, Jane KN Doe 14, Jane BD Doe 18, Jane GK Doe 4, Jane SM Doe 9, Jane RG Doe 46, Jane MLG Doe 2, Jane NLF-2 Doe 40, Jane RGC Doe 1, Jane AC Doe 16, a minor, by her next friend L.C., Jane DC Doe 31, Jane BH Doe 30, Jane MLM Doe 48, Jane RK Doe 12, Jane RAH Doe 28, a minor by her next friend C.S., Jane LH Doe, Jane NT Doe, John Doe AA, Jane BR Doe, Jane Doe PJ, C.S. and L.C.
Defendant: Angela M. Ruggiero, Ursula M. Burns, John S. Hendricks, Anita L. DeFrantz, Lawrence F. Probst, Robert J. Bach, Larry Buendorf, James L. Easton, Steven M. Mesler, Robert L. Wood, Pisei Whitney Ping, United States Olympic Committee, Susanne D. Lyons, Mary R. McCagg, Alan Ashley, Robert Bowlsby, Scott Blackmun, James M. Benson, William C. Marlot, Nina M. Kemppel, Daniel L. Doctoroff, Kevin M. White and Dave W. Ogrean
Case Number: 1:2019cv00902
Filed: March 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 20:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/9/2019. ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to Restrict and Proceed Anonymously #3 is GRANTED. ORDERED that this case is administratively closed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2, subject to being reopened for good cause shown. ORDERED that if no party files a stipulation to dismiss the case or a motion to reopen the case on or before November 1, 2019, this case will be dismissed with prejudice without further notice to the parties and without further action by the Court. ORDERED that, within seven days of either party filing a motion to reopen the case, plaintiffs shall file with the Court a copy of the complaint containing the legal names of each plaintiff, which shall be maintained at Level 2 Restriction pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR. 7.2. (sphil, )
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/24/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Directing Reassignment. The above-captioned matter is REASSIGNED to Chief Judge Brimmer for all purposes. ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/23/2019. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-902-PAB (angar, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 14 CASE REASSIGNED. All parties do not consent pursuant to #13 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00902-WJM. (Text Only Entry) (agarc, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs C.S., Jane NT Doe, Jane LH Doe, Jane BR Doe, Jane RGC Doe 1, Jane ME Doe 10, Jane KJ Doe 11, Jane RK Doe 12, Jane MPW Doe 13, Jane KN Doe 14, Jane KM Doe 15, Jane MN Doe 17, Jane BD Doe 18, Jane LD Doe 19, Jane MLG Doe 2, Jane KK Doe 20, Jane CT Doe 21, Jane JJF Doe 22, Jane RAC Doe 23, Jane RAD Doe 24, Jane RAE Doe 25, Jane RAF Doe 26, Jane RAG Doe 27, Jane ALC Doe 29, Jane LVB Doe 3, Jane BH Doe 30, Jane DC Doe 31, Jane KRA Doe 32, Jane AW Doe 33, Jane AG Doe 34, Jane CP Doe 35, Jane TB Doe 36, Jane KB Doe 37, Jane MH Doe 38, Jane RS Doe 39, Jane GK Doe 4, Jane NLF-2 Doe 40, Jane NLF-4 Doe 41, Jane SAF Doe 42, Jane RG Doe 46, Jane TMB Doe 47, Jane MLM Doe 48, Jane MML Doe 49, Jane BC Doe 5, Jane MLJ Doe 50, Jane JA Doe 7, Jane SM Doe 9, John Doe AA, Jane Doe PJ, L.C. All parties do not consent.. (Andrus, Vance)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: The Scheduling Conference set for 6/10/2019 is VACATED. No later than 5/17/2019, the parties shall complete and file the Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction indicating either unanimous consent of the parties or that consent has been declined. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/10/19. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 )
May 9, 2019 Filing 11 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Christopher Y. L. Yeung attempted to enter his appearance in this case by affixing his " s/ " signature to the Document No. 9. Mr. Yeung does not appear on the Court's attorney roll as a member of the bar of this court. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a)(5), his purported appearance will not be recognized. (Text Only Entry) (mfred)
