Graham v. Waters et al
Plaintiff: Jimmie Graham
Defendant: Tom Waters, Alexandra Walker and Denise Balazic
Case Number: 1:2019cv01018
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER. On June 17 and June 24, 2019, Plaintiff filed two "Brief[s] in Support of Motion for Reconsideration and Written Objections to Magistrate's Recommendation." (ECF Nos, #19 , #21 ). To the extent that Plaintiff intends his filings to serve as renewed motions for reconsideration, the motions are DENIED by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/8/2019. (angar, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 21 BRIEF in Support of #11 MOTION for Reconsideration and Written Objections to Magistrate's Recommendation, filed by Plaintiff Jimmie Graham. (evana, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 20 LETTER re: #19 Brief in Support of MOTION for Reconsideration and Written Objections to Magistrate's Recommendation by Plaintiff Jimmie Graham. (agarc, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 19 Brief in Support of to #11 MOTION for Reconsideration and Written Objections to Magistrate's Recommendation by Plaintiff Jimmie Graham. (agarc, ) Modified on 6/18/2019 to correct typo (agarc, ).
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER of USCA as to #13 Notice of Appeal filed by Jimmie Graham. (USCA Case No. 19-1205) (angar, )
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed on Appeal Without Prepayment of Costs or Fees (ECF No. 15) is DENIED as moot. In the Order of Dismissal entered May 10, 2019 (ECF No. 8), the Court denied leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal without prejudice to the filing of a motion seeking leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/10/2019.(angar, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 16 USCA Case Number 19-1205 for #13 Notice of Appeal filed by Jimmie Graham. (angar, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the #13 Notice of Appeal filed by Jimmie Graham to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (Pro Se, Fee not paid,) (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record and Docket Sheet)(angar, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Proceed on Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Plaintiff Jimmie Graham. (Attachments: #1 Addendum to Financial Declaration)(angar, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #8 Order of Dismissal and #9 Judgment, by Plaintiff Jimmie Graham. (angar, )
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. Plaintiff's "Motion for Reconsideration and Written Objections to Magistrate Recommendation" (ECF No. #11 ) is denied. Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Written Objections to Magistrate Recommendation (ECF No. #10 ) is denied as moot, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/30/2019.(angar, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Reconsideration and Written Objections to Magistrate Recommendation, by Plaintiff Jimmie Graham. (angar, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Written Objections to Magistrate Recommendation, by Plaintiff Jimmie Graham. (angar, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 9 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #8 Order of Dismissal on 5/10/2019. (angar, )
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER of Dismissal. Leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied without prejudice to the filing of a motion seeking leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this dismissal would not be taken in good faith, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/10/2019. (angar, )
April 19, 2019 Filing 7 RECOMMENDATION Regarding Dismissal, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/19/2019. (angar, )
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER of Reference to United States Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/18/2019. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-1018-LTB-GPG (angar, )
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1, the Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. The undersigned will remain as the assigned magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/16/2019. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-1018-LTB (angar, )
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #2 Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/8/2019. (angar, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Jimmie Graham. (cmadr, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against Denise Balazic, Alexandra Walker, Tom Waters, filed by Jimmie Graham.(cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graham v. Waters et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandra Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Balazic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?