John Paul Mitchell Systems et al v. R. Stafford Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John Paul DeJoria and John Paul Mitchell Systems
Defendant: R. Stafford Company, Inc., Robert Stafford and Robert (I) Stafford
Case Number: 1:2019cv00948
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 t
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #15 Motion to Stay. In light of the parties' representations regarding their settlement negotiations, the deadlines in this case are STAYED and the Scheduling Conference set for July 3, 2019 is VACATED. If the parties have not reached a final settlement on or before July 22, 2019, they shall file a Joint Status Report on that day updating the Court on the progress of the negotiations. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 6/18/2019. Text Only Entry(skclc1)
June 18, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Stay by Plaintiffs John Paul DeJoria, John Paul Mitchell Systems. (Benson, Stephen)
June 7, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants R. Stafford Company, Inc., Robert Stafford, Robert (I) Stafford. R. Stafford Company, Inc. answer due 6/24/2019; Robert Stafford answer due 6/24/2019; Robert (I) Stafford answer due 6/24/2019. (Benson, Stephen)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM Scheduling Conference set for 7/3/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Consent Form due by 6/26/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 4/18/19. (amont, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Paul Mitchell Systems, John Paul DeJoria. Robert Stafford waiver sent on 4/10/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Benson, Stephen)
April 16, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Paul Mitchell Systems, John Paul DeJoria. R. Stafford Company, Inc. waiver sent on 4/10/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Benson, Stephen)
April 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kimberly Anne Beis on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Kimberly Anne Beis added to party John Paul DeJoria(pty:pla), Attorney Kimberly Anne Beis added to party John Paul Mitchell Systems(pty:pla) (Beis, Kimberly)
April 2, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00948-SKC. (athom, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 7 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by attorney Stephen Paul Benson. The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (athom, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (rroge, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #1 Complaint, filed by attorney Stephen P. Benson.The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (rroge, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Benson, Stephen)
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiffs John Paul DeJoria, John Paul Mitchell Systems (Benson, Stephen)
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Defamation and Jury Demand against R. Stafford Company, Inc., Robert Stafford (Filing fee $ 400).Attorney Stephen Paul Benson added to party John Paul DeJoria(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Paul Benson added to party John Paul Mitchell Systems(pty:pla), filed by John Paul Mitchell Systems, John Paul DeJoria.(Benson, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Paul Mitchell Systems et al v. R. Stafford Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Stafford Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert (I) Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Paul DeJoria
Represented By: Stephen Paul Benson
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Beis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Paul Mitchell Systems
Represented By: Stephen Paul Benson
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Beis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?