USA v. Tebedo et al

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: El Paso County, Colorado, Kevin D. Tebedo, State of Colorado and Loretta J. Tebedo
Case Number: 1:2019cv00969
Filed: April 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SECOND AMENDED ORDER SETTING Scheduling Conference for 8/19/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 8/12/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 07/08/2019. (ksena) (Main Document 25 replaced on 7/8/2019) (ksena, ).
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER granting #23 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference set for July 15, 2019, is vacated, to be reset by separate order. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/3/19. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
July 3, 2019 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Scheduling/Planning Conference by Defendants Kevin D. Tebedo, Loretta J. Tebedo. (Fielder, Gary)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Dismiss State of Colorado as a Party. The motion is construed as a voluntary dismissal under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), for which no order is required. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/3/19. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
July 3, 2019 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Party (State of Colorado) by Plaintiff USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Golden, Jennifer)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Kevin D. Tebedo answer due 8/5/2019; Loretta J. Tebedo answer due 8/5/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/1/19. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
July 1, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendants Kevin D. Tebedo, Loretta J. Tebedo. (Fielder, Gary)
July 1, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Gary D. Fielder on behalf of Kevin D. Tebedo, Loretta J. TebedoAttorney Gary D. Fielder added to party Kevin D. Tebedo(pty:dft), Attorney Gary D. Fielder added to party Loretta J. Tebedo(pty:dft) (Fielder, Gary)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED ORDER SETTING Scheduling Conference for 7/15/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 7/8/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 05/07/2019. (ksena)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond Kevin D. Tebedo answer due 7/1/2019; Loretta J. Tebedo answer due 7/1/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/6/19. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
May 6, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Enlargement of Time by Defendants Kevin D. Tebedo, Loretta J. Tebedo. (jgonz, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION Regarding Lien Priority Between the United States and El Paso County, Colorado by Plaintiff USA. (Golden, Jennifer)
April 30, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by El Paso County, Colorado.(Seago, Lori)
April 26, 2019 Filing 12 DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST by Defendant State of Colorado. (Casey, Shawn)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendants have failed to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1(a). By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/26/19. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
April 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Enlargement of Time, by Defendants Kevin D. Tebedo, Loretta J. Tebedo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Affidavit, #5 Proof of Service)(jgonz, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. Loretta J. Tebedo served on 4/11/2019, answer due 5/2/2019. (Golden, Jennifer)
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. Kevin D. Tebedo served on 4/11/2019, answer due 5/2/2019. (Golden, Jennifer)
April 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. El Paso County, Colorado served on 4/9/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. (Golden, Jennifer)
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. State of Colorado served on 4/9/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. (Golden, Jennifer)
April 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lori Lynn Seago on behalf of El Paso County, ColoradoAttorney Lori Lynn Seago added to party El Paso County, Colorado(pty:dft) (Seago, Lori)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 6/10/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 6/3/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 04/03/2019. (ksena)
April 2, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against El Paso County, State of Colorado, Kevin D. Tebedo, Loretta J. Tebedo Attorney Jennifer Yu Golden added to party United States of America(pty:pla), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Kevin Tebedo, #3 Summons - Loretta Tebedo, #4 Summons - State of Colorado, #5 Summons - El Paso County)(Golden, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Tebedo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso County, Colorado
Represented By: Lori Lynn Seago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin D. Tebedo
Represented By: Gary D. Fielder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Colorado
Represented By: Shawn Carroll Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loretta J. Tebedo
Represented By: Gary D. Fielder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Jennifer Yu Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?