Hall v. Zenergyst Software, LLC et al
Plaintiff: James J Hall
Defendant: Jack R Berube, Zenergyst Software, LLC and Laura Boone Berube
Case Number: 1:2019cv00962
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: John L Kane
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants Jack R Berube, Laura Boone Berube, Zenergyst Software, LLC. All Defendants. (Winkler, Dart)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information Firm Name and Email Changes by Dart Morgan Winkler (Winkler, Dart)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 Upon the passing of Judge Richard P. Matsch and pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a), this case has been reassigned to Judge John L. Kane effective this date. All future pleading should be designated as 19-cv-00962-JLK. (Text Only Entry) (ktera)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service on Zenergyst Software LLC by serving Jack R. Berube, as Registered Agent, on 5/14/2019 with Summons, Complaint, Amended and Restated Note, Consent/Non-Consent to Exercise Jurisdiction and Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff James J Hall. (Winkler, Dart)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Laura Boone Berube by serving Jack R. Berube on 5/14/2019 with Summons, Complaint, Amended and Restated Note, Consent/Non-Consent to Exercise Jurisdiction and Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff James J Hall. (Winkler, Dart)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by personally serving Jack R. Berube on 5/14/2019 with Summons, Complaint, Amended and Restated Note, Consent/Non-Consent to Exercise Jurisdiction and Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff James J Hall. (Winkler, Dart)
April 2, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Richard P. Matsch and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6612551)Attorney Dart Morgan Winkler added to party James J Hall(pty:pla), filed by James J Hall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint - Note, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons on Jack Berube, #4 Summons Summons on Laura Berube, #5 Summons Summons on Zenergyst)(Winkler, Dart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Zenergyst Software, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack R Berube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zenergyst Software, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Boone Berube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James J Hall
Represented By: Dart Morgan Winkler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?