Sorter v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Valerie Sorter
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00921
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CIVIL CASE SCHEDULING ORDER IN AN ERISA ACTION: by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/30/19. (amont, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 13 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang: Scheduling Conference held on 5/30/2019. Plaintiff Brief due by 8/16/2019. Defendant Brief due by 9/13/2019. Plaintiff Reply Brief due by 9/27/2019. Discovery due by 7/31/2019. FTR: Courtroom A-502. (amont, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 12 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Valerie Sorter. (Garvey, Timothy)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER of Reference to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/7/2019. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-921-LTB-NYW (angar, )
April 23, 2019 Filing 10 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #9 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00921-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America All parties do not consent.. (Englert, Jack)
April 18, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE re #5 Order,, by Plaintiff Valerie Sorter. (McDermott, Shawn)
April 18, 2019 Filing 7 Life Insurance Company of North America ANSWER to #1 Complaint, of Plaintiff Valerie Sorter Attorney Jack M. Englert, Jr added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft) by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Englert, Jack)
April 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Valerie Sorter. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 3/29/2019, answer due 4/19/2019. (Garvey, Timothy)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE IN AN ERISA ACTION AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4/1/2019. A Scheduling Conference is set for 5/30/2019 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order, including a copy of the proposed order in Word format sent via email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 5/16/2019. The parties shall complete and file the Consent/Nonconsent Form by 5/16/2019. Counsel may file a motion to vacate the Scheduling Conference at the time they file the proposed scheduling order if there are no disputes with respect to the proposed scheduling order. (bwilk, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rroge, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Counsel by Shawn E. McDermott on behalf of Valerie SorterAttorney Shawn E. McDermott added to party Valerie Sorter(pty:pla) (McDermott, Shawn)
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6606143)Attorney Timothy M. Garvey added to party Valerie Sorter(pty:pla), filed by Valerie Sorter. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Garvey, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sorter v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Jack M. Englert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Sorter
Represented By: Shawn E. McDermott
Represented By: Timothy M. Garvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?