May 7, 2019 Filing 10 Exhibits in Support of #9 Stipulation,,, and Notice of Order Entered by the U.S. Bankruptcy Court of Southern District of Indiana by Plaintiffs C.S., Jane NT Doe, Jane LH Doe, Jane BR Doe, Jane RGC Doe 1, Jane ME Doe 10, Jane KJ Doe 11, Jane RK Doe 12, Jane MPW Doe 13, Jane KN Doe 14, Jane KM Doe 15, Jane MN Doe 17, Jane BD Doe 18, Jane LD Doe 19, Jane MLG Doe 2, Jane KK Doe 20, Jane CT Doe 21, Jane JJF Doe 22, Jane RAC Doe 23, Jane RAD Doe 24, Jane RAE Doe 25, Jane RAF Doe 26, Jane RAG Doe 27, Jane ALC Doe 29, Jane LVB Doe 3, Jane BH Doe 30, Jane DC Doe 31, Jane KRA Doe 32, Jane AW Doe 33, Jane AG Doe 34, Jane CP Doe 35, Jane TB Doe 36, Jane KB Doe 37, Jane MH Doe 38, Jane RS Doe 39, Jane GK Doe 4, Jane NLF-2 Doe 40, Jane NLF-4 Doe 41, Jane SAF Doe 42, Jane RG Doe 46, Jane TMB Doe 47, Jane MLM Doe 48, Jane MML Doe 49, Jane BC Doe 5, Jane MLJ Doe 50, Jane JA Doe 7, Jane SM Doe 9, John Doe AA, Jane Doe PJ, L.C.. (Andrus, Vance)
May 3, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION and Notice of Order Entered by the U.S. Bankruptcy Court of Southern District of Indiana by Plaintiffs C.S., Jane NT Doe, Jane LH Doe, Jane BR Doe, Jane RGC Doe 1, Jane ME Doe 10, Jane KJ Doe 11, Jane RK Doe 12, Jane MPW Doe 13, Jane KN Doe 14, Jane KM Doe 15, Jane MN Doe 17, Jane BD Doe 18, Jane LD Doe 19, Jane MLG Doe 2, Jane KK Doe 20, Jane CT Doe 21, Jane JJF Doe 22, Jane RAC Doe 23, Jane RAD Doe 24, Jane RAE Doe 25, Jane RAF Doe 26, Jane RAG Doe 27, Jane ALC Doe 29, Jane LVB Doe 3, Jane BH Doe 30, Jane DC Doe 31, Jane KRA Doe 32, Jane AW Doe 33, Jane AG Doe 34, Jane CP Doe 35, Jane TB Doe 36, Jane KB Doe 37, Jane MH Doe 38, Jane RS Doe 39, Jane GK Doe 4, Jane NLF-2 Doe 40, Jane NLF-4 Doe 41, Jane SAF Doe 42, Jane RG Doe 46, Jane TMB Doe 47, Jane MLM Doe 48, Jane MML Doe 49, Jane BC Doe 5, Jane MLJ Doe 50, Jane JA Doe 7, Jane SM Doe 9, John Doe AA, Jane Doe PJ, L.C.. (Andrus, Vance)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 6/10/2019 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 6/3/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 04/02/2019. (ksena)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jane AW Doe 33, Jane KRA Doe 32, Jane CT Doe 21, Jane JA Doe 7, Jane RAF Doe 26, Jane BD Doe 18, L.C., Jane NT Doe, Jane RAG Doe 27, Jane KK Doe 20, Jane ME Doe 10, Jane DC Doe 31, Jane CP Doe 35, Jane KJ Doe 11, Jane MLM Doe 48, Jane ALC Doe 29, Jane MLJ Doe 50, Jane RS Doe 39, Jane NLF-4 Doe 41, Jane RK Doe 12, Jane KM Doe 15, Jane LH Doe, Jane LD Doe 19, Jane MN Doe 17, Jane MLG Doe 2, Jane RGC Doe 1, Jane BH Doe 30, Jane RAE Doe 25, C.S., Jane NLF-2 Doe 40, Jane KN Doe 14, Jane MML Doe 49, Jane RAD Doe 24, Jane JJF Doe 22, Jane SAF Doe 42, Jane RG Doe 46, Jane RAC Doe 23, Jane MPW Doe 13, John Doe AA, Jane TB Doe 36, Jane LVB Doe 3, Jane SM Doe 9, Jane TMB Doe 47, Jane MH Doe 38, Jane Doe PJ, Jane GK Doe 4, Jane AG Doe 34, Jane KB Doe 37, Jane BR Doe, Jane BC Doe 5. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service - Alan Ashley, #2 Waiver of Service - Angela M. Ruggiero, #3 Waiver of Service - Anita L. DeFrantz, #4 Waiver of Service - Daniel D. Doctoroff, #5 Waiver of Service - Dave W. Ogrean, #6 Waiver of Service - James L. Easton, #7 Waiver of Service - James M. Benson, #8 Waiver of Service - John S. Hendricks, #9 Waiver of Service - Kevin M. White, #10 Waiver of Service - Larry Buendorf, #11 Waiver of Service - Lawrence F. Probst, #12 Waiver of Service - Mary R. McCagg, #13 Waiver of Service - Nina M. Kemppel, #14 Waiver of Service - Pisei Whitney Ping, #15 Waiver of Service - Robert Bowlsby, #16 Waiver of Service - Robert J. Bach, #17 Waiver of Service - Robert L. Wood, #18 Waiver of Service - Scott Blackmun, #19 Waiver of Service - Steven M. Mesler, #20 Waiver of Service - Susanne D. Lyons, #21 Waiver of Service - Ursula M. Burns, #22 Waiver of Service - William C. Marlot)(Andrus, Vance)
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 4 BRIEF in Support of #3 MOTION for Order to Restrict and Proceed Anonymously filed by Plaintiffs Jane RGC Doe 1, Jane ME Doe 10, Jane KJ Doe 11, Jane RK Doe 12, Jane MPW Doe 13, Jane KN Doe 14, Jane KM Doe 15, Jane AC Doe 16, a minor, by her next friend L.C., Jane MN Doe 17, Jane BD Doe 18, Jane LD Doe 19, Jane MLG Doe 2, Jane KK Doe 20, Jane CT Doe 21, Jane JJF Doe 22, Jane RAC Doe 23, Jane RAD Doe 24, Jane RAE Doe 25, Jane RAF Doe 26, Jane RAG Doe 27, Jane RAH Doe 28, a minor by her next friend C.S., Jane ALC Doe 29, Jane LVB Doe 3, Jane BH Doe 30, Jane DC Doe 31, Jane KRA Doe 32, Jane AW Doe 33, Jane AG Doe 34, Jane CP Doe 35, Jane TB Doe 36, Jane KB Doe 37, Jane MH Doe 38, Jane RS Doe 39, Jane GK Doe 4, Jane NLF-2 Doe 40, Jane NLF-4 Doe 41, Jane SAF Doe 42, Jane BRS Doe 43, a minor by her next friend Jane BR Doe, Jane ANT Doe 44, a minor by her next friend Jane NT Doe, Jane ILH Doe 45, a minor by her next friend Jane LH Doe, Jane RG Doe 46, Jane TMB Doe 47, Jane MLM Doe 48, Jane MML Doe 49, Jane BC Doe 5, Jane MLJ Doe 50, Jane AC Doe 6, a minor, by Next Friend John Doe AA, Jane JA Doe 7, Jane PH Doe 8, a minor, by Next Friend Jane Doe PJ, Jane SM Doe 9. (Andrus, Vance)
