Sodhi v. Choate
Petitioner: Janamjot Singh Sodhi
Respondent: Ronald Vitiello, Jeffrey D Lynch, Johnny Choate, Kirstjen M. Nielsen and William P. Barr
Interested Party: Officer Paul Lauciello
Case Number: 1:2019cv00974
Filed: April 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 27 SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBIT to #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Janamjot Singh Sodhi. (tsher, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 26 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Motion Hearing held on 6/26/2019. FTR: Courtroom C205. (slibi, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 25 Petitioner's TRAVERSE to Respondent's Reply, by Petitioner Janamjot Singh Sodhi. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tsher, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause (Corrected) by Respondent Johnny Choate. (Attachments: #1 Mastley Declaration)(Carter, William)
May 29, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Filing of Corrected Response by Respondent Johnny Choate (Carter, William)
May 28, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE to #8 Amended Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Johnny Choate. (Attachments: #1 Mastley Declaration)(Carter, William)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER Motion Hearing re #12 Show Cause Order set for 6/26/2019 04:00 PM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 5/23/2019. (slibi, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT for United States Attorney General re: #13 Certificate of Service. (tsher, )
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #17 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/20/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
May 17, 2019 Filing 19 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Petitioner Janamjot Singh Sodhi. All parties consent. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tsher, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 17 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Respondent Johnny Choate All parties consent.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carter, William)
May 17, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William Dean Carter on behalf of Johnny ChoateAttorney William Dean Carter added to party Johnny Choate(pty:res) (Carter, William)
May 14, 2019 Filing 15 CERTFIED MAIL RECEIPT for Warden Johnny Choate re: #13 Certificate of Service. (tsher, )
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 5/8/2019. Consent Form due by 5/17/2019. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (tsher, )
May 8, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court for Service of Process re #8 Amended Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #10 Order Drawing Case #12 Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 USPS Certified Mail Receipts) (rroge, )
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER to Show Cause. Respondent show cause within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order why the application for a writ of habeas corpus should not be granted, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/7/2019. (angar, )
May 7, 2019 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, )
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Drawing Case, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/7/2019. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-974-NRN (angar, )
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER. Applicant's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Short Form) (ECF No. #2 ) is DENIED as moot because Applicant has paid the filing fee, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/25/2019.(angar, )
April 23, 2019 Filing 7 PAYMENT RECEIVED from Janamjot Singh Sodhi in the amount of $ 5.00; Receipt Number COX089945; Monthly Payment. (evana, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, filed by Janamjot Singh Sodhi. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document)(evana, )
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Petitioner to Cure Deficiencies. If Petitioner fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/2/2019. (angar, ) forms mailed as ordered
April 2, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from the Eastern District of California; Case Number 1:19-cv-00409. File, transfer order and docket sheet received .
April 2, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order, served on Janamjot Singh Sodhi. (Marrujo, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 4/2/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING This Case to the U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/1/19. (Marrujo, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 4/2/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Janamjot Singh Sodhi. (Jessen, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 4/2/2019.] Modified on 4/2/2019 (rvill, ).
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 (2241) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Ronald Vitiello, Jeffrey D. Lynch, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Johnny Choate, William P. Barr by Janamjot Singh Sodhi. (Jessen, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 4/2/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sodhi v. Choate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald Vitiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey D Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Johnny Choate
Represented By: William Dean Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Janamjot Singh Sodhi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Officer Paul Lauciello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?