Schee v. Columbia Sussex Management LLC
Plaintiff: Matthew Schee
Defendant: Columbia Sussex Management LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01049
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: FMLA
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER: Based on the #22 Notice of Settlement, the parties shall file appropriate dismissal documents no later than 7/29/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/2/19. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 )
July 2, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Settlement by Plaintiff Matthew Schee (Kuhn, Michael)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/11/19. All motions concerning the testimony of expert witnesses raising issues under Fed. R. Evid. 401, 702, 703, 704, or 705 as codified and construed shall be filed by November 20, 2019. A combined Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference is set for 4/15/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Five Day Jury Trial is set 5/4/2020 through 5/8/2020 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. (rebsec)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/20/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/10/2019. Combined Final Pretrial and Trial Preparation Conference set for 4/16/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 and 5-day Jury Trial set to begin 5/4/2020 at 8:30 AM, all in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Entered by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/10/2019. (lrobe)
June 10, 2019 Filing 19 COURTROOM MINUTES for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/10/2019. FTR: Courtroom 101. (lrobe)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Telephonically at Scheduling Conference. The parties shall initiate a conference call and contact chambers, 719-575-0328, at the scheduled time. The parties shall use a LAND LINE; NO CELLULAR, CORDLESS OR SPEAKER PHONES ARE PERMITTED. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/3/19. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
June 3, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/3/19 regarding #16 Joint MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Scheduling Conference filed by Matthew Schee. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya Text Only Entry (rebsec)
June 2, 2019 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Matthew Schee. (Kuhn, Michael)
May 28, 2019 Filing 15 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Matthew Schee. (Kuhn, Michael)
May 1, 2019 Filing 14 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses by Columbia Sussex Management LLC.(Chalal, Jennifer)
May 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jennifer Myers Chalal on behalf of Columbia Sussex Management LLCAttorney Jennifer Myers Chalal added to party Columbia Sussex Management LLC(pty:dft) (Chalal, Jennifer)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/30/19. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
April 30, 2019 Filing 11 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #10 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01049-REB. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Matthew Schee All parties do not consent.. (Kuhn, Michael)
April 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kathleen M. Byrne on behalf of Columbia Sussex Management LLCAttorney Kathleen M. Byrne added to party Columbia Sussex Management LLC(pty:dft) (Byrne, Kathleen)
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Lloyd Hutchinson on behalf of Columbia Sussex Management LLCAttorney Michael Lloyd Hutchinson added to party Columbia Sussex Management LLC(pty:dft) (Hutchinson, Michael)
April 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Schee. Columbia Sussex Management LLC served on 4/11/2019, answer due 5/2/2019. (Kuhn, Michael)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 6/10/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 6/3/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 04/11/2019. (ksena)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Paul Forrest Lewis on behalf of Matthew ScheeAttorney Paul Forrest Lewis added to party Matthew Schee(pty:pla) (Lewis, Paul)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew Edward Swan on behalf of Matthew ScheeAttorney Andrew Edward Swan added to party Matthew Schee(pty:pla) (Swan, Andrew)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Columbia Sussex Management L.L.C. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6627319)Attorney Michael Dickson Kuhn added to party Matthew Schee(pty:pla), filed by Matthew Schee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons_Columbia Sussex Management L.L.C.)(Kuhn, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schee v. Columbia Sussex Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Schee
Represented By: Andrew Edward Swan
Represented By: Michael Dickson Kuhn
Represented By: Paul Forrest Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Sussex Management LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Myers Chalal
Represented By: Kathleen M. Byrne
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?