March 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Order to Restrict and Proceed Anonymously by Plaintiffs Jane RGC Doe 1, Jane ME Doe 10, Jane KJ Doe 11, Jane RK Doe 12, Jane MPW Doe 13, Jane KN Doe 14, Jane KM Doe 15, Jane AC Doe 16, a minor, by her next friend L.C., Jane MN Doe 17, Jane BD Doe 18, Jane LD Doe 19, Jane MLG Doe 2, Jane KK Doe 20, Jane CT Doe 21, Jane JJF Doe 22, Jane RAC Doe 23, Jane RAD Doe 24, Jane RAE Doe 25, Jane RAF Doe 26, Jane RAG Doe 27, Jane RAH Doe 28, a minor by her next friend C.S., Jane ALC Doe 29, Jane LVB Doe 3, Jane BH Doe 30, Jane DC Doe 31, Jane KRA Doe 32, Jane AW Doe 33, Jane AG Doe 34, Jane CP Doe 35, Jane TB Doe 36, Jane KB Doe 37, Jane MH Doe 38, Jane RS Doe 39, Jane GK Doe 4, Jane NLF-2 Doe 40, Jane NLF-4 Doe 41, Jane SAF Doe 42, Jane BRS Doe 43, a minor by her next friend Jane BR Doe, Jane ANT Doe 44, a minor by her next friend Jane NT Doe, Jane ILH Doe 45, a minor by her next friend Jane LH Doe, Jane RG Doe 46, Jane TMB Doe 47, Jane MLM Doe 48, Jane MML Doe 49, Jane BC Doe 5, Jane MLJ Doe 50, Jane AC Doe 6, a minor, by Next Friend John Doe AA, Jane JA Doe 7, Jane PH Doe 8, a minor, by Next Friend Jane Doe PJ, Jane SM Doe 9. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Andrus, Vance)
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Vance Robert Andrus on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Andrus, Vance)
March 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Alan Ashley, Robert J. Bach, James M. Benson, Scott Blackmun, Robert Bowlsby, Larry Buendorf, Ursula M. Burns, Anita L. DeFrantz, Daniel L. Doctoroff, James L. Easton, John S. Hendricks, Nina M. Kemppel, Susanne D. Lyons, William C. Marlot, Mary R. McCagg, Steven M. Mesler, Dave W. Ogrean, Lawrence F. Probst, Angela M. Ruggiero, United States Olympic Committee, Kevin M. White, Pisei Whitney Ping, Robert L. Wood (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6603008)Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane RGC Doe 1(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane ME Doe 10(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane KJ Doe 11(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane RK Doe 12(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane MPW Doe 13(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane KN Doe 14(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane KM Doe 15(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane AC Doe 16, a minor, by her next friend L.C.(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane MN Doe 17(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane BD Doe 18(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane LD Doe 19(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane MLG Doe 2(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane KK Doe 20(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane CT Doe 21(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane JJF Doe 22(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane RAC Doe 23(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane RAD Doe 24(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane RAE Doe 25(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane RAF Doe 26(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane RAG Doe 27(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane RAH Doe 28, a minor by her next friend C.S.(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane ALC Doe 29(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane LVB Doe 3(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane BH Doe 30(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane DC Doe 31(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane KRA Doe 32(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane AW Doe 33(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane AG Doe 34(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane CP Doe 35(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane TB Doe 36(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane KB Doe 37(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane MH Doe 38(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane RS Doe 39(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane GK Doe 4(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane NLF-2 Doe 40(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane NLF-4 Doe 41(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane SAF Doe 42(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane BRS Doe 43, a minor by her next friend Jane BR Doe(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane ANT Doe 44, a minor by her next friend Jane NT Doe(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane ILH Doe 45, a minor by her next friend Jane LH Doe(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane RG Doe 46(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane TMB Doe 47(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane MLM Doe 48(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane MML Doe 49(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane BC Doe 5(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane MLJ Doe 50(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane AC Doe 6, a minor, by Next Friend John Doe AA(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane JA Doe 7(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane PH Doe 8, a minor, by Next Friend Jane Doe PJ(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane SM Doe 9(pty:pla), filed by Jane AW Doe 33, Jane KRA Doe 32, Jane CT Doe 21, Jane JA Doe 7, Jane RAF Doe 26, Jane BD Doe 18, Jane AC Doe 16, a minor, by her next friend L.C., Jane ANT Doe 44, a minor by her next friend Jane NT Doe, Jane RAG Doe 27, Jane KK Doe 20, Jane ME Doe 10, Jane DC Doe 31, Jane CP Doe 35, Jane KJ Doe 11, Jane MLM Doe 48, Jane ALC Doe 29, Jane MLJ Doe 50, Jane RS Doe 39, Jane NLF-4 Doe 41, Jane RK Doe 12, Jane KM Doe 15, Jane ILH Doe 45, a minor by her next friend Jane LH Doe, Jane LD Doe 19, Jane MN Doe 17, Jane MLG Doe 2, Jane RGC Doe 1, Jane BH Doe 30, Jane RAE Doe 25, Jane RAH Doe 28, a minor by her next friend C.S., Jane NLF-2 Doe 40, Jane KN Doe 14, Jane MML Doe 49, Jane RAD Doe 24, Jane JJF Doe 22, Jane SAF Doe 42, Jane RG Doe 46, Jane RAC Doe 23, Jane MPW Doe 13, Jane AC Doe 6, a minor, by Next Friend John Doe AA, Jane TB Doe 36, Jane LVB Doe 3, Jane SM Doe 9, Jane TMB Doe 47, Jane MH Doe 38, Jane PH Doe 8, a minor, by Next Friend Jane Doe PJ, Jane GK Doe 4, Jane AG Doe 34, Jane KB Doe 37, Jane BRS Doe 43, a minor by her next friend Jane BR Doe, Jane BC Doe 5. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons USOC, #3 Summons Lawrence F. Probst, #4 Summons Robert J. Bach, #5 Summons James M. Benson, #6 Summons Robert Bowlsby, #7 Summons Ursula M. Burns, #8 Summons Anita L. DeFrantz, #9 Summons Daniel L. Doctoroff, #10 Summons James L. Easton, #11 Summons John S. Hendricks, #12 Summons Nina M. Kemppel, #13 Summons Susanne D. Lyons, #14 Summons William C. Marlot, #15 Summons Mary R. McCagg, #16 Summons Steven M. Mesler, #17 Summons Dave W. Orgrean, #18 Summons Pisei Whitney Ping, #19 Summons Angela M. Ruggiero, #20 Summons Kevin M. White, #21 Summons Robert L. Wood, #22 Summons Scott Blackmun, #23 Summons Alan Ashley, #24 Summons Larry Buendorf)(Andrus, Vance)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe 1 et al v. United States Olympic Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela M. Ruggiero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ursula M. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John S. Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anita L. DeFrantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence F. Probst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Bach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Buendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L. Easton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven M. Mesler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pisei Whitney Ping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Olympic Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susanne D. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary R. McCagg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bowlsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Blackmun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William C. Marlot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nina M. Kemppel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel L. Doctoroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin M. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave W. Ogrean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane ALC Doe 29
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane KRA Doe 32
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane KM Doe 15
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane RAD Doe 24
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane AG Doe 34
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane KB Doe 37
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane RAG Doe 27
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane TMB Doe 47
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane MH Doe 38
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane RAE Doe 25
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane KK Doe 20
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane AW Doe 33
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane KJ Doe 11
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane LD Doe 19
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane AC Doe 6, a minor, by Next Friend John Doe AA
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane TB Doe 36
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane JA Doe 7
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane MML Doe 49
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane ILH Doe 45, a minor by her next friend Jane LH Doe
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane ANT Doe 44, a minor by her next friend Jane NT Doe
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane RAC Doe 23
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane JJF Doe 22
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane SAF Doe 42
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane NLF-4 Doe 41
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane RS Doe 39
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane PH Doe 8, a minor, by Next Friend Jane Doe PJ
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane MN Doe 17
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane MLJ Doe 50
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane BC Doe 5
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane BRS Doe 43, a minor by her next friend Jane BR Doe
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane ME Doe 10
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane LVB Doe 3
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane RAF Doe 26
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane CT Doe 21
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane MPW Doe 13
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane CP Doe 35
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane KN Doe 14
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane BD Doe 18
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane GK Doe 4
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane SM Doe 9
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane RG Doe 46
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane MLG Doe 2
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane NLF-2 Doe 40
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane RGC Doe 1
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane AC Doe 16, a minor, by her next friend L.C.
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane DC Doe 31
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane BH Doe 30
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane MLM Doe 48
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane RK Doe 12
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane RAH Doe 28, a minor by her next friend C.S.
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane LH Doe
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane NT Doe
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe AA
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane BR Doe
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe PJ
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.S.
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.C.
Represented By: Vance Robert Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?