USA v. Cantliffe et al

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, David L Cantliffe, Colorado Department of Revenue, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Perry M Wentling, Boulder County, Colorado and Margi H Cantliffe
Case Number: 1:2019cv00951
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Order to Approve Stipulation by Defendant Colorado Department of Revenue. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Casey, Shawn)
July 10, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone at July 30, 2019, Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Ramirez, E.)
July 9, 2019 Filing 16 DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST in Real Property Signed by Defendant Margi Hope Cantliffe by Plaintiff USA. (Ramirez, E.)
July 5, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Order to Approve Stipulation between United States and Boulder County, Colorado by Plaintiff USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Ramirez, E.)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. David L Cantliffe answer due 7/22/2019, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/3/2019.(jgonz, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant David L Cantliffe. (Noyes, Michael)
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance and Request for Copies of All Notices by Michael Manley Noyes on behalf of David L CantliffeAttorney Michael Manley Noyes added to party David L Cantliffe(pty:dft) (Noyes, Michael)
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, Attorney Jamie Grant Siler added to party Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jamie Grant Siler added to party Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC(pty:dft) by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.(Siler, Jamie)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER. PLEASE NOTE DATE AND TIME CHANGE ONLY. This matter is before the Court sua sponte. Due to a conflict on the Court calendar, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for July 26, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. is VACATED and RESET to July 30, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom A-401, Fourth Floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the proposed scheduling order shall be submitted on or before July 23, 2019. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/31/2019. Text Only Entry (klmlc1, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Counsel by Olivia Denton Lucas on behalf of Boulder County, ColoradoAttorney Olivia Denton Lucas added to party Boulder County, Colorado(pty:dft) (Lucas, Olivia)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel for the United States. Attorney Adam Strait is relieved of any further representation of Plaintiff. The Clerk of Court is instructed to terminate Attorney Strait as counsel of record, and to remove this name from the electronic certificate of mailing. Plaintiff shall continue to be represented by Attorney E. Carmen Ramirez. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/26/2019. Text Only Entry(klmlc1, )
April 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and to Substitute Trial Attorney E. Carmen Ramirez by Plaintiff USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Ramirez, E.)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/17/19. Scheduling Conference set for 7/26/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (lgale, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00951-KLM. (athom, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, ) Modified to correct text entry on 4/1/2019 (rvill, ).
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Boulder County, Colorado, David L Cantliffe, Margi H Cantliffe, Colorado Department of Revenue, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Perry M Wentling Attorney Adam David Strait added to party United States of America(pty:pla), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons to David Cantliffe, #3 Proposed Summons to Wentling as Trustee, #4 Proposed Summons to Margi Cantliffe, #5 Proposed Summons to MERS, #6 Proposed Summons to Ocwen Loan Servicing, #7 Proposed Summons to Colorado Department of Revenue, #8 Proposed Summons to Boulder County)(Strait, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Cantliffe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Adam David Strait
Represented By: E. Carmen Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Jamie Grant Siler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L Cantliffe
Represented By: Michael Manley Noyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Department of Revenue
Represented By: Shawn Carroll Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Grant Siler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry M Wentling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boulder County, Colorado
Represented By: Olivia Denton Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margi H Cantliffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?