American Civil Liberties Union of Colorado v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement

Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union of Colorado
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 1:2019cv01036
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Filing 20 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Status Conference held on 6/6/2019 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Defendant shall file its opening brief on or before July 17, 2019. Plaintiff shall file its response on or before August 7, 2019. Defendant shall file its reply on or before August 21, 2019. FTR: Courtroom A-502. (bwilk, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Bobet, Jane)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #17 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/22/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
May 22, 2019 Filing 17 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union of Colorado All parties consent.. (Jahanian, Arash)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendant's Answer or other responsive pleading due 6/3/2019. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5.17.2019. Text Only Entry(nywlc1, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Bobet, Jane)
May 16, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Complaint and Summons upon U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement on April 18, 2019 - answer due May 20, 2019 in accordance with 5 USC 552 (a)(4)(C), filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union of Colorado (Jahanian, Arash)
April 30, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jane Elizabeth Bobet on behalf of U.S. Immigration and Customs EnforcementAttorney Jane Elizabeth Bobet added to party U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft) (Bobet, Jane)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4/18/19. Consent Form due by 5/23/2019. Status Conference set for 6/6/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Mark Silverstein by Mark Silverstein on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union of ColoradoAttorney Mark Silverstein added to party American Civil Liberties Union of Colorado(pty:pla) (Silverstein, Mark)
April 10, 2019 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (slibi, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 9 CASE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to Order of Recusal. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01036-NYW. (Text Only Entry) (slibi, )
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 4/10/2019. (slibi, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01036-NRN. (athom, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union of Colorado (Jahanian, Arash)
April 9, 2019 Filing 4 Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6624945)Attorney Arash Jahanian added to party American Civil Liberties Union of Colorado(pty:pla), filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons)(Jahanian, Arash)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Civil Liberties Union of Colorado v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Jane Elizabeth Bobet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union of Colorado
Represented By: Arash Jahanian
Represented By: Mark Silverstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?