Brown et al v. Tennison et al

Plaintiff: Dennis L Brown and Paul D Brown
Defendant: Frederick Arias, John Doe Number Three, Bradley J Tennison, John Doe Number One, Shield Defense Systems, Inc., John Doe Number Two, The Joseph Project, Tennison Investments, Inc., Wayne Edward Bell and Joseph Project, The
Case Number: 1:2019cv00941
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Referring Judge: Raymond P Moore
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 36 REASSIGNING JUDGE pursuant to 35 Order this case is reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00941-RM-SKC. (Text Only Entry) (athom, )
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a) and the direction of the Chief Judge, the Clerk of Court shall return this case directly to Judge Raymond P. Moore. By Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 07/12/2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc2)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING #29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. For good cause shown, the Motion is GRANTED. The Court finds Plaintiffs' arguments unpersuasive. Plaintiffs' counsel sent the Complaint to Polsinelli's Phoenix, AZ offices at a time when they were not representing Defendant Bradley J. Tennison in this matter. Plaintiff effectively requests the Court to recognize an obligation on unretained attorneys to prepare for litigation any time they receive pleadings. It will not do so. Defendant retained Defense Counsel in this matter on July 5, 2019. This is sufficient good cause to extend the answer deadline. Defendant Tennison shall have 30 days from the date he retained counsel to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Tenninson's answer or other responsive pleading is due 8/5/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 7/11/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
July 11, 2019 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to #29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,,, filed by Defendant Bradley J Tennison. (Gallagher, Sean)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, filed by Bradley J Tennison. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 07/11/2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc2)
July 11, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE to #29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,,, filed by Plaintiffs Dennis L Brown, Paul D Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Thomaidis, James)
July 10, 2019 Filing 30 Defendant Wayne Edward Bell's ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, with Affirmative Defenses by Wayne Edward Bell.(Cutler, L.)
July 10, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,,, by Defendant Bradley J Tennison. (Gallagher, Sean)
July 10, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sean Robert Gallagher on behalf of Bradley J TennisonAttorney Sean Robert Gallagher added to party Bradley J Tennison(pty:dft) (Gallagher, Sean)
June 27, 2019 Filing 27 DOCKETING ERROR - ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: 11 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond, #12 Summons Returned Executed filed by attorneyJennifer E. Bisset. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (athom, ) Modified on 6/27/2019 to note that docket entry was made in the incorrect case in error by clerk. (athom, ).
June 27, 2019 Filing 26 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: Wayne Edward Bell answer due 7/10/2019 pursuant to 25 Order. Text Only Entry (athom, )
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendant Wayne Edward Bell shall file his answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before July 10, 2019. By Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 06/27/2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc2)
June 27, 2019 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,,, by Defendant Wayne Edward Bell. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Cutler, L.)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING IN PART #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. The Motion is GRANTED to the extent that it seeks additional time to answer the Complaint. The Motion is DENIED to the extent it seeks 60 days to respond. Accordingly, for good cause shown, IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Bradley J. Tennison's Answer or other responsive pleading is due 7/10/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 6/19/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #21 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Bradley J Tennison. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 06/19/2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc2)
June 19, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time by Defendant Bradley J Tennison. (cthom, )
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING IN PART #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. The Motion is GRANTED to the extent that it seeks additional time to answer the Complaint. The Motion is DENIED to the extent it seeks 60 days to respond. Accordingly, for good cause shown, IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Frederick Arias' Answer or other responsive pleading is due 7/10/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 6/19/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, filed by Frederick Arias. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 06/14/2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc2)
June 14, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Frederick Arias. (athom, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul D Brown, Dennis L Brown. Bradley J Tennison served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (Thomaidis, James)
June 3, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul D Brown, Dennis L Brown. Tennison Investments, Inc. served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (Thomaidis, James)
June 3, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul D Brown, Dennis L Brown. Joseph Project, The served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (Thomaidis, James)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference is set for 9/24/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 9/17/2019. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF. #3-1) is due 9/17/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 6/3/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
May 30, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul D Brown, Dennis L Brown. Shield Defense Systems, Inc. served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Thomaidis, James)
May 30, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul D Brown, Dennis L Brown. Frederick Arias served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Thomaidis, James)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond re #10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, Wayne Edward Bell answer due 6/27/2019. By Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 5/24/2019. Text Only Entry(dddlc2, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,,, by Defendant Wayne Edward Bell. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Cutler, L.)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REASSIGNING JUDGE. This action is reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico, upon his appointment. Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all previously scheduled matters will be maintained and will now be handled by Judge Domenico in Courtroom A-702. His chambers are located in A-738 of the Alfred A. Arraj Courthouse. His telephone number is 303-335-2468. All future pleadings 19-cv-00941-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (dkals, )
May 8, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul D Brown, Dennis L Brown. Wayne Edward Bell served on 4/14/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Thomaidis, James)
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Plaintiffs Dennis L Brown, Paul D Brown. Dennis L Brown answer due 5/28/2019; Paul D Brown answer due 5/28/2019. (Cutler, L.)
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by L. Norton Cutler on behalf of Wayne Edward BellAttorney L. Norton Cutler added to party Wayne Edward Bell(pty:dft) (Cutler, L.)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/1/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/1/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rroge, )
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Frederick Arias, Wayne Edward Bell, John Doe Number One, John Doe Number Three, John Doe Number Two, Shield Defense Systems, Inc., Bradley J Tennison, Tennison Investments, Inc., The Joseph Project (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6609734)Attorney James Nicholas Thomaidis added to party Dennis L Brown(pty:pla), Attorney James Nicholas Thomaidis added to party Paul D Brown(pty:pla), filed by Paul D Brown, Dennis L Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Summons of Bradley J. Tennison, #7 Summons of Frederick Arias, #8 Summons of Wayne Edward Bell, #9 Summons of Tennison Investments, Inc., #10 Summons of Shield Defense Systems, Inc., #11 Summons of The Joseph Project, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thomaidis, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Tennison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Arias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Number Three
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley J Tennison
Represented By: Sean Robert Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Number One
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shield Defense Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Number Two
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Joseph Project
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennison Investments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Edward Bell
Represented By: L. Norton Cutler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Project, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis L Brown
Represented By: James Nicholas Thomaidis
Represented By: Mollie B. Hawes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul D Brown
Represented By: James Nicholas Thomaidis
Represented By: Mollie B. Hawes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?