Rich v. Glatz et al
Plaintiff: Audrey Rich
Defendant: Anita Glatz and Anita (I) M. Glatz
Case Number: 1:2019cv01047
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Referring Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER granting #18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint filed by Anita (I) M. Glatz by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 06/18/2019. Defendant shall file an answer or other response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 8/1/2019. (mdave, )
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER VACATING previous Order granting extension of time (Doc. 19). The parties have consented to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge (See Doc. 16). SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 06/18/2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. The Court has reviewed the motion. Good cause being shown, the motion is GRANTED. Defendants response to the Complaint is due on or before August 1, 2019. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 06/17/2019. Text Only Entry(dddlc3, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint by Defendant Anita (I) M. Glatz. (Bryan, Christopher)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF REFERENCE Upon #16 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 06/04/2019. (athom, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Audrey Rich All parties consent.. (Wartell, Daniel)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER granting #13 Motion to Reschedule Scheduling Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/30/2019. Scheduling Conference is VACATED and RESET to 9/5/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty.(tsher, )
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING MOTION(S): #13 Unopposed MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference filed by Audrey Rich.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 5/29/2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc2, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Audrey Rich. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Abel, Teresa)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 This action is reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico upon his appointment and the passing of Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all previously scheduled matters will be maintained and will now be handled by Judge Domenico in Courtroom A-702. His chambers are located in A-738 of the Alfred A. Arraj Courthouse. His telephone number is 303-335-2468. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01047-DDD. Text only entry. (agarc, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sarah Oszczakiewicz on behalf of Anita Glatz, Anita (I) M. GlatzAttorney Sarah Oszczakiewicz added to party Anita Glatz(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Oszczakiewicz added to party Anita (I) M. Glatz(pty:dft) (Oszczakiewicz, Sarah)
May 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christopher David Bryan on behalf of Anita Glatz, Anita (I) M. GlatzAttorney Christopher David Bryan added to party Anita Glatz(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher David Bryan added to party Anita (I) M. Glatz(pty:dft) (Bryan, Christopher)
May 3, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Audrey Rich. Anita Glatz waiver sent on 5/2/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Wartell, Daniel)
April 17, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (evana, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Anita Glatz by Plaintiff Audrey Rich. (Abel, Teresa)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Teresa Marie Abel on behalf of Audrey RichAttorney Teresa Marie Abel added to party Audrey Rich(pty:pla) (Abel, Teresa)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/11/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 6/13/2019 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for non-dispositive matters. That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows: (1) Convene a scheduling conference under Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2. (2) Conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause. (3) Hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. (4) Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge, or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. It is further ORDERED that parties and counsel shall be familiar and comply with the above judge's requirements found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. By Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/10/19. Text Only Entry (rkeec)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (rroge, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Audrey Rich (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6626541)Attorney Daniel Adam Wartell added to party Audrey Rich(pty:pla), filed by Audrey Rich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wartell, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rich v. Glatz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Rich
Represented By: Daniel Adam Wartell
Represented By: Teresa Marie Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anita Glatz
Represented By: Sarah Oszczakiewicz
Represented By: Christopher David Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anita (I) M. Glatz
Represented By: Sarah Oszczakiewicz
Represented By: Christopher David Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?