In re: David Lee Smith and Mary Julia Hook

Appellant: Mary Julia Hook and David Lee Smith
Interested Party: U.S. Trustee and United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
Appellee: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00975
Filed: March 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DISMISSING CASE by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/3/19. The Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal #11 filed May 3, 2019 is approved; this appeal is dismissed; the parties shall bear their own costs; and any court costs on appeal shall be paid by debtors; and this case is closed. (rebsec)
May 3, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Walton, Kevin)
April 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kevin G. Walton on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.Attorney Kevin G. Walton added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:e) (Walton, Kevin)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Establishing Bankruptcy Appeal Briefing Requirements re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, filed by Mary Julia Hook, David Lee Smith. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 04/03/2019. (athom, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 7 CASE REASSIGNED. This case was originally assigned using the incorrect assignment criteria. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, this case has been directly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-975-REB. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER on Debtor's Motion for Leave to Proceed on Appeal to the United States District Court for the District of Colorado Without Payment of Fees and Costs; and Order Denying Request for Seal by U.S. Bankruptcy Judge Thomas B. McNamara on 28 March, 2019. (cmadr, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 CASE OPENING. The above captioned case was opened on 25 March, 2019 and assigned the case number referenced above. After docketing of the record on appeal from the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, briefing will proceed in accordance with Bankruptcy Rules 8014, 8015, and 8018, and any orders of the court. When referencing trial exhibits you must attach copies to your brief. If the court finds it necessary to have the originals presented it will issue an order. All filings with the United States District Court, unless otherwise permitted by our Electronic Case Filing Procedures, must be done electronically. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 Financial Declaration Affidavit to Accompany Motion for Permission to Appeal in Forma Pauperis by Appellants Mary Julia Hook, David Lee Smith. (cmadr, )
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Dismissing Complaint by U.S. Bankruptcy Judge Thomas B. McNamara on 11 March, 2019. (cmadr, )
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Denying Debtors/Plaintiffs' Motion to Set Adversary Proceeding for a Jury Trial by U.S. Bankruptcy Judge Thomas B. McNamara on 21 February 2019. (cmadr, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT by Appellants Mary Julia Hook, David Lee Smith in re: Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Dismissing Complaint, Order Denying Debtor's/Plaintiff's Motion to Set Adversary Proceedings for Jury Trial of 03/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Notice of Transmittal)(cmadr, ) Modified to correct filing date on 4/2/2019 (cmadr, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: David Lee Smith and Mary Julia Hook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Mary Julia Hook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: David Lee Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Rebekah Lee Wallace Elliott
Represented By: Kevin G. Walton
Represented By: Deanna Lee Westfall